HUGHES v. FARRELL AREA SCHOOL DISTRICT et al
Plaintiff: RICHARD A. HUGHES
Defendant: FARRELL AREA SCHOOL DISTRICT and COMMUNITY ACTION PARTNERSHIP OF MERCER COUNTY
Case Number: 2:2018cv01584
Filed: November 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Maureen P Kelly
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2019 Filing 18 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Mooney, Tara)
January 14, 2019 Filing 17 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by RICHARD A. HUGHES. (Mooney, Tara)
January 14, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #16 Consent to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option. ERROR: Signature on document and filer do not match. CORRECTION: Attorney advised of signature requirements. Attorney to resubmit the document using the Errata event. This message is for informational purposes only. (jv)
January 14, 2019 Full Consent to Proceed before US Mag. Judge received by parties. (ard)
January 14, 2019 Filing 16 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by RICHARD A. HUGHES. (Mooney, Tara)
January 11, 2019 Filing 15 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by FARRELL AREA SCHOOL DISTRICT. (Herzing, Julia)
January 11, 2019 Filing 14 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by COMMUNITY ACTION PARTNERSHIP OF MERCER COUNTY. (Felton, Rachel)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF COURT. Since this case has been assigned to a Magistrate Judge, each party must execute and file no later than 01/11/19, a form consenting to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge or selecting the option to have the case randomly assigned to a District Judge. The applicable form is available on the Courts website at www.pawd.uscourts.gov in the forms section. If the parties elect to have the case assigned to a Magistrate Judge, Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly will continue to manage the case as provided for in Local Rule 72G. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 12/21/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Rule 26 Meeting to be conducted on or before 1/18/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report and Stipulation Selecting ADR Process due by 1/25/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/1/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 12/21/18. (eca)
December 20, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by COMMUNITY ACTION PARTNERSHIP OF MERCER COUNTY. (Must, Brian)
December 20, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by FARRELL AREA SCHOOL DISTRICT. (Herzing, Julia)
December 17, 2018 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by COMMUNITY ACTION PARTNERSHIP OF MERCER COUNTY. (Must, Brian)
December 17, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel D. Felton on behalf of COMMUNITY ACTION PARTNERSHIP OF MERCER COUNTY. (Felton, Rachel)
December 17, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian T. Must on behalf of COMMUNITY ACTION PARTNERSHIP OF MERCER COUNTY. (Must, Brian)
December 7, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by RICHARD A. HUGHES. FARRELL AREA SCHOOL DISTRICT served on 11/29/2018, answer due 12/20/2018. (Mooney, Tara)
December 7, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by RICHARD A. HUGHES. COMMUNITY ACTION PARTNERSHIP OF MERCER COUNTY served on 11/29/2018, answer due 12/20/2018. (Mooney, Tara)
December 7, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Tara M. Mooney on behalf of RICHARD A. HUGHES. (Mooney, Tara)
December 6, 2018 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for complaint and summons served on Vicky Bucker, Receptionist, Community Action Partnership of Mercer County on November 29, 2018, filed by RICHARD A. HUGHES. (Ochs, Barbara)
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service for complaint and summons served on Shane Wiesen, Business Manager, Farrell Area School District on November 29, 2018, filed by RICHARD A. HUGHES. (Ochs, Barbara)
November 26, 2018 Summons Issued as to COMMUNITY ACTION PARTNERSHIP OF MERCER COUNTY, FARRELL AREA SCHOOL DISTRICT (jv)
November 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against COMMUNITY ACTION PARTNERSHIP OF MERCER COUNTY, FARRELL AREA SCHOOL DISTRICT (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4940509), filed by RICHARD A. HUGHES. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons as to Farrell Area School District, #3 Proposed Order as to Community Action Partnership of Mercer County) (jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HUGHES v. FARRELL AREA SCHOOL DISTRICT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FARRELL AREA SCHOOL DISTRICT
Represented By: Julia M. Herzing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMUNITY ACTION PARTNERSHIP OF MERCER COUNTY
Represented By: Brian T. Must
Represented By: Rachel D. Felton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD A. HUGHES
Represented By: Barbara Seman Ochs
Represented By: Tara M. Mooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?