PEER v. KENNY ROSS AUTOMOTIVE GROUP

Plaintiff: LARRY PEER
Defendant: KENNY ROSS AUTOMOTIVE GROUP
Case Number: 2:2018cv01658
Filed: December 13, 2018
Court: Pennsylvania Western District Court
Presiding Judge: Nora Barry Fischer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary-Jo Rebelo on behalf of KENNY ROSS AUTOMOTIVE GROUP. (Rebelo, Mary-Jo)
January 16, 2019 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by LARRY PEER. KENNY ROSS AUTOMOTIVE GROUP waiver sent on 12/17/2018, answer due 2/15/2019. (Williams, Susan)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order 3 ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss, more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 12/14/18. (jg)
December 14, 2018 2 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jg)
December 13, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against KENNY ROSS AUTOMOTIVE GROUP (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4965046), filed by LARRY PEER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ksa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PEER v. KENNY ROSS AUTOMOTIVE GROUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNY ROSS AUTOMOTIVE GROUP
Represented By: Mary-Jo Rebelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LARRY PEER
Represented By: Susan N. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?