VIALE et al v. THROWER et al

Plaintiff: VALERIE VIALE, LAURA BENNETT and MEGAN SMITH
Defendant: VILLA VISTA CORPORATION and JOSEPH E. THROWER
Case Number: 2:2018cv01535
Filed: November 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
0 Judge: David S Cercone
1 Judge: Peter J Phipps
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. The Initial Scheduling Conference is set for 02/22/19 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8B before Judge Peter J. Phipps. Rule 26(f) Report due by 02/07/19, Stipulation Selecting ADR Process due by 02/12/19. Signed by Judge Peter J. Phipps on 01/10/19. (eca)
January 9, 2019 Judge Peter J. Phipps presiding. (nll)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. The Clerk of Court is directed to reassign this action to another member of the Court for all further proceedings. Judge David S. Cercone no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 1/8/19. (njt)
January 7, 2019 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by VILLA VISTA CORPORATION. (Lazaroff, Michael)
January 7, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #5 Answer to Complaint. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant to L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 1/14/2019. (ept)
January 5, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by JOSEPH E. THROWER, VILLA VISTA CORPORATION. (Lazaroff, Michael)
December 21, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by VALERIE VIALE, MEGAN SMITH, LAURA BENNETT. VILLA VISTA CORPORATION served on 12/17/2018, answer due 1/7/2019. (Quisenberry, Kevin)
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by VALERIE VIALE, MEGAN SMITH, LAURA BENNETT. JOSEPH E. THROWER served on 12/17/2018, answer due 1/7/2019. (Quisenberry, Kevin)
December 3, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (kak)
November 16, 2018 Summons Issued as to JOSEPH E. THROWER, VALERIE VIALE, VILLA VISTA CORPORATION. (ept)
November 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOSEPH E. THROWER, VALERIE VIALE, VILLA VISTA CORPORATION (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4934152), filed by MEGAN SMITH, LAURA BENNETT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons Thrower, #5 Summons Villa Vista) (ept)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VIALE et al v. THROWER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VILLA VISTA CORPORATION
Represented By: Michael S. Lazaroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH E. THROWER
Represented By: Michael S. Lazaroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VALERIE VIALE
Represented By: Kevin L. Quisenberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAURA BENNETT
Represented By: Kevin L. Quisenberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MEGAN SMITH
Represented By: Kevin L. Quisenberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?