UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $605,414.04 FORMERLY CONTAINED IN SCOTTDALE BANK & TRUST COMPANY CHECKING ACCOUNT NO. XX-X0659 et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: REAL PROPERTY KNOWN AND NUMBERED AS 20 EAST MAIN STREET, MOUNT PLEASANT, PA 15666, $605,414.04 FORMERLY CONTAINED IN SCOTTDALE BANK & TRUST COMPANY CHECKING ACCOUNT NO. XX-X0659 and ALL FUNDS CONTAINED IN MERRILL LYNCH ACCOUNT NO. XXX-X8389
Claimant: MAFOMA PROPERTIES, LLC and DIALYSIS CLINIC, INC.
Case Number: 2:2018cv01536
Filed: November 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Joy Flowers Conti
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AFTER STAY by DIALYSIS CLINIC, INC.. (Spada, Eric)
January 10, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric M. Spada on behalf of DIALYSIS CLINIC, INC.. (Spada, Eric)
December 31, 2018 Filing 11 PROOF of Publication filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Name of publication: www.forfeiture.gov. Last publication date December 27, 2018. (Lew, David)
December 21, 2018 Filing 10 STATEMENT OF CLAIMS and Statement of Interest by DIALYSIS CLINIC, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Redacted)) (Jankowski, Gretchen)
December 21, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Berardinelli on behalf of MAFOMA PROPERTIES, LLC. (Berardinelli, David)
December 21, 2018 Filing 8 STATEMENT OF CLAIMS Pursuant to Rule G(5)(a) of the Supplemental Rules for Certain Admiralty and Maritime Claims by MAFOMA PROPERTIES, LLC.. (Berardinelli, David)
December 21, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Gretchen L. Jankowski on behalf of DIALYSIS CLINIC, INC.. (Jankowski, Gretchen)
December 6, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by William F. Ward on behalf of MAMDOUH EL-ATTRACHE. (Ward, William)
November 28, 2018 Filing 5 US Marshal's Return as to posting of Warrant for Arrest in REM at 20 East Main St., Mount Pleasant, PA 15666, executed on 11/23/2018. (ept)
November 23, 2018 Filing 4 US Marshal's Return as to $605,414.04 FORMERLY CONTAINED IN SCOTTDALE BANK & TRUST COMPANY CHECKING ACCOUNT NO. XX-X0659 et al adminstratively seized 05/12/17 with CATS No. 17-FBI-002920 executed on 11/20/2018. (jv)
November 19, 2018 Filing 3 WARRANT for Arrest in Action in REM issued. (ept)
November 16, 2018 Filing 2 Request to Issue a Warrant for Arrest in Action in Rem by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Lew, David)
November 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against $605,414.04 FORMERLY CONTAINED IN SCOTTDALE BANK & TRUST COMPANY CHECKING ACCOUNT NO. XX-X0659, ALL FUNDS CONTAINED IN MERRILL LYNCH ACCOUNT NO. XXX-X8389, REAL PROPERTY KNOWN AND NUMBERED AS 20 EAST MAIN STREET, MOUNT PLEASANT, PA 15666, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ept)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $605,414.04 FORMERLY CONTAINED IN SCOTTDALE BANK & TRUST COMPANY CHECKING ACCOUNT NO. XX-X0659 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REAL PROPERTY KNOWN AND NUMBERED AS 20 EAST MAIN STREET, MOUNT PLEASANT, PA 15666
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $605,414.04 FORMERLY CONTAINED IN SCOTTDALE BANK & TRUST COMPANY CHECKING ACCOUNT NO. XX-X0659
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALL FUNDS CONTAINED IN MERRILL LYNCH ACCOUNT NO. XXX-X8389
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: David Lew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: MAFOMA PROPERTIES, LLC
Represented By: David J. Berardinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: DIALYSIS CLINIC, INC.
Represented By: Gretchen L. Jankowski
Represented By: Eric M. Spada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?