BRESLIN v. WAGNER

Plaintiff: SAMUEL BRESLIN
Defendant: ADAM WAGNER
Case Number: 2:2019cv00015
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: David S Cercone
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER scheduling Initial Case Management Conference for 4/12/19 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7A before Judge David S. Cercone. Rule 26 conference to be held on or before 3/20/19. Stipulation Selecting ADR Process and Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/1/19. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 2/22/19. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Stipulation Selecting ADR Process; and #2 Exhibit B - Rule 26 Report Form) (njt)
February 21, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian S. Kane on behalf of ADAM WAGNER. (Kane, Brian)
January 29, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service served on Adam Wagner on 1/25/19, filed by SAMUEL BRESLIN. (Donovan, Ryan)
January 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (kak)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT-ORDER granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Ryan T. Donovan on behalf of plaintiff. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 1/10/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's Order or Notice on the matter. (njt)
January 9, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for attorney Ryan T. Donovan to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4987666) by SAMUEL BRESLIN. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Donovan, Ryan)
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to ADAM WAGNER. (ept)
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ADAM WAGNER (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4984417), filed by SAMUEL BRESLIN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (ept)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BRESLIN v. WAGNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAMUEL BRESLIN
Represented By: Ryan T. Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADAM WAGNER
Represented By: Brian S. Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?