SCIOTO PROPERTIES SP-16 LLC et al v. TOWNSHIP OF SHALER et al

Plaintiff: SCIOTO PROPERTIES SP-16 LLC and REMED RECOVERY CARE CENTERS LLC
Defendant: ZONING HEARING BOARD OF THE TOWNSHIP OF SHALER and TOWNSHIP OF SHALER
Petitioner: MARCO BONATI, ALLISON MURRAY, PATRICK MURRAY and ROBERT NEELY
Case Number: 2:2018cv01448
Filed: October 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Joy Flowers Conti
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2018 Update Answer Deadline: Answer due from TOWNSHIP OF SHALER on 2/11/2019. (ksa)
December 21, 2018 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Intervene filed by ZONING HEARING BOARD OF THE TOWNSHIP OF SHALER. (Junker, Robert)
December 21, 2018 Filing 17 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by TOWNSHIP OF SHALER Answer due from TOWNSHIP OF SHALER 2/11/2019. (Stone, Harlan) Modified text on 12/26/2018 to indicate date answer is due. (ksa)
December 21, 2018 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Intervene filed by TOWNSHIP OF SHALER. (Stone, Harlan)
December 21, 2018 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Intervene filed by SCIOTO PROPERTIES SP-16 LLC. (Wratcher, Robert)
December 20, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam J. Ventura on behalf of TOWNSHIP OF SHALER. (Ventura, Adam)
December 19, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Harlan S. Stone on behalf of TOWNSHIP OF SHALER. (Stone, Harlan)
December 18, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M. Junker on behalf of ZONING HEARING BOARD OF THE TOWNSHIP OF SHALER. (Junker, Robert)
December 14, 2018 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #9 Summons/Returned Returned Executed, #8 Summons/Returned Returned Executed. ERROR: Wrong event selected. CORRECTION: Re-docketed as Notices of Acceptance of Service. This message is for informational purposes only. (ksa)
December 11, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Acceptance of Service by ZONING HEARING BOARD OF THE TOWNSHIP OF SHALER re #1 Complaint. (ksa)
December 11, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Acceptance of Service by TOWNSHIP OF SHALER re #1 Complaint. "Document previously filed electronically" (ksa)
December 11, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by SCIOTO PROPERTIES SP-16 LLC. ZONING HEARING BOARD OF THE TOWNSHIP OF SHALER served on 12/6/2018, answer due 12/27/2018. (Wratcher, Robert) Modified text on 12/13/2018 ERROR: Wrong event selected. Document removed from public view and refiled by Court. (ksa)
December 11, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by SCIOTO PROPERTIES SP-16 LLC. TOWNSHIP OF SHALER served on 12/6/2018, answer due 12/27/2018. (Wratcher, Robert) Modified text on 12/13/2018 ERROR: Wrong event selected. Document removed from public view and refiled by Court. (ksa)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Order correcting 7 Response/Briefing Schedule. It is Ordered that the Response to #5 Motion to Intervene is due by 12/24/2018. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's order or notice on the matter. (smc)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Response/Briefing Schedule re #5 Motion to Intervene. Response to Motion due by 12/4/2018. Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 12/4/2018. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (smc)
December 3, 2018 Filing 6 BRIEF in Support re #5 Motion to Intervene filed by MARCO BONATI, ALLISON MURRAY, PATRICK MURRAY, ROBERT NEELY. (Gaul, Stuart)
December 3, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Intervene by PATRICK MURRAY, ALLISON MURRAY, ROBERT NEELY, MARCO BONATI. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Answer, #2 Exhibit 2 - Transcript, #3 Exhibit 3 - Transcript, #4 Proposed Order) (Gaul, Stuart)
November 2, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (smc)
October 29, 2018 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by REMED RECOVERY CARE CENTERS LLC. (ksa)
October 29, 2018 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by SCIOTO PROPERTIES SP-16 LLC. (ksa)
October 29, 2018 Summons Issued as to TOWNSHIP OF SHALER, ZONING HEARING BOARD OF THE TOWNSHIP OF SHALER. (ksa)
October 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TOWNSHIP OF SHALER, ZONING HEARING BOARD OF THE TOWNSHIP OF SHALER (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4913262), filed by SCIOTO PROPERTIES SP-16 LLC, REMED RECOVERY CARE CENTERS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for Township of Shaler, #3 Summons for Zoning Hearing Board of the Township of Shaler) (ksa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SCIOTO PROPERTIES SP-16 LLC et al v. TOWNSHIP OF SHALER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCIOTO PROPERTIES SP-16 LLC
Represented By: Robert J. Wratcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REMED RECOVERY CARE CENTERS LLC
Represented By: Robert J. Wratcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZONING HEARING BOARD OF THE TOWNSHIP OF SHALER
Represented By: Robert M. Junker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOWNSHIP OF SHALER
Represented By: Adam J. Ventura
Represented By: Harlan S. Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MARCO BONATI
Represented By: Stuart C. Gaul, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ALLISON MURRAY
Represented By: Stuart C. Gaul, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: PATRICK MURRAY
Represented By: Stuart C. Gaul, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ROBERT NEELY
Represented By: Stuart C. Gaul, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?