GULF MATERIALS, LLC
Plaintiff: GULF MATERIALS, LLC
Respondent: JOHN'S TOWING SERVICE, INC.
Case Number: 2:2018cv01574
Filed: November 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Reed Eddy
Referring Judge: Marilyn J Horan
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Sandra M. Kelly on behalf of JOHN'S TOWING SERVICE, INC.. (Kelly, Sandra)
January 16, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher D. Kuebler on behalf of JOHN'S TOWING SERVICE, INC.. (Kuebler, Christopher)
January 16, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against GULF MATERIALS, LLC, COUNTERCLAIM against GULF MATERIALS, LLC by JOHN'S TOWING SERVICE, INC.. (Kuebler, Christopher)
January 2, 2019 Filing 11 Remark: Issuance of Notice of Filing of Complaint for Exoneration or Limitation of Liability. (ept)
January 2, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF FILING OF COMPLAINT FOR EXONERATION OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY by GULF MATERIALS, LLC re #8 Order on Motion for Approval of the Ad Interim Stipulation for Value and Letter of Undertaking, Order on Motion for an Order Directing Issuance of the Required Notice, and for Issuance of an Injunction. (Whalen, Holly) Modified text on 1/2/2019. (ept)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that Gulf Materials, LLC's #6 Motion for Approval of Security for Value of Vessel and #7 Motion to Deposit Funds with Clerk of Courts are dismissed as moot in light of the Letter of Undertaking of RLI Insurance Company in lieu of posting security. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 12/17/18. (rtw)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Approval of the Ad Interim Stipulation for Value and Letter of Undertaking, for an Order Directing Issuance of the Required Notice, and for Issuance of an Injunction. Notice to be published for four consecutive weeks prior to February 1, 2019, the date fixed for filing of claims. Further details as indicated in Order. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 12/17/18. (rtw)
December 6, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Deposit Funds with Clerk of Courts by GULF MATERIALS, LLC. Motion(s) referred to Cynthia Reed Eddy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Ad Interim Stipulation for Value, #2 Exhibit 2, Letter of Undertaking, #3 Proposed Order) (Whalen, Holly)
December 5, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF SECURITY FOR VALUE OF VESSEL re #5 Order,, by GULF MATERIALS, LLC. Motion(s) referred to Cynthia Reed Eddy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Ad Interim Stipulation for Value, #2 Exhibit 2, Letter of Undertaking, #3 Proposed Order) (Whalen, Holly)
November 30, 2018 Judge Marilyn J. Horan presiding and Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy referred. (nll)
November 30, 2018 Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy no longer presiding in case. (nll)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Gulf Materials, LLC shall file a separate motion and proposed order for leave to deposit money with the Clerk of Court in accordance with Rule F.(1) of the Supplemental Rules for Admiralty or Maritime Claims and Asset Forfeiture Actions of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, 46 U.S.C. 30501, et seq., Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 67 and Western District of Pennsylvania Local Rule LCvR 67.2.C. by December 5, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 11/28/2018. (ajt)
November 27, 2018 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #3 Motion for approval of Ad Interim Stipulation, Motion for Motion for an Order directing issuance of the required notice; and Motion for Issuance of an Injunction. ERROR: MULTIPLE Relief Motion Filed as One Relief. CORRECTION: Attorney advised in future that Motions of this nature are to be filed using the Motion Event and clicking on all the reliefs sought in said motion. Clerk of Court added MOTION for Order directing issuance of the required notice and MOTION for Issuance of an Injunction. This message is for informational purposes only. (jv)
November 26, 2018 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by GULF MATERIALS, LLC. (Whalen, Holly)
November 26, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION (1) Approval of Ad Interim Stipulation and Letter of Undertaking; (2) An Order directing issuance of the required notice; and (3) Issuance of an Injunction re #1 Complaint, filed by GULF MATERIALS, LLC by GULF MATERIALS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order) (Whalen, Holly). Added MOTION for order directing issuance of the required notice, MOTION for issuance of an injunction on 11/27/2018. (jv)
November 26, 2018 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER ON RULE 12(b) MOTIONS. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 11/26/2018. (sms)
November 21, 2018 Filing 1 IN THE MATTER OF THE COMPLAINT (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4941615), filed by GULF MATERIALS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E) (jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GULF MATERIALS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GULF MATERIALS, LLC
Represented By: Holly M. Whalen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JOHN'S TOWING SERVICE, INC.
Represented By: Sandra M. Kelly
Represented By: Christopher D. Kuebler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?