IN RE: DIISOCYANATES ANTITRUST LITIGATION
Plaintiff: TRI-ISO TRYLINE, LLC, BRYN HILL INDUSTRIES, INC., RHINO LININGS CORPORATION, EMMA CHEMICALS CO., INC., ISAAC INDUSTRIES, INC., C.U.E., INC., UNICAST, INC., ELLIOTT COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, INC., UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC, ERA POLYMERS PROPRIETARY LIMITED, NPC COATING, INC. and FINISHING SOLUTIONS LLC
Defendant: COVESTRO AG, WANHUA CHEMICAL US HOLDING, INC., BASF CORP., COVESTRO LLC, BAYER CORP., WANHUA CHEMICAL GROUP CO. LTD, MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC, MCNS, BASF SE, HUNTSMAN INTERNATIONAL LLC, BAYER A.G., MITSUI CHEMICALS AMERICA, INC, DOW CHEMICAL CO., DOWDUPONT INC, MCNS POLYURETHANES USA INC, MITSUI CHEMICALS & SKC POLYURETHANES, INC, HUNTSMAN CORP., WANHUA CHEMICAL AMERICA CO. LTD, HUNTSMAN LLC, BAYER MATERIALSCIENCE LLC, BASF AG, SKC POLYURETHANES and MITSUI CHEMICALS
In Re: IN RE: DIISOCYANATES ANTITRUST LITIGATION
Case Number: 2:2018mc01001
Filed: October 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Donetta W Ambrose
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 25
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER granting #287 Motion for Constance Forkner to Appear Pro Hac Vice.. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 2/24/20. (cha)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 287 MOTION for attorney Constance T. Forkner to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5480040) by HUNTSMAN CORP., HUNTSMAN INTERNATIONAL LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Forkner, Constance)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER granting #253 Motion to Stay for 60 days or until the Court issues orders on the pending Motions to Dismiss, whichever occurs earlier. During this time, however, the parties are to continue to discuss an ESI Protocol, other ESI issues and data fields. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 2/20/20. (slh)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 285 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Donetta W. Ambrose: Telephone Conference held on 2/20/2020. (Court Reporter: Barb Leo) (slh)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 284 DECLARATION re #283 Reply Brief, by BASF CORP., BASF SE, COVESTRO AG, COVESTRO LLC, DOW CHEMICAL CO., HUNTSMAN CORP., HUNTSMAN INTERNATIONAL LLC, MCNS POLYURETHANES USA INC, MITSUI CHEMICALS & SKC POLYURETHANES, INC, MITSUI CHEMICALS AMERICA, INC, MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC, WANHUA CHEMICAL AMERICA CO. LTD, WANHUA CHEMICAL GROUP CO. LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' First Request for Production of Documents for Unstructured Data) (Braver, Samuel)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 283 REPLY BRIEF re #253 Motion to Stay, filed by BASF CORP., BASF SE, COVESTRO AG, COVESTRO LLC, DOW CHEMICAL CO., HUNTSMAN CORP., HUNTSMAN INTERNATIONAL LLC, MCNS POLYURETHANES USA INC, MITSUI CHEMICALS & SKC POLYURETHANES, INC, MITSUI CHEMICALS AMERICA, INC, MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC, WANHUA CHEMICAL AMERICA CO. LTD, WANHUA CHEMICAL GROUP CO. LTD. (Braver, Samuel)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER: As the court is experiencing issue with its fax, the parties are to refrain from faxing position papers for the February 20, 2020, conference until Tuesday morning, February 18, 2020. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 2/14/20. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (slh)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER granting #279 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Bernard D. Marcus terminated. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 2/13/20. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ask)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER granting #278 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Brian C. Hill terminated. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 2/13/20. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ask)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 279 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by ELLIOTT COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Marcus, Bernard)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 278 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by ELLIOTT COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hill, Brian)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER granting #275 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Erin G. Allen terminated. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 2/12/20. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (slh)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER granting #274 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Moira E. Cain-Mannix terminated. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 2/12/20. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (slh)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 275 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by ELLIOTT COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Allen, Erin)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 274 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by ELLIOTT COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cain-Mannix, Moira)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER granting #268 Motion for Reappointment of Jason Hartley and Megan Jones as Interim Co-Lead Counsel and Reappointment of William Pietragallo, II as Interim Liaison Counsel. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 2/4/20. (sps)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 272 DECLARATION re #271 Brief in Opposition to Motion to Stay Discovery by NPC COATING, INC., RHINO LININGS CORPORATION, TRI-ISO TRYLINE, LLC, UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC Affiant: Megan E. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Table of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D) (Pietragallo, William)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 271 BRIEF in Opposition re #253 Motion to Stay, filed by NPC COATING, INC., RHINO LININGS CORPORATION, TRI-ISO TRYLINE, LLC, UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Pietragallo, William)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 270 BRIEF in Support re #268 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, (for Reappointment of Jason Hartley and Megan Jones as Interim Co-Lead Counsel and Reappointment of William Pietragallo, II as Interim Liaison Counsel) filed by NPC COATING, INC., RHINO LININGS CORPORATION, TRI-ISO TRYLINE, LLC, UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC. (Pietragallo, William)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 269 DECLARATION re #268 MOTION for Reappointment of Jason Hartley and Megan Jones as Interim Co-Lead Counsel and Reappointment of William Pietragallo, II as Interim Liaison Counsel by NPC COATING, INC., RHINO LININGS CORPORATION, TRI-ISO TRYLINE, LLC, UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC Affiant: Jason S. Hartley. (Attachments: #1 Table of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (Pietragallo, William)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 268 MOTION for Reappointment of Jason Hartley and Megan Jones as Interim Co-Lead Counsel and Reappointment of William Pietragallo, II as Interim Liaison Counsel by NPC COATING, INC., RHINO LININGS CORPORATION, TRI-ISO TRYLINE, LLC, UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Pietragallo, William)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER re #264 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by RHINO LININGS CORPORATION, NPC COATING, INC., TRI-ISO TRYLINE, LLC, UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC. Plaintiffs' claims against Defendants Bayer A.G. and Bayer Corporation are hereby voluntarily dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 1/27/20. (cha)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 266 REPLY BRIEF re #224 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,, (Defendants Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. and Mitsui Chemicals America, Inc.'s Supplemental Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(6)) filed by MITSUI CHEMICALS AMERICA, INC, MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC. (Farmer, William)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 265 REPLY BRIEF re #229 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by BASF SE, COVESTRO AG, MITSUI CHEMICALS & SKC POLYURETHANES, INC, MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC, WANHUA CHEMICAL GROUP CO. LTD. (Terzaken, John )
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 264 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of Bayer A.G. and Bayer Corporation by NPC COATING, INC., RHINO LININGS CORPORATION, TRI-ISO TRYLINE, LLC, UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC (Pietragallo, William)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 263 REPLY BRIEF re #224 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,, filed by WANHUA CHEMICAL AMERICA CO. LTD, WANHUA CHEMICAL GROUP CO. LTD. (Atkins, Alden)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 262 REPLY BRIEF re #224 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,, (Supplemental Reply Brief in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6)) filed by BASF CORP., BASF SE. (Marovitz, Andrew)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 261 REPLY BRIEF re #224 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,, (Huntsman's Supplemental Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Joint Motion To Dismiss) filed by HUNTSMAN CORP., HUNTSMAN INTERNATIONAL LLC. (Schmidtlein, John)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 260 REPLY BRIEF re #224 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,, filed by MCNS POLYURETHANES USA INC. (Braver, Samuel)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 259 REPLY BRIEF re #224 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,, (Supplemental Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss the Corrected Consolidated Amended Class-Action Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6)) filed by DOW CHEMICAL CO.. (Bernick, David)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 258 NOTICE of Hague Convention Service on Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. by NPC COATING, INC., RHINO LININGS CORPORATION, TRI-ISO TRYLINE, LLC, UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Pietragallo, William)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 257 REPLY BRIEF re #224 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,, filed by BASF CORP., BASF SE, COVESTRO AG, COVESTRO LLC, DOW CHEMICAL CO., HUNTSMAN CORP., HUNTSMAN INTERNATIONAL LLC, MCNS POLYURETHANES USA INC, MITSUI CHEMICALS & SKC POLYURETHANES, INC, MITSUI CHEMICALS AMERICA, INC, MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC, WANHUA CHEMICAL AMERICA CO. LTD, WANHUA CHEMICAL GROUP CO. LTD. (Schmidtlein, John)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 256 Errata re #255 Declaration, by BASF CORP., BASF SE, BAYER A.G., BAYER CORP., COVESTRO AG, COVESTRO LLC, DOW CHEMICAL CO., HUNTSMAN CORP., HUNTSMAN INTERNATIONAL LLC, MCNS POLYURETHANES USA INC, MITSUI CHEMICALS & SKC POLYURETHANES, INC, MITSUI CHEMICALS AMERICA, INC, MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC, WANHUA CHEMICAL AMERICA CO. LTD, WANHUA CHEMICAL GROUP CO. LTD. Reason for Correction: Incorrect Date. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Braver, Samuel)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 255 DECLARATION re #253 MOTION to Stay Discovery by BASF CORP., BASF SE, BAYER A.G., BAYER CORP., COVESTRO AG, COVESTRO LLC, DOW CHEMICAL CO., HUNTSMAN CORP., HUNTSMAN INTERNATIONAL LLC, MCNS POLYURETHANES USA INC, MITSUI CHEMICALS & SKC POLYURETHANES, INC, MITSUI CHEMICALS AMERICA, INC, MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC, WANHUA CHEMICAL AMERICA CO. LTD, WANHUA CHEMICAL GROUP CO. LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Braver, Samuel)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 254 BRIEF in Support re #253 Motion to Stay, Discovery filed by BASF CORP., BASF SE, BAYER A.G., BAYER CORP., COVESTRO AG, COVESTRO LLC, DOW CHEMICAL CO., HUNTSMAN CORP., HUNTSMAN INTERNATIONAL LLC, MCNS POLYURETHANES USA INC, MITSUI CHEMICALS & SKC POLYURETHANES, INC, MITSUI CHEMICALS AMERICA, INC, MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC, WANHUA CHEMICAL AMERICA CO. LTD, WANHUA CHEMICAL GROUP CO. LTD. (Braver, Samuel)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 253 MOTION to Stay Discovery by BASF CORP., BASF SE, BAYER A.G., BAYER CORP., COVESTRO AG, COVESTRO LLC, DOW CHEMICAL CO., HUNTSMAN CORP., HUNTSMAN INTERNATIONAL LLC, MCNS POLYURETHANES USA INC, MITSUI CHEMICALS & SKC POLYURETHANES, INC, MITSUI CHEMICALS AMERICA, INC, MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC, WANHUA CHEMICAL AMERICA CO. LTD, WANHUA CHEMICAL GROUP CO. LTD. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Braver, Samuel)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER granting #251 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Laura Alexander terminated. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 1/2/20. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ask)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 251 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by ERA POLYMERS PROPRIETARY LIMITED. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Alexander, Laura)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 250 SEALED DOCUMENT by NPC COATING, INC., RHINO LININGS CORPORATION, TRI-ISO TRYLINE, LLC, UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC. This document Sealed pursuant to #241 Order on Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. (Attachments: #1 Table of Contents, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W, #25 Exhibit X, #26 Exhibit Y, #27 Exhibit Z, #28 Exhibit AA, #29 Exhibit BB, #30 Exhibit CC, #31 Exhibit DD, #32 Exhibit EE, #33 Exhibit FF, #34 Exhibit GG, #35 Exhibit HH, #36 Exhibit II, #37 Exhibit JJ, #38 Exhibit KK, #39 Exhibit LL, #40 Exhibit MM, #41 Exhibit NN, #42 Exhibit OO, #43 Exhibit PP, #44 Exhibit QQ, #45 Exhibit RR, #46 Exhibit SS, #47 Exhibit TT, #48 Exhibit UU, #49 Exhibit VV, #50 Exhibit XX, #51 Exhibit YY, #52 Exhibit ZZ, #53 Exhibit AAA, #54 Exhibit BBB, #55 Exhibit CCC, #56 Exhibit DDD, #57 Exhibit EEE, #58 Exhibit FFF, #59 Exhibit GGG, #60 Exhibit HHH, #61 Exhibit III, #62 Exhibit JJJ, #63 Exhibit KKK, #64 Exhibit LLL, #65 Exhibit MMM, #66 Exhibit NNN, #67 Exhibit OOO, #68 Exhibit PPP, #69 Exhibit QQQ, #70 Exhibit RRR, #71 Exhibit SSS, #72 Exhibit TTT, #73 Exhibit UUU, #74 Exhibit VVV, #75 Exhibit WWW, #76 Exhibit XXX, #77 Exhibit YYY, #78 Exhibit ZZZ) (jjg)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 249 SEALED DOCUMENT by NPC COATING, INC., RHINO LININGS CORPORATION, TRI-ISO TRYLINE, LLC, UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC. This document Sealed pursuant to #241 Order on Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. (jjg)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 248 SEALED DOCUMENT by NPC COATING, INC., RHINO LININGS CORPORATION, TRI-ISO TRYLINE, LLC, UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC. This document Sealed pursuant to #241 Order on Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. (jjg)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 247 SEALED DOCUMENT by NPC COATING, INC., RHINO LININGS CORPORATION, TRI-ISO TRYLINE, LLC, UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC. This document Sealed pursuant to #241 Order on Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. (jjg)
December 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 246 REDACTION to #245 Redacted Document, Declaration of Jason S. Hartley in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Foreign Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(2) for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by NPC COATING, INC., RHINO LININGS CORPORATION, TRI-ISO TRYLINE, LLC, UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Table of Contents of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W, #25 Exhibit X, #26 Exhibit Y, #27 Exhibit Z, #28 Exhibit AA, #29 Exhibit BB, #30 Exhibit CC, #31 Exhibit DD, #32 Exhibit EE, #33 Exhibit FF, #34 Exhibit GG, #35 Exhibit HH, #36 Exhibit II, #37 Exhibit JJ, #38 Exhibit KK, #39 Exhibit LL, #40 Exhibit MM, #41 Exhibit NN, #42 Exhibit OO, #43 Exhibit PP, #44 Exhibit QQ, #45 Exhibit RR, #46 Exhibit SS, #47 Exhibit TT, #48 Exhibit UU, #49 Exhibit VV, #50 Exhibit XX, #51 Exhibit YY, #52 Exhibit ZZ, #53 Exhibit AAA, #54 Exhibit BBB, #55 Exhibit CCC, #56 Exhibit DDD, #57 Exhibit EEE, #58 Exhibit FFF, #59 Exhibit GGG, #60 Exhibit HHH, #61 Exhibit III, #62 Exhibit JJJ, #63 Exhibit KKK, #64 Exhibit LLL, #65 Exhibit MMM, #66 Exhibit NNN, #67 Exhibit OOO, #68 Exhibit PPP, #69 Exhibit QQQ, #70 Exhibit RRR, #71 Exhibit SSS, #72 Exhibit TTT, #73 Exhibit UUU, #74 Exhibit VVV, #75 Exhibit WWW, #76 Exhibit XXX, #77 Exhibit YYY, #78 Exhibit ZZZ) (Pietragallo, William)
December 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 245 REDACTION Plaintiffs' Opposition to Foreign Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(2) for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by NPC COATING, INC., RHINO LININGS CORPORATION, TRI-ISO TRYLINE, LLC, UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC. (Pietragallo, William)
December 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 244 REDACTION Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Defendants' Supplemental Memoranda Supporting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by NPC COATING, INC., RHINO LININGS CORPORATION, TRI-ISO TRYLINE, LLC, UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC. (Pietragallo, William)
December 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 243 REDACTION Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Joint Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss the Corrected Consolidated Amended Class-Action Complaint by NPC COATING, INC., RHINO LININGS CORPORATION, TRI-ISO TRYLINE, LLC, UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC. (Pietragallo, William)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 242 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 12-3-19 before Judge Donetta W. Ambrose. Court Reporter Barbara Metz Leo, Telephone number 412-583-7557. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely, electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. For redaction purposes, or otherwise, during this 90 day period a copy of the transcript may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and Redaction Request must be separately mailed to the court reporter of said proceedings. Notice of Intent for Redaction of Personal Data Identifiers due by 12/27/2019. Redaction Request due 1/10/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/21/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/19/2020. (bml) Modified text on 12/30/2019. (jjg) Modified text on 1/22/2020. (jjg)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER granting #240 MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. After receiving notice of the order of court, you must provide the sealed document to the Clerk of Courts both on paper and on disk, in pdf format. In the alternative, you may contact the Intake Section and make arrangements to email the pdf to the Clerk of Courts. The sealed version of the document WILL NOT be docketed by the Clerk of Court until the party electronically files the redacted version of the documents (using Redacted Document event located under Other Documents), unless otherwise ordered by the Court. You would be required to serve the sealed document on counsel using traditional service methods. Decision to Unseal Document deferred. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 12/11/19. (sps) Modified text on 12/12/2019. (jjg)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 240 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal by NPC COATING, INC., RHINO LININGS CORPORATION, TRI-ISO TRYLINE, LLC, UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Pietragallo, William)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 239 Order Governing the Protection and Exchange of Confidential Material. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 12/10/19. (sps)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 238 STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Expert Materials and Communications. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 12/3/19. (sps)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER: A Telephonic Status Conference is set for 2/20/2020 at 12:00 PM Eastern Standard Time before Judge Donetta W. Ambrose. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 12/3/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sps)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 236 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Donetta W. Ambrose: Status Conference held on 12/3/2019. (Court Reporter: Barbara Leo) (sps)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #224 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. ERROR: Document should have been filed as two separate documents. CORRECTION: Attorney advised in future that documents of that nature are to be filed as separate documents. Clerk of Court docketed Brief in Support of Motion. This message is for informational purposes only. (jm)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 235 BRIEF in Support re #224 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, filed by BASF CORP., BASF SE, BAYER A.G., BAYER CORP., COVESTRO AG, COVESTRO LLC, DOW CHEMICAL CO., HUNTSMAN CORP., HUNTSMAN INTERNATIONAL LLC, MCNS POLYURETHANES USA INC, MITSUI CHEMICALS & SKC POLYURETHANES, INC, MITSUI CHEMICALS AMERICA, INC, MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC, WANHUA CHEMICAL AMERICA CO. LTD, WANHUA CHEMICAL GROUP CO. LTD. (jm)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 234 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF in Support re #224 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. and Mitsui Chemicals America, Inc.'s Supplemental Memorandum in Support of to Motion to Dismiss filed by MITSUI CHEMICALS AMERICA, INC, MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC. (Farmer, William) Modified text on 11/14/2019. (jm)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 233 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF in Support re #232 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by BAYER A.G., BAYER CORP.. (Terzaken, John ) Modified text on 11/14/2019. (jm)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 232 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by BAYER A.G., BAYER CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Terzaken, John )
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 231 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF in Support re #229 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by BASF SE, BAYER A.G., COVESTRO AG, MCNS, MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC, WANHUA CHEMICAL GROUP CO. LTD. (Terzaken, John ) Modified text on 11/14/2019. (jm)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 230 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF in Support re #224 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, filed by WANHUA CHEMICAL AMERICA CO. LTD, WANHUA CHEMICAL GROUP CO. LTD. (Atkins, Alden) Modified text on 11/14/2019. (jm)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 229 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by BASF SE, BAYER A.G., COVESTRO AG, MCNS, MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC, WANHUA CHEMICAL GROUP CO. LTD. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Terzaken, John )
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 228 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF in Support re #224 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, filed by BASF CORP., BASF SE. (Marovitz, Andrew) Modified text on 11/14/2019. (jm)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 227 BRIEF in Support re #226 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by MCNS POLYURETHANES USA INC. (Braver, Samuel)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 226 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by MCNS POLYURETHANES USA INC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Braver, Samuel)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 225 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF in Support re #224 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, filed by HUNTSMAN CORP., HUNTSMAN INTERNATIONAL LLC. (Schmidtlein, John) Modified text on 11/14/2019. (jm)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 224 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by BASF CORP., BASF SE, BAYER A.G., BAYER CORP., COVESTRO AG, COVESTRO LLC, DOW CHEMICAL CO., HUNTSMAN CORP., HUNTSMAN INTERNATIONAL LLC, MCNS POLYURETHANES USA INC, MITSUI CHEMICALS & SKC POLYURETHANES, INC, MITSUI CHEMICALS AMERICA, INC, MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC, WANHUA CHEMICAL AMERICA CO. LTD, WANHUA CHEMICAL GROUP CO. LTD. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Proposed Order) (Schmidtlein, John) Attachment #1 is hidden from public view and redocketed at #235 . Modified text on 11/14/2019. (jm)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER granting #222 MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. After receiving notice of the order of court, you must provide the sealed document to the Clerk of Courts both on paper and on disk, in pdf format. In the alternative, you may contact the Intake Section and make arrangements to email the pdf to the Clerk of Courts. The sealed version of the document WILL NOT be docketed by the Clerk of Court until the party electronically files the redacted version of the documents (using Redacted Document event located under Other Documents), unless otherwise ordered by the Court. You would be required to serve the sealed document on counsel using traditional service methods. Decision to Unseal Document deferred.. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/12/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (slh) Modified text on 11/15/2019. (jjg)
November 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 222 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal Memorandum of Law by MCNS POLYURETHANES USA INC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Pilsner, Matthew)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER granting #220 Motion for Mark S. Levinstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/8/19. (slh)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 220 MOTION for attorney Mark S. Levinstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5353148) by HUNTSMAN CORP., HUNTSMAN INTERNATIONAL LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Levinstein, Mark)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER granting #218 Motion for John E. Schmidtlein to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/7/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ask)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 218 MOTION for attorney John E. Schmidtlein to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5351343) by HUNTSMAN CORP., HUNTSMAN INTERNATIONAL LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Schmidtlein, John)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER granting in part #214 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages and granting in part #215 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages as more fully set forth in the order. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/6/19. (slh)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 216 BRIEF in Support re #215 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by NPC COATING, INC., RHINO LININGS CORPORATION, TRI-ISO TRYLINE, LLC, UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Pietragallo, William)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 215 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by NPC COATING, INC., RHINO LININGS CORPORATION, TRI-ISO TRYLINE, LLC, UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Pietragallo, William)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 214 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by BAYER A.G., BAYER CORP., COVESTRO AG, COVESTRO LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Terzaken, John )
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER: A Status Conference is set for 12/3/2019 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 3B before Judge Donetta W. Ambrose. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 10/21/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (slh)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 212 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Pietragallo, William)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 211 NOTICE Confirming Completion of Service on All Defendants Pursuant to the Court's September 17, 2019 Order (ECF No. 209) by BRYN HILL INDUSTRIES, INC., C.U.E., INC., ELLIOTT COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, INC., EMMA CHEMICALS CO., INC., ERA POLYMERS PROPRIETARY LIMITED, FINISHING SOLUTIONS LLC, ISAAC INDUSTRIES, INC., NPC COATING, INC., RHINO LININGS CORPORATION, TRI-ISO TRYLINE, LLC, UNICAST, INC., UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC (Pietragallo, William)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 210 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BRYN HILL INDUSTRIES, INC., C.U.E., INC., ELLIOTT COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, INC., EMMA CHEMICALS CO., INC., ERA POLYMERS PROPRIETARY LIMITED, FINISHING SOLUTIONS LLC, ISAAC INDUSTRIES, INC., NPC COATING, INC., RHINO LININGS CORPORATION, TRI-ISO TRYLINE, LLC, UNICAST, INC., UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Table of Contents, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F) (Pietragallo, William)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER granting in part and denying as moot in part #204 Plaintiffs' Motion for Alternative Service of Foreign Defendants. Plaintiffs' Motion as it relates to Defendant Wanhua is denied as moot. Plaintiffs' Motion is granted with respect to Defendant Mitsui as more fully set forth in the Order. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 9/17/19. (sps)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 208 BRIEF in Opposition re #204 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, (Defendant Mitsui Chemicals, Inc.'s Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Alternative Service of Foreign Defendants Wanhua and Mitsui) filed by MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC. (Farmer, William)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 207 RESPONSE to Motion re #204 MOTION for Alternative Service of Foreign Defendants Wanhua and Mitsui filed by WANHUA CHEMICAL AMERICA CO. LTD, WANHUA CHEMICAL GROUP CO. LTD. (Atkins, Alden)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER re #204 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, filed by ISAAC INDUSTRIES, INC., ELLIOTT COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, INC., BRYN HILL INDUSTRIES, INC., NPC COATING, INC., UNICAST, INC., FINISHING SOLUTIONS LLC, ERA POLYMERS PROPRIETARY LIMITED, RHINO LININGS CORPORATION, TRI-ISO TRYLINE, LLC, UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC, C.U.E., INC., EMMA CHEMICALS CO., INC. : Response to Motion due by 9/13/2019. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 9/6/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (slh)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 205 BRIEF in Support re #204 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, filed by BRYN HILL INDUSTRIES, INC., C.U.E., INC., ELLIOTT COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, INC., EMMA CHEMICALS CO., INC., ERA POLYMERS PROPRIETARY LIMITED, FINISHING SOLUTIONS LLC, ISAAC INDUSTRIES, INC., NPC COATING, INC., RHINO LININGS CORPORATION, TRI-ISO TRYLINE, LLC, UNICAST, INC., UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC. (Pietragallo, William)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 204 MOTION for Alternative Service of Foreign Defendants Wanhua and Mitsui by BRYN HILL INDUSTRIES, INC., C.U.E., INC., ELLIOTT COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, INC., EMMA CHEMICALS CO., INC., ERA POLYMERS PROPRIETARY LIMITED, FINISHING SOLUTIONS LLC, ISAAC INDUSTRIES, INC., NPC COATING, INC., RHINO LININGS CORPORATION, TRI-ISO TRYLINE, LLC, UNICAST, INC., UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Pietragallo, William)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 203 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Donetta W. Ambrose: Telephonic Status Conference held on 9/3/2019. (Court Reporter: none) (sps)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER: A Telephonic Status Conference is set for 9/3/2019 at 2:00 PM in Suite 3280 before Judge Donetta W. Ambrose. Liaison counsel is to set up the call and to provide the Court with a call-in number. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 8/27/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sps)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 201 STATUS REPORT Regarding Service of Process on Foreign Defendants by BRYN HILL INDUSTRIES, INC., C.U.E., INC., ELLIOTT COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, INC., EMMA CHEMICALS CO., INC., ERA POLYMERS PROPRIETARY LIMITED, FINISHING SOLUTIONS LLC, ISAAC INDUSTRIES, INC., NPC COATING, INC., RHINO LININGS CORPORATION, TRI-ISO TRYLINE, LLC, UNICAST, INC., UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC. (Pietragallo, William)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER denying without prejudice #193 Motion. Service of process shall continue in accordance with the Convention. If service occurs on all Foreign Defendants, except China, prior to August 23, 2019, Plaintiffs shall advise the Court immediately via a status report. Otherwise, Plaintiffs shall file a status report apprising the Court of service on August 23, 2019. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 5/29/19. (slh)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 199 REPLY BRIEF in Support of #193 Motion for Alternative Service of Foreign Defendants filed by BRYN HILL INDUSTRIES, INC., C.U.E., INC., ELLIOTT COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, INC., EMMA CHEMICALS CO., INC., ERA POLYMERS PROPRIETARY LIMITED, FINISHING SOLUTIONS LLC, ISAAC INDUSTRIES, INC., NPC COATING, INC., RHINO LININGS CORPORATION, TRI-ISO TRYLINE, LLC, UNICAST, INC., UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC. (Pietragallo, William) Modified text on 5/29/2019. (jjg)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER re #197 Response in Opposition: As requested, Plaintiffs may file Reply to the Response on or before 5/28/2019. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 5/23/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (slh)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 197 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to #193 Motion for Alternative Service of Foreign Defendants, filed by BAYER A.G., BAYER CORP., COVESTRO AG, COVESTRO LLC, MITSUI CHEMICALS AMERICA, INC, MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC, WANHUA CHEMICAL AMERICA CO. LTD, WANHUA CHEMICAL GROUP CO. LTD. (Atkins, Alden) Modified text on 5/22/2019. (jjg)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER Response/Briefing Schedule re #193 Motion for Alternative Service of Foreign Defendants Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(f)(3). Defendants' Response to the Motion and Brief in Opposition are due by 5/21/2019. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 5/7/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sps)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 195 BRIEF in Support re #193 Motion for Alternative Service of Foreign Defendants Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(f)(3) filed by BRYN HILL INDUSTRIES, INC., C.U.E., INC., ELLIOTT COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, INC., EMMA CHEMICALS CO., INC., ERA POLYMERS PROPRIETARY LIMITED, FINISHING SOLUTIONS LLC, ISAAC INDUSTRIES, INC., NPC COATING, INC., RHINO LININGS CORPORATION, TRI-ISO TRYLINE, LLC, UNICAST, INC., UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC. (Pietragallo, William) Modified text on 5/7/2019. (jjg)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 194 DECLARATION re #193 Renewed MOTION for Alternative Service of Foreign Defendants Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(f)(3) by BRYN HILL INDUSTRIES, INC., C.U.E., INC., ELLIOTT COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, INC., EMMA CHEMICALS CO., INC., ERA POLYMERS PROPRIETARY LIMITED, FINISHING SOLUTIONS LLC, ISAAC INDUSTRIES, INC., NPC COATING, INC., RHINO LININGS CORPORATION, TRI-ISO TRYLINE, LLC, UNICAST, INC., UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC Affiant: Jason S. Hartley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Table of Contents, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E) (Pietragallo, William)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 193 Renewed MOTION for Alternative Service of Foreign Defendants Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(f)(3) by BRYN HILL INDUSTRIES, INC., C.U.E., INC., ELLIOTT COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, INC., EMMA CHEMICALS CO., INC., ERA POLYMERS PROPRIETARY LIMITED, FINISHING SOLUTIONS LLC, ISAAC INDUSTRIES, INC., NPC COATING, INC., RHINO LININGS CORPORATION, TRI-ISO TRYLINE, LLC, UNICAST, INC., UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Pietragallo, William)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER granting #191 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Courtney Elgart terminated. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 5/6/19. (cha)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 191 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by ERA POLYMERS PROPRIETARY LIMITED. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Elgart, Courtney )
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 190 RESPONSE to #187 Status Report,, filed by BASF CORP., BAYER CORP., COVESTRO LLC, MCNS POLYURETHANES USA INC, MITSUI CHEMICALS AMERICA, INC, WANHUA CHEMICAL AMERICA CO. LTD. (Atkins, Alden)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 189 DECLARATION re #187 Status Report, by BRYN HILL INDUSTRIES, INC., C.U.E., INC., ELLIOTT COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, INC., EMMA CHEMICALS CO., INC., ERA POLYMERS PROPRIETARY LIMITED, FINISHING SOLUTIONS LLC, ISAAC INDUSTRIES, INC., NPC COATING, INC., RHINO LININGS CORPORATION, TRI-ISO TRYLINE, LLC, UNICAST, INC., UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC Affiant: Anthony Mboho. (Pietragallo, William)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 188 DECLARATION re #187 Status Report, by BRYN HILL INDUSTRIES, INC., C.U.E., INC., ELLIOTT COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, INC., EMMA CHEMICALS CO., INC., ERA POLYMERS PROPRIETARY LIMITED, FINISHING SOLUTIONS LLC, ISAAC INDUSTRIES, INC., NPC COATING, INC., RHINO LININGS CORPORATION, TRI-ISO TRYLINE, LLC, UNICAST, INC., UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC Affiant: Jason S. Hartley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Pietragallo, William)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 187 STATUS REPORT Regarding Service of Process on Foreign Defendants by BRYN HILL INDUSTRIES, INC., C.U.E., INC., ELLIOTT COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, INC., EMMA CHEMICALS CO., INC., ERA POLYMERS PROPRIETARY LIMITED, FINISHING SOLUTIONS LLC, ISAAC INDUSTRIES, INC., NPC COATING, INC., RHINO LININGS CORPORATION, TRI-ISO TRYLINE, LLC, UNICAST, INC., UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC. (Pietragallo, William)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 186 Summons Issued as to BASF SE, BAYER A.G., COVESTRO AG, MCNS, MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC, WANHUA CHEMICAL GROUP CO. LTD (av)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 185 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by BRYN HILL INDUSTRIES, INC., C.U.E., INC., ELLIOTT COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, INC., EMMA CHEMICALS CO., INC., ERA POLYMERS PROPRIETARY LIMITED, FINISHING SOLUTIONS LLC, ISAAC INDUSTRIES, INC., NPC COATING, INC., RHINO LININGS CORPORATION, TRI-ISO TRYLINE, LLC, UNICAST, INC., UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC (Attachments: #1 Summons - BASF SE) (Pietragallo, William)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 184 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by BRYN HILL INDUSTRIES, INC., C.U.E., INC., ELLIOTT COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, INC., EMMA CHEMICALS CO., INC., ERA POLYMERS PROPRIETARY LIMITED, FINISHING SOLUTIONS LLC, ISAAC INDUSTRIES, INC., NPC COATING, INC., RHINO LININGS CORPORATION, TRI-ISO TRYLINE, LLC, UNICAST, INC., UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC (Attachments: #1 Summons - Bayer AG) (Pietragallo, William)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 183 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by BRYN HILL INDUSTRIES, INC., C.U.E., INC., ELLIOTT COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, INC., EMMA CHEMICALS CO., INC., ERA POLYMERS PROPRIETARY LIMITED, FINISHING SOLUTIONS LLC, ISAAC INDUSTRIES, INC., NPC COATING, INC., RHINO LININGS CORPORATION, TRI-ISO TRYLINE, LLC, UNICAST, INC., UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC (Attachments: #1 Summons - Covestro AG) (Pietragallo, William)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 182 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by BRYN HILL INDUSTRIES, INC., C.U.E., INC., ELLIOTT COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, INC., EMMA CHEMICALS CO., INC., ERA POLYMERS PROPRIETARY LIMITED, FINISHING SOLUTIONS LLC, ISAAC INDUSTRIES, INC., NPC COATING, INC., RHINO LININGS CORPORATION, TRI-ISO TRYLINE, LLC, UNICAST, INC., UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC (Attachments: #1 Summons - MCNS (a/k/a Mitsui Chemicals & SKC Polyurethanes, Inc.)) (Pietragallo, William)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 181 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by BRYN HILL INDUSTRIES, INC., C.U.E., INC., ELLIOTT COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, INC., EMMA CHEMICALS CO., INC., ERA POLYMERS PROPRIETARY LIMITED, FINISHING SOLUTIONS LLC, ISAAC INDUSTRIES, INC., NPC COATING, INC., RHINO LININGS CORPORATION, TRI-ISO TRYLINE, LLC, UNICAST, INC., UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC (Attachments: #1 Summons - Mitsui Chemicals, Inc.) (Pietragallo, William)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 180 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by BRYN HILL INDUSTRIES, INC., C.U.E., INC., ELLIOTT COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, INC., EMMA CHEMICALS CO., INC., ERA POLYMERS PROPRIETARY LIMITED, FINISHING SOLUTIONS LLC, ISAAC INDUSTRIES, INC., NPC COATING, INC., RHINO LININGS CORPORATION, TRI-ISO TRYLINE, LLC, UNICAST, INC., UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC (Attachments: #1 Summons - Wanhua Chemical Group, Co.) (Pietragallo, William)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER granting #178 Motion for Ian J. Engdahl to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 4/8/19. (cha)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 178 MOTION for attorney Ian J. Engdahl to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5090660) by UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Ian J. Engdahl, #2 Proposed Order) (Engdahl, Ian)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 177 Disclosure Statement identifying Dow Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by DOW CHEMICAL CO.. (Streit, Ryan)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER granting #175 Motion for Stephanie Cho to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 3/28/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ask)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 175 MOTION for attorney Stephanie Y. Cho to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5079243) by UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Stephanie Y. Cho, #2 Proposed Order) (Cho, Stephanie)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 174 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jason S. Hartley (Hartley, Jason)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER denying #155 Motion For Alternative Service of Process. As set forth more fully in the attached Order, the Motion is denied, without prejudice. Plaintiffs shall in good faith and without delay attempt service of process in accordance with The Hague Convention on the Service Abroad of Judicial and Extrajudicial Documents. Within 60 days of the date of this Order, Plaintiffs shall file a status report apprising the Court of the status of such attempts. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 2/25/19. (cha)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER granting #170 Motion for Jessica N. Servais to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 2/25/19. (cha)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 171 REPLY BRIEF re #155 Motion for Alternative Service of Foreign Defendants filed by BRYN HILL INDUSTRIES, INC., C.U.E., INC., ELLIOTT COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, INC., EMMA CHEMICALS CO., INC., ERA POLYMERS PROPRIETARY LIMITED, FINISHING SOLUTIONS LLC, ISAAC INDUSTRIES, INC., NPC COATING, INC., RHINO LININGS CORPORATION, TRI-ISO TRYLINE, LLC, UNICAST, INC., UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC. (Pietragallo, William) Modified text on 2/25/2019. (jjg)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 170 MOTION for attorney Jessica N. Servais to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5039430) by RHINO LININGS CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jessica Servais, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Servais, Jessica)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 169 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to #155 Motion for Alternative Service of Foreign Defendants, filed by BASF CORP., BASF SE, BAYER A.G., BAYER CORP., COVESTRO AG, COVESTRO LLC, MCNS POLYURETHANES USA INC, MITSUI CHEMICALS & SKC POLYURETHANES, INC, MITSUI CHEMICALS AMERICA, INC, MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC, WANHUA CHEMICAL AMERICA CO. LTD, WANHUA CHEMICAL GROUP CO. LTD. (Attachments: #1 Table of Contents of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L) (Atkins, Alden) Modified text on 2/19/2019. (jjg)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER granting #167 Motion for Jason M. Lindner to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 2/6/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (slh)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 167 MOTION for attorney Jason M. Lindner to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5018157) by RHINO LININGS CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jason M. Lindner, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Lindner, Jason)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER re #154 Stipulation filed by IN RE: DIISOCYANATES ANTITRUST LITIGATION. Set Briefing Schedule: Brief in Opposition due by 2/15/2019; Reply brief, not to exceed 5 pages, due by 2/22/2019. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 2/4/19. (slh)
February 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 166 SEALED DOCUMENT by NPC COATING, INC., RHINO LININGS CORPORATION, TRI-ISO TRYLINE, LLC, UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC. This document Sealed pursuant to #153 Order on Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. (jjg)
February 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 163 REDACTION CORRECTED CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS-ACTION COMPLAINT by NPC COATING, INC., RHINO LININGS CORPORATION, TRI-ISO TRYLINE, LLC, UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC. (Pietragallo, William)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 165 SEALED DOCUMENT by ELLIOTT COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, INC., NPC COATING, INC., RHINO LININGS CORPORATION, TRI-ISO TRYLINE, LLC, UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC. This document Sealed pursuant to #153 Order on Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. (jjg)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 162 REDACTION Consolidated Amended Class-Action Complaint by ELLIOTT COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, INC., NPC COATING, INC., RHINO LININGS CORPORATION, TRI-ISO TRYLINE, LLC, UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC. (Pietragallo, William)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER granting #160 Motion for Douglas Dellaccio to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 1/31/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ask)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 160 MOTION for attorney Douglas A. Dellaccio, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5011124) by UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Douglas A. Dellaccio, Jr., #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Dellaccio, Douglas)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 159 NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah Elman on behalf of FINISHING SOLUTIONS LLC. (Elman, Deborah)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 158 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert G. Eisler on behalf of FINISHING SOLUTIONS LLC. (Eisler, Robert)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 157 BRIEF in Support re #155 Motion for Alternative Service of Foreign Defendants pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(f)(3), filed by BRYN HILL INDUSTRIES, INC., C.U.E., INC., ELLIOTT COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, INC., EMMA CHEMICALS CO., INC., ERA POLYMERS PROPRIETARY LIMITED, FINISHING SOLUTIONS LLC, ISAAC INDUSTRIES, INC., NPC COATING, INC., RHINO LININGS CORPORATION, TRI-ISO TRYLINE, LLC, UNICAST, INC., UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC. (Pietragallo, William) Modified text on 1/30/2019. (jjg)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 156 DECLARATION re #155 MOTION for Alternative Service of Foreign Defendants Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(f)(3) by BRYN HILL INDUSTRIES, INC., C.U.E., INC., ELLIOTT COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, INC., EMMA CHEMICALS CO., INC., ERA POLYMERS PROPRIETARY LIMITED, FINISHING SOLUTIONS LLC, ISAAC INDUSTRIES, INC., NPC COATING, INC., RHINO LININGS CORPORATION, TRI-ISO TRYLINE, LLC, UNICAST, INC., UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC Affiant: Jason S. Hartley. (Pietragallo, William)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 155 MOTION for Alternative Service of Foreign Defendants Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(f)(3) by BRYN HILL INDUSTRIES, INC., C.U.E., INC., ELLIOTT COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, INC., EMMA CHEMICALS CO., INC., ERA POLYMERS PROPRIETARY LIMITED, FINISHING SOLUTIONS LLC, ISAAC INDUSTRIES, INC., NPC COATING, INC., RHINO LININGS CORPORATION, TRI-ISO TRYLINE, LLC, UNICAST, INC., UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Pietragallo, William)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 154 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Regarding Plaintiffs' Motion for Alternative Service of Foreign Defendants Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(f)(3) by IN RE: DIISOCYANATES ANTITRUST LITIGATION. (Pietragallo, William)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER granting #152 MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. After receiving notice of the order of court, you must provide the sealed document to the Clerk of Courts both on paper and on disk, in pdf format. In the alternative, you may contact the Intake Section and make arrangements to email the pdf to the Clerk of Courts. The sealed version of the document WILL NOT be docketed by the Clerk of Court until the party electronically files the redacted version of the documents (using Redacted Document event located under Other Documents), unless otherwise ordered by the Court. You would be required to serve the sealed document on counsel using traditional service methods. Decision to Unseal Document deferred. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 1/28/19. (sps) Modified text on 1/29/2019. (jjg)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 152 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal Consolidated Complaint by BRYN HILL INDUSTRIES, INC., C.U.E., INC., ELLIOTT COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, INC., EMMA CHEMICALS CO., INC., ERA POLYMERS PROPRIETARY LIMITED, FINISHING SOLUTIONS LLC, ISAAC INDUSTRIES, INC., NPC COATING, INC., RHINO LININGS CORPORATION, TRI-ISO TRYLINE, LLC, UNICAST, INC., UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Pietragallo, William)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER granting #150 Motion for Samuel S. Choi to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 1/17/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ask)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 150 MOTION for attorney Samuel S. Choi to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4996380) by MCNS POLYURETHANES USA INC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Choi, Samuel)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER granting #138 Plaintiffs' Motion for Production of Documents Previously Produced to Department of Justice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 1/15/19. (sps)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 148 REPLY to Response to Motion re #138 Motion for Production of Documents Previously Produced to Department of Justice, filed by BRYN HILL INDUSTRIES, INC., C.U.E., INC., ELLIOTT COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, INC., EMMA CHEMICALS CO., INC., ERA POLYMERS PROPRIETARY LIMITED, FINISHING SOLUTIONS LLC, ISAAC INDUSTRIES, INC., NPC COATING, INC., RHINO LININGS CORPORATION, TRI-ISO TRYLINE, LLC, UNICAST, INC., UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC. (Pietragallo, William) Modified text on 1/15/2019. (jjg)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 147 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to #138 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, filed by BASF CORP., BAYER CORP., COVESTRO LLC, DOW CHEMICAL CO., DOWDUPONT INC, HUNTSMAN CORP., HUNTSMAN INTERNATIONAL LLC, WANHUA CHEMICAL AMERICA CO. LTD, WANHUA CHEMICAL US HOLDING, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Warren, Zachary)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 146 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11-27-18 before Judge Donetta W. Ambrose. Court Reporter Barbara Metz Leo, Telephone number 412-583-7557. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely, electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. For redaction purposes, or otherwise, during this 90 day period a copy of the transcript may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and Redaction Request must be separately mailed to the court reporter of said proceedings. Notice of Intent for Redaction of Personal Data Identifiers due by 1/3/2019. Redaction Request due 1/17/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/28/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/27/2019. (bml) Modified text on 1/4/2019. (jjg) Modified text on 1/29/2019. (jjg)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER granting #137 Motion for Jennifer M. Oliver to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 12/26/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sps)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER granting #136 Motion for Jodie Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 12/26/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sps)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER granting #135 Motion for Jonathan L. Rubin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 12/26/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sps)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER granting #134 Motion for Daniel Mogin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 12/26/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sps) Modified text on 12/26/2018. (sps)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER granting #133 Motion for Daniel J. Walker to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 12/26/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sps)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 140 BRIEF in Support re #138 Motion for Production of Documents Previously Produced to Department of Justice, filed by BRYN HILL INDUSTRIES, INC., C.U.E., INC., ELLIOTT COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, INC., EMMA CHEMICALS CO., INC., ERA POLYMERS PROPRIETARY LIMITED, FINISHING SOLUTIONS LLC, IN RE: DIISOCYANATES ANTITRUST LITIGATION, ISAAC INDUSTRIES, INC., NPC COATING, INC., RHINO LININGS CORPORATION, TRI-ISO TRYLINE, LLC, UNICAST, INC., UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC. (Pietragallo, William) Modified text on 12/26/2018. (jjg)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 139 DECLARATION of Jason S. Hartley in Support re #138 MOTION for Production of Documents Previously Produced to Department of Justice filed by BRYN HILL INDUSTRIES, INC., C.U.E., INC., ELLIOTT COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, INC., EMMA CHEMICALS CO., INC., ERA POLYMERS PROPRIETARY LIMITED, FINISHING SOLUTIONS LLC, IN RE: DIISOCYANATES ANTITRUST LITIGATION, ISAAC INDUSTRIES, INC., NPC COATING, INC., RHINO LININGS CORPORATION, TRI-ISO TRYLINE, LLC, UNICAST, INC., UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Table of Contents, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2) (Pietragallo, William) Modified text on 12/26/2018. (jjg)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 138 MOTION for Production of Documents Previously Produced to Department of Justice by BRYN HILL INDUSTRIES, INC., C.U.E., INC., ELLIOTT COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, INC., EMMA CHEMICALS CO., INC., ERA POLYMERS PROPRIETARY LIMITED, FINISHING SOLUTIONS LLC, IN RE: DIISOCYANATES ANTITRUST LITIGATION, ISAAC INDUSTRIES, INC., NPC COATING, INC., RHINO LININGS CORPORATION, TRI-ISO TRYLINE, LLC, UNICAST, INC., UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Pietragallo, William)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 137 MOTION for attorney Jennifer M. Oliver to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4975725) by RHINO LININGS CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Oliver, Jennifer)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 136 MOTION for attorney Jodie M. Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4975721) by RHINO LININGS CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Williams, Jodie)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 135 MOTION for attorney Jonathan L. Rubin to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4975719) by RHINO LININGS CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Rubin, Jonathan)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 134 MOTION for attorney Daniel J. Mogin to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4975718) by RHINO LININGS CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Mogin, Daniel)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 133 MOTION for attorney Daniel J. Walker to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4974897) by RHINO LININGS CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order) (Walker, Daniel)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER granting #131 Motion for Eric Cramer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 12/21/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ask)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 131 MOTION for attorney Eric L. Cramer to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4973299) by RHINO LININGS CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order) (Cramer, Eric)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 130 Minute Entry for telephone conference held before Judge Donetta W. Ambrose: Telephone Conference held on 12/20/2018. Briefing schedule regarding discovery dispute: Plaintiffs' Motion and Brief (limited to 10 pages) due by 12/21/2018, Defendants' Response to Motion (limited to 10 pages) due by 1/10/2019, Plaintiffs' Reply to Response (limited to 5 pages) due by 1/14/2019. (Court Reporter: none) (slh)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER granting #127 Motion for Sean Cooper to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 12/20/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ask)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER granting #126 Motion for Richard M. Paul III to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 12/20/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ask)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 127 MOTION for attorney Sean Cooper to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4972090) by NPC COATING, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Cooper, Sean)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 126 MOTION for attorney Richard M. Paul III to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4972086) by NPC COATING, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Paul, Richard)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER granting #122 Motion for Robert James D'Anniballe, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 12/12/18. (slh)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER granting #123 Motion for Steven N. Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 12/12/18. (slh)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 123 MOTION for attorney Steven N. Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4961873) by TRI-ISO TRYLINE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Steven N. Williams, #2 Proposed Order) (Williams, Steven)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 122 MOTION for attorney Robert J. D'Anniballe, Jr., Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4960795) by FINISHING SOLUTIONS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Proposed Order) (D'Anniballe, Robert)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER granting #120 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Shaina R. Rogozen is withdrawn as attorney for Dow in this matter. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 12/11/18. (sps)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 120 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by DOW CHEMICAL CO.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Rogozen, Shaina)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 119 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard M. Paul, III on behalf of NPC COATING, INC.. (Paul, Richard)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER granting #113 Motion for Joseph R. Saveri to Appear Pro Hac Vice.. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/30/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ask)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER granting #112 Motion for David M. Bernick to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/30/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ask)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER granting #111 Motion for Jeffrey B. Gittleman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/30/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ask)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER granting #110 Motion for Abram Ellis to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/30/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ask)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER granting #109 Motion for Jonathan R. Myers to Appear Pro Hac Vice.. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/30/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ask)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 113 MOTION for attorney Joseph R. Saveri to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4949710) by TRI-ISO TRYLINE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Joseph R. Saveri, #2 Proposed Order) (Saveri, Joseph)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 112 MOTION for attorney David M. Bernick to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4948819) by DOW CHEMICAL CO.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Bernick, David)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 111 MOTION for attorney Jeffrey B. Gittleman to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4948596) by ERA POLYMERS PROPRIETARY LIMITED. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jeffrey B. Gittleman in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (w/Certificate of Good Standing), #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jeffrey B. Gittleman) (Gittleman, Jeffrey)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 110 MOTION for attorney Abram Ellis to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4948500) by BAYER CORP., COVESTRO LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Ellis, Abram)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 109 MOTION for attorney Jonathan R. Myers to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4948436) by BAYER CORP., COVESTRO LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Myers, Jonathan )
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 108 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER No. 1. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/28/18. (slh)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER APPOINTING PLAINTIFFS' INTERIM CO-LEAD COUNSEL AND LIAISON COUNSEL: Megan E. Jones of Hausfeld LLP and Jason S. Hartley of Hartley LLP are appointed as Co-Lead Counsel and William Pietragallo, II of Pietragallo Gordon Alfano Bosick & Raspanti, LLP is appointed as Liaison Counsel. All other motions for appointment of counsel are denied. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/28/18. (slh)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Donetta W. Ambrose: Initial Status Conference held on 11/27/2018. (Court Reporter: Barb Leo) (slh)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER granting #99 Motion for Lin Chan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/26/18. (cha)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 104 Proposed Order re #80 Motion to Appoint Counsel, Amended [Proposed] Order Re: Appointment of Interim Lead Class Counsel by ISAAC INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Shapiro, Anthony)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting #100 Motion for Dean M. Harvey to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/26/18. (cha)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 NOTICE of Appearance by James R. Miller on behalf of HUNTSMAN CORP., HUNTSMAN INTERNATIONAL LLC. (Miller, James)
November 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455, the undersigned must disqualify herself in this proceeding. Lisa Pupo Lenihan, United States Magistrate Judge, therefore, recuses herself from all proceedings in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 11/23/2018. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmb)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MOTION for attorney Dean Michael Harvey to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4941879) by RHINO LININGS CORPORATION. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Harvey, Dean)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MOTION for attorney Lin Yee Chan to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4941850) by RHINO LININGS CORPORATION. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Chan, Lin)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting #96 Motion for Beatrice Franklin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/21/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sps)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting #95 Motion for Seth Ard to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/21/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sps)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MOTION for attorney Beatrice Franklin to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4940777) by BRYN HILL INDUSTRIES, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Proposed Order) (Franklin, Beatrice)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MOTION for attorney Seth Ard to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4940739) by BRYN HILL INDUSTRIES, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Proposed Order) (Ard, Seth )
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 Proposed Order re #92 Motion to Appoint Counsel, by ELLIOTT COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, INC., UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC. (Katcher, Elana)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 Proposed Order re #91 Motion to Appoint Counsel, by ELLIOTT COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, INC.. (Marcus, Bernard)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #91 Motion to Appoint Counsel, #92 Motion to Appoint Counsel. ERROR: Proposed Order was not attached. CORRECTION: Attorney is advised to file a proposed order by using the Proposed Order event and linking it to the document in question. This message is for informational purposes only. (jjg)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (APPLICATION IN SUPPORT OF INTERIM LEADERSHIP POSITION BY ELANA KATCHER OF KAPLAN FOX & KILSHEIMER LLP) by ELLIOTT COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, INC., UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- firm resume) (Katcher, Elana) Modified text on 11/20/2018. (jjg)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Application in Support of Liaison Counsel Position by Bernard D. Marcus of Marcus & Shapira LLP) by ELLIOTT COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit) (Marcus, Bernard) Modified text on 11/20/2018. (jjg)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 BRIEF in Support re #88 Motion to Appoint Counsel (Interim Lead Class Counsel) filed by BRYN HILL INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Resume of William Christopher Carmody) (Carmody, William)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin G. Allen on behalf of ELLIOTT COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, INC.. (Allen, Erin)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Interim Lead Class Counsel) by BRYN HILL INDUSTRIES, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Carmody, William)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian C. Hill on behalf of ELLIOTT COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, INC.. (Hill, Brian)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 NOTICE of Appearance by Moira E. Cain-Mannix on behalf of ELLIOTT COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, INC.. (Cain-Mannix, Moira)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 NOTICE of Appearance by Bernard D. Marcus on behalf of ELLIOTT COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, INC.. (Marcus, Bernard)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert N. Kaplan on behalf of ELLIOTT COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, INC.. (Kaplan, Robert)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 NOTICE of Appearance by Elana Katcher on behalf of ELLIOTT COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, INC.. (Katcher, Elana)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Application for Appointment of Hausfeld LLP as Interim Lead Counsel) by UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Hearing Transcript, #2 Exhibit B: Law360 Article, #3 Exhibit C: Firm Resume, #4 Proposed Order) (Spear, David) Modified text on 11/20/2018. (jjg)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Application for Appointment of Jason S. Hartley of Hartley LLP as Interim Lead Counsel) by C.U.E., INC., NPC COATING, INC., RHINO LININGS CORPORATION, TRI-ISO TRYLINE, LLC. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Proposed Order) (Hartley, Jason) Modified text on 11/20/2018. (jjg)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Brief in Support of Appointment of Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP as Interim Lead Counsel for the Proposed Plaintiff Class) by ISAAC INDUSTRIES, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Hagens Berman Firm Resume, #2 Proposed Order) (Shapiro, Anthony) Modified text on 11/20/2018. (jjg)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 Proposed Order re #71 Motion to Appoint Counsel by FINISHING SOLUTIONS LLC. (Pietragallo, William)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Proposed Case Management Order [Joint] by BASF CORP.. (Allen, Thomas)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 NOTICE of Joint Proposed Agenda for Status Conference of November 27, 2018 by BASF CORP. (Allen, Thomas)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Application for Appointment of Linda P. Nussbaum and Nussbaum Law Group, P.C. as Lead Interim Class Counsel) by EMMA CHEMICALS CO., INC.. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Nussbaum, Linda) Modified text on 11/20/2018. (jjg)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Brief in Support of Application of Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC as Interim Lead Counsel) by ERA POLYMERS PROPRIETARY LIMITED. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Firm Resume, #2 Proposed Order) (Robertson, Sharon ) Modified text on 11/20/2018. (jjg)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Application to Appoint Carlson Lynch Sweet Kilpela & Carpenter, LLP as Liaison Counsel) by ERA POLYMERS PROPRIETARY LIMITED, ISAAC INDUSTRIES, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Firm Resume, #2 Proposed Order) (Lynch, Gary) Modified text on 11/20/2018. (jjg)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance by Dasha Gorlov on behalf of FINISHING SOLUTIONS LLC. (Gorlov, Dasha)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter S. Wolff on behalf of FINISHING SOLUTIONS LLC. (Wolff, Peter)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by FINISHING SOLUTIONS LLC. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Pietragallo, William)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting #69 Motion for William Christopher Carmody to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/19/18. (cha)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MOTION for attorney William Christopher Carmody to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4935615) by BRYN HILL INDUSTRIES, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Carmody, William)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting #66 Motion for James Backstrom to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/16/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ask)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting #65 Motion for Michael Hausfeld to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/16/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ask)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MOTION for attorney James A. Backstrom to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4935217) by MITSUI CHEMICALS AMERICA, INC. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Backstrom, James)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MOTION for attorney Michael D. Hausfeld to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4934569) by UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Michael D. Hausfeld, #2 Proposed Order) (Hausfeld, Michael)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting #47 Motion for Melinda R. Coolidge to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/14/18. (slh)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting #60 Motion for Ari Ruben to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/15/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ask)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #59 Motion for Arun Subramanian to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/15/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ask)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting #56 Motion for Laura Alexander to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/15/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ask)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MOTION for attorney Ari S. Ruben to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4933019) by BRYN HILL INDUSTRIES, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Ari S. Ruben, #2 Proposed Order) (Ruben, Ari)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MOTION for attorney Arun Subramanian to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4932855) by BRYN HILL INDUSTRIES, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Subramanian, Arun)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting #46 Motion for Megan E. Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/14/18. (slh)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting #45 Motion for Brent W. Landau to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/14/18. (slh)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MOTION for attorney Laura Alexander to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4931594) by ERA POLYMERS PROPRIETARY LIMITED. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Alexander, Laura)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting #44 Motion for Ryan M. Sandrock to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/13/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sps)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #41 Motion for Jonathan Stephen Mann to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/13/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sps)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #40 Motion for Harold S. Reeves to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/13/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sps)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #39 Motion for Brian W. Barnes to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/13/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sps)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #38 Motion for Michael W. Kirk to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/13/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sps)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #37 Motion for Charles J. Cooper to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/13/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sps)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #36 Motion for Elana Katcher to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/13/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sps)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #35 Motion for Robert N. Kaplan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/13/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sps)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MOTION for attorney Melinda R. Coolidge to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4930497) by UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Melinda R. Coolidge, #2 Proposed Order) (Coolidge, Melinda)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MOTION for attorney Megan E. Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4930292) by UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Megan E. Jones, #2 Proposed Order) (Jones, Megan)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MOTION for attorney Brent W. Landau to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4930207) by UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Brent W. Landau, #2 Proposed Order) (Landau, Brent)
November 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MOTION for attorney Ryan M. Sandrock to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4929702) by MCNS POLYURETHANES USA INC. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Ryan M. Sandrock, #2 Proposed Order) (Sandrock, Ryan)
November 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew C. Pilsner on behalf of MCNS POLYURETHANES USA INC. (Pilsner, Matthew)
November 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel W. Braver on behalf of MCNS POLYURETHANES USA INC. (Braver, Samuel)
November 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MOTION for attorney Jonathan Stephen Mann to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4929651) by FINISHING SOLUTIONS LLC. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Mann, Jonathan)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MOTION for attorney Harold S. Reeves to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4929367) by ELLIOTT COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Reeves, Harold)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MOTION for attorney Brian W. Barnes to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4929364) by ELLIOTT COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Barnes, Brian)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MOTION for attorney Michael W. Kirk to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4929362) by ELLIOTT COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Kirk, Michael)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MOTION for attorney Charles J. Cooper to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4929356) by ELLIOTT COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Cooper, Charles)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MOTION for attorney Elana Katcher to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4929218) by UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Katcher, Elana)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MOTION for attorney Robert N. Kaplan to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4928319) by UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Kaplan, Robert)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by William Pietragallo, II on behalf of FINISHING SOLUTIONS LLC. (Pietragallo, William)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #31 Motion for Kevin B. Love to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/8/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ask)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #30 Motion for Richard Koffman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/8/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ask)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION for attorney Kevin B. Love to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4925991) by ISAAC INDUSTRIES, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Love, Kevin)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MOTION for attorney Richard A. Koffman to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4925311) by ERA POLYMERS PROPRIETARY LIMITED. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Koffman, Richard)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Linda Nussbaum to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/6/18. (sps)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION for attorney Linda Nussbaum to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4921689) by EMMA CHEMICALS CO., INC.. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Nussbaum, Linda)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Jason S. Hartley to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/5/18. (cha)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Charles Lincoln Wesley to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/5/18. (cha)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Craig P. Seebald to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/5/18. (cha)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Christopher Theo Hellums to Appear Pro Hac Vice.. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/5/18. (cha)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION for attorney Jason S. Hartley to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4920842) by RHINO LININGS CORPORATION. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jason S. Hartley, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Hartley, Jason)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION for attorney Charles Lincoln Wesley to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4920822) by WANHUA CHEMICAL AMERICA CO. LTD. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Wesley, Charles)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION for attorney Craig P. Seebald to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4920731) by WANHUA CHEMICAL AMERICA CO. LTD. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Seebald, Craig)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION for attorney Christopher Theo Hellums to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4920005) by FINISHING SOLUTIONS LLC. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Hellums, Chris)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Courtney Elgart to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/2/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ask)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER entered #13 granting Motion for Ryan Blake Streit to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/2/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ask) Modified on 11/2/2018. (ask)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Shaina Rogozen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/2/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ask) Modified on 11/2/2018. (ask)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Aidan Synnott to Appear Pro Hac Vice.. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/2/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ask) Modified on 11/2/2018. (ask)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for attorney Courtney Elgart to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4918580) by ERA POLYMERS PROPRIETARY LIMITED. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Elgart, Courtney )
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Ginevra Ventre on behalf of BASF CORP.. (Ventre, Ginevra)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for attorney Ryan Blake Streit to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4918364) by DOW CHEMICAL CO.. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Streit, Ryan)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for attorney Shaina Reiko Rogozen to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4918330) by DOW CHEMICAL CO.. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Rogozen, Shaina)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for attorney Aidan Synnott to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4918317) by DOW CHEMICAL CO.. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Synnott, Aidan)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Ronnie S. Spiegel to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/1/18. (ask)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Anthony D. Shapiro to Appear Pro Hac Vice.. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/1/18. (ask)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Edwin J. Kilpela on behalf of ISAAC INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Kilpela, Edwin)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary F. Lynch on behalf of ISAAC INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Lynch, Gary)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for attorney Ronnie S. Spiegel to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4916561) by ISAAC INDUSTRIES, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Spiegel, Ronnie)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for attorney Anthony D. Shapiro to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4916554) by ISAAC INDUSTRIES, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Shapiro, Anthony)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER: Initial Case Management set for 11/27/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3B before Judge Donetta W. Ambrose. On or before November 19, 2018, any counsel who wants to be considered for lead counsel shall file a resume and brief, not exceeding five pages, at the Master File Docket, Miscellaneous Action No. 18-1001 demonstrating lead counsel, MDL, and trial experience. On or before November 19, 2018, any counsel who wants to be considered for liaison counsel shall file a resume and brief, not exceeding five pages, at the Master File Docket Miscellaneous Action No. 18-1001 addressing the reasons counsel should be selected as liaison counsel. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 10/31/18. (slh)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by IN RE: DIISOCYANATES ANTITRUST LITIGATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4) (Allen, Thomas)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Conditional Transfer Order received from the Judicial Panel on Multi-District Litigation. (jjg) (Main Document 2 replaced on 10/17/2018) (map).
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION TRANSFER ORDER. (jjg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN RE: DIISOCYANATES ANTITRUST LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: IN RE: DIISOCYANATES ANTITRUST LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRI-ISO TRYLINE, LLC
Represented By: Joseph R. Saveri
Represented By: Steven N. Williams
Represented By: William Pietragallo, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRYN HILL INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: William C. Carmody
Represented By: Ari S. Ruben
Represented By: Seth Ard
Represented By: Beatrice Franklin
Represented By: Arun S. Subramanian
Represented By: William Pietragallo, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RHINO LININGS CORPORATION
Represented By: Dean M. Harvey
Represented By: Lin Y. Chan
Represented By: JASON LOUIS LICHTMAN
Represented By: Jason S. Hartley
Represented By: William Pietragallo, II
Represented By: Jennifer M. Oliver
Represented By: Jodie M. Williams
Represented By: Jason M. Lindner
Represented By: Daniel J. Mogin
Represented By: Daniel J. Walker
Represented By: Jonathan L. Rubin
Represented By: Eric L. Cramer
Represented By: Jessica N. Servais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMMA CHEMICALS CO., INC.
Represented By: Linda Nussbaum
Represented By: Bart Cohen
Represented By: William Pietragallo, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ISAAC INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: Ronnie Spiegel
Represented By: Jason Zweig
Represented By: Gary F. Lynch
Represented By: Edwin J. Kilpela
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Anthony Shapiro
Represented By: Kevin B. Love
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Melvin B. Hollowell
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: William Pietragallo, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.U.E., INC.
Represented By: Jason S. Hartley
Represented By: ANDREW G. FINKELSTEIN
Represented By: William Pietragallo, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNICAST, INC.
Represented By: Marc H. Edelson
Represented By: JOSHUA H. GRABAR
Represented By: William Pietragallo, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELLIOTT COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, INC.
Represented By: Bernard D. Marcus
Represented By: Robert N. Kaplan
Represented By: Harold S. Reeves
Represented By: Erin G. Allen
Represented By: Brian C. Hill
Represented By: Moira E. Cain-Mannix
Represented By: Brian W. Barnes
Represented By: Michael W. Kirk
Represented By: Elana Katcher
Represented By: Charles J. Cooper
Represented By: William Pietragallo, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth Jones
Represented By: Elana Katcher
Represented By: Brent W. Landau
Represented By: Melinda R Coolidge
Represented By: Robert N. Kaplan
Represented By: David B. Spear
Represented By: Michael D. Hausfeld
Represented By: William Pietragallo, II
Represented By: Douglas A Dellaccio, Jr.
Represented By: Stephanie Y. Cho
Represented By: Ian J. Engdahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERA POLYMERS PROPRIETARY LIMITED
Represented By: Sharon K. Robertson
Represented By: Patrick E. Cafferty
Represented By: Laura Alexander
Represented By: Courtney Elgart
Represented By: Ellen Meriwether
Represented By: Edwin J. Kilpela
Represented By: Richard A. Koffman
Represented By: Jessica B. Weiner
Represented By: Jeffrey B Gittleman
Represented By: Michael J. Boni
Represented By: Gary F. Lynch
Represented By: William Pietragallo, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NPC COATING, INC.
Represented By: ANDREW G. FINKELSTEIN
Represented By: Richard M. Paul, III
Represented By: William Pietragallo, II
Represented By: Sean Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FINISHING SOLUTIONS LLC
Represented By: J Elliott Walthall
Represented By: James F. Barger, Jr.
Represented By: William Pietragallo, II
Represented By: Peter S. Wolff
Represented By: Chris T. Hellums
Represented By: Jonathan S. Mann
Represented By: Dasha Gorlov
Represented By: Robert J. D'Anniballe
Represented By: Robert G. Eisler
Represented By: Robert James D'Anniballe, Jr.
Represented By: Deborah Elman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COVESTRO AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WANHUA CHEMICAL US HOLDING, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF CORP.
Represented By: Andrew S. Marovitz
Represented By: Ginevra Ventre
Represented By: Richard A. Spehr
Represented By: Thomas L. Allen
Represented By: Richard E. Nowak
Represented By: Britt M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COVESTRO LLC
Represented By: John Terzaken
Represented By: Andrew S. Marovitz
Represented By: Abram J. Ellis
Represented By: ALBERT G. BIXLER
Represented By: Jonathan R. Myers
Represented By: LESLIE A. HAYES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAYER CORP.
Represented By: John Terzaken
Represented By: Andrew S. Marovitz
Represented By: Abram J. Ellis
Represented By: ALBERT G. BIXLER
Represented By: Jonathan R. Myers
Represented By: LESLIE A. HAYES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WANHUA CHEMICAL GROUP CO. LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF SE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUNTSMAN INTERNATIONAL LLC
Represented By: Andrew S. Marovitz
Represented By: JOHN E. SCHMIDTLEIN
Represented By: Zachary K. Warren
Represented By: James R. Miller
Represented By: Constance T Forkner
Represented By: Mark S. Levinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAYER A.G.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MITSUI CHEMICALS AMERICA, INC
Represented By: James A. Backstrom
Represented By: David C. Brownstein
Represented By: David M. Goldstein
Represented By: William S. Farmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOW CHEMICAL CO.
Represented By: Andrew S. Marovitz
Represented By: Wendy West Feinstein
Represented By: Evan P Moltz
Represented By: Aidan Synnott
Represented By: David M. Bernick
Represented By: Carl S Burkhalter
Represented By: Ryan Streit
Represented By: Shaina R. Rogozen
Represented By: William T. McEnroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOWDUPONT INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCNS POLYURETHANES USA INC
Represented By: Allen C. Kim
Represented By: Ryan M. Sandrock
Represented By: Samuel W. Braver
Represented By: Matthew C. Pilsner
Represented By: ROBERT E. WELSH, JR.
Represented By: Samuel S Choi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MITSUI CHEMICALS & SKC POLYURETHANES, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUNTSMAN CORP.
Represented By: JOHN E. SCHMIDTLEIN
Represented By: Zachary K. Warren
Represented By: James R. Miller
Represented By: Constance T Forkner
Represented By: Mark S. Levinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WANHUA CHEMICAL AMERICA CO. LTD
Represented By: Andrew S. Marovitz
Represented By: Charles L. Wesley
Represented By: Craig P. Seebald
Represented By: Alden L. Atkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUNTSMAN LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAYER MATERIALSCIENCE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SKC POLYURETHANES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MITSUI CHEMICALS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?