KELLY v. CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY
Plaintiff: GLENN KELLY
Defendant: CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2018cv01507
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Joy Flowers Conti
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:688
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Settlement. Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 12/3/18. (mh)
December 3, 2018 Filing 9 SEALED DOCUMENT. (mh)
December 3, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti: Confirmation Hearing held on 12/3/2018. Court approved settlement, as explained on the record. (Court Reporter: Deborah Rowe) Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes a Minute of the Court or Notice on the matter. (mh)
November 26, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Settlement PETITION FOR COMPROMISED SETTLEMENT OF SEAMAN'S SUIT by GLENN KELLY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (McQuiston, David)
November 21, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Settlement Confirmation Hearing set for 12/3/2018 02:30 PM before Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti. (mh)
November 20, 2018 Filing 7 SEALED DOCUMENT (Exhibits A-J to Petition for Comprised Settlement of Seaman's Suit) by CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY. This document Sealed pursuant to #6 Order on Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J) (ksa)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. The proposed release between Campbell Transportation Company, Inc. and thePlaintiff and Plaintiffs medical records shall be filed under seal. The parties are not required to fileredacted versions of the documents. After receiving notice of the order of court, you must provide the sealed document to the Clerk of Courts both on paper and on disk, in pdf format. In the alternative, you may contact the Intake Section and make arrangements to email the pdf to the Clerk of Courts. The sealed version of the document WILL NOT be docketed by the Clerk of Court until the party electronically files the redacted version of the documents (using Redacted Document event located under Other Documents), unless otherwise ordered by the Court. You would be required to serve the sealed document on counsel using traditional service methods. Document Sealed Permanently. Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 11/15/2018. (smc)
November 15, 2018 Filing 5 Errata re #4 Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal Proposed Release and Medical Records of Plaintiff-Seaman by CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY. Reason for Correction: The whole document was not attached. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bagnato, Marjorie)
November 15, 2018 Filing 4 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal Proposed Release and Medical Records of Plaintiff-Seaman by CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bagnato, Marjorie)
November 13, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Marjorie Bagnato on behalf of CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY. (Bagnato, Marjorie)
November 13, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (smc)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4928401) filed by GLENN KELLY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KELLY v. CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLENN KELLY
Represented By: David M. McQuiston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY
Represented By: Marjorie Bagnato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?