RAVOTTI v. ONEJET, INC.
Plaintiff: JEREMY RAVOTTI
Defendant: ONEJET, INC.
Case Number: 2:2018cv01598
Filed: November 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Mark R Hornak
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. Based on this Court's review of the Docket, the fact that the Defendant is the subject to a bankruptcy petition in the Bankruptcy Court for this District at BR-18-24070-GLT, that the claims asserted in this action appear to be pre-petition, and based on the Court's review of the Plaintiff's filing at ECF No. #7 , the Court hereby ORDERS that this action is STAYED and administratively closed in that it appears that the automatic stay afforded by the bankruptcy laws of the United States is fully applicable here. This Order is without prejudice to the Plaintiff filing for appropriate relief in the bankruptcy proceeding referenced above, including but not limited to, relief from the automatic stay. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 1/23/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdb)
January 23, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 6 Order to Show Cause, filed by JEREMY RAVOTTI. (O'Leary, Michael)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. On or before 1/23/19, Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE as to why this case should not be stayed due to the bankruptcy of the Defendant pending at 18-24070-GLT in the Bankruptcy Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 1/16/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdb)
December 28, 2018 Update Answer Deadline: Answer due from ONEJET, INC. on 2/1/2019. (ksa)
December 27, 2018 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JEREMY RAVOTTI. ONEJET, INC. waiver sent on 12/3/2018, answer due 2/1/2019. (O'Leary, Michael) Modified text on 12/28/2018 to correct date waiver was sent and answer is due. (ksa)
December 3, 2018 Filing 4 AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this Notice and use either Dial-In No. 1 or Dial-In No. 2, both of which are contained in this Notice. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only", so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (jad)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Judge Mark R. Hornak on 12/3/18. (jad)
December 3, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jad)
November 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ONEJET, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4947699), filed by JEREMY RAVOTTI. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ksa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RAVOTTI v. ONEJET, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ONEJET, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEREMY RAVOTTI
Represented By: Michael A. O'Leary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?