HABARKA v. DOLGENCORP, LLC

Plaintiff: LINDA HABARKA
Defendant: DOLGENCORP, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv01674
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Arthur J Schwab
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION selecting ADR process by DOLGENCORP, LLC. (Hannon, Sean)
February 1, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #10 Stipulation Selecting ADR process. ERROR: Wrong version of form used for filing ADR process Stipulation. CORRECTION: Counsel is advised the Stipulation Selecting ADR form has been updated. Dispose of all previous versions of the Stipulation and begin using the amended form, with the revision date 4/2017.. This message is for informational purposes only. (jv)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER STRIKING #10 Stipulation selecting ADR process for failure to choose a specific date for the ADR session, which must occur within 60 days of the Initial Case Management Conference. A fully completed Stipulation selecting ADR process is due on or before 2/8/19. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 2/1/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or notice on the matter. (ms)
January 30, 2019 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Hannon, Sean)
January 30, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION selecting ADR process by DOLGENCORP, LLC. (Hannon, Sean)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Hearing re #8 Consent MOTION for Hearing to Reschedule Rule 16 Initial Case Management Conference filed by DOLGENCORP, LLC. Initial Case Management set for 3/6/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7C before Judge Arthur J. Schwab. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 1/14/19. (lck)
January 11, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Hearing to Reschedule Rule 16 Initial Case Management Conference by DOLGENCORP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hannon, Sean)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING Initial Case Management Conference for 2/27/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7C before Judge Arthur J. Schwab. 26(f) Report, Proposed Case Management Order, and ADR Stipulation are due on 2/13/19. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 1/4/19. (lck)
December 28, 2018 Filing 6 Errata re #5 Order Reason for Correction: wrong date. (ms)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Re: Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 12/28/18. (ms)
December 28, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (ms)
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint and AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by DOLGENCORP, LLC. (Hannon, Sean)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement identifying KOHLBERG KRAVIS ROBERTS & CO. LP and DOLLAR GENERAL CORPOATION as corporate parent or other affiliate, by DOLGENCORP, LLC. (Hannon, Sean)
December 18, 2018 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Notice of Removal,. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. This message is for informational purposes only. Disclosure Statement due by 12/26/2018. (jv)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of Common Pleas of Washington County, case number 2018-6763 (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4968772), filed by DOLGENCORP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit - Including Complaint) (jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HABARKA v. DOLGENCORP, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOLGENCORP, LLC
Represented By: Sean P. Hannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINDA HABARKA
Represented By: Christopher P. Furman
Represented By: Megan L. Patrick
Represented By: Dennis M. Makel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?