B. et al v. UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPNAY et al
Plaintiff: Amy B., T. Sebastian B. and Richard B.
Defendant: United Healthcare Insurance, United Behavioral Health and UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2019cv00031
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Pittsburgh Office
Presiding Judge: Cathy Bissoon
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Tybe A. Brett on behalf of RICHARD B.. (Brett, Tybe)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER re #31 Stipulation. The parties' Stipulation does not qualify, under Local Civil Rule 7.E, as one not requiring court-approval. See id. Nevertheless, the Court will construe the filing as a consented Motion to extend the answer deadline, and the Motion is GRANTED. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by 4/8/19. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 2/11/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (dcd)
February 11, 2019 Filing 31 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by UNITED BEHAVIORAL HEALTH, UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY Answer due from UNITED BEHAVIORAL HEALTH on 4/18/2019; UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY on 4/18/2019. (Bernstein, Michael)
February 6, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael H. Bernstein on behalf of UNITED BEHAVIORAL HEALTH, UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Bernstein, Michael)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss, more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 1/14/19. (jhi)
January 11, 2019 Filing 28 Case transferred in from District of Utah; Case Number 2:18-cv-00073. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part #14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Defendants Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. Defendants Motion to Transfer Venue is GRANTED. It is ORDERED that this action be transferred to the United State District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 1/9/2019. (jds)
November 7, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Clint R. Hansen on behalf of United Behavioral Health, United Healthcare Insurance (Hansen, Clint)
June 26, 2018 Filing 25 REQUEST to Submit for Decision re #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue to the Western District of Pennsylvania filed by Defendants United Behavioral Health, United Healthcare Insurance. (Petersen, Scott)
June 26, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE VACATING Initial Pretrial Conference set for 6/26/2018 at 03:00 PM before Judge Evelyn J. Furse. Parties are directed to file an Attorney Planning Meeting Report within 14 days of ruling on pending motion to dismiss, if necessary. (Notice generated by IPT Clerk) (jds)
June 12, 2018 Filing 23 AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING: (Notice generated by EJF Chambers) Initial Pretrial Conference reset for 6/26/2018 at 03:00 PM in Rm 7.400 before Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse. (lnp)
June 8, 2018 Reset Hearings: Initial Pretrial Conference reset for 6/26/2018 at 03:00 PM in Rm 7.400 before Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse. Refer to docket entry 9 for further instruction regarding this hearing. (jds)
June 7, 2018 Filing 22 Defendant's REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue to the Western District of Pennsylvania filed by Defendants United Behavioral Health, United Healthcare Insurance. (Petersen, Scott)
June 5, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by Amy B., Richard B., T. Sebastian B. re #20 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit decision in R. v. United Behavioral Health) (King, Brian)
May 24, 2018 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue to the Western District of Pennsylvania filed by Plaintiffs Amy B., Richard B., T. Sebastian B.. (King, Brian)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 DOCKET TEXT ORDER re #11 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Pretrial Conference. Initial Pretrial Conference reset for 6/13/2018 at 11:30 AM in Rm 7.400 before Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse. No attached document Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 5/7/2018. (jds)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 5/4/18. (ss)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CIVIL STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 5/4/18. (ss)
April 26, 2018 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT/Declaration of Jaime Ciletti in Support re #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue to the Western District of Pennsylvania filed by United Behavioral Health, United Healthcare Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Group Plan 2014, #2 Exhibit B - Group Plan 2015, #3 Exhibit C - Certificate of Coverage)(Petersen, Scott)
April 26, 2018 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT/Declaration of Scott M. Petersen in Support re #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue to the Western District of Pennsylvania filed by United Behavioral Health, United Healthcare Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Licensed Insurance Companies, #2 Exhibit B - California Secretary of State Website)(Petersen, Scott)
April 26, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue to the Western District of Pennsylvania filed by Defendants United Behavioral Health, United Healthcare Insurance. (Petersen, Scott)
April 26, 2018 Filing 13 All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish. Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse no longer assigned to the case. (las)
April 26, 2018 Filing 12 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendants United Behavioral Health, United Healthcare Insurance. (las)
April 25, 2018 Filing 11 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Pretrial Conference and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants United Behavioral Health, United Healthcare Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order to Extend Pretrial Conference)(Petersen, Scott)
April 11, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE REMINDER - All parties are requested to respond within the time frame set forth in the #7 Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment,, pursuant to General Order 07-001. If you have already consented/objected, please disregard this notice. No judge will be informed of a party's response unless all parties have consented to the assignment of the matter to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Unless consents from all parties are received within fifteen(15) days, the case will be randomly re-assigned to a U.S. District Judge without further notice.# Link to Magistrate Consent Objection form (las)
April 2, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE:: (Notice generated by IPT Clerk)The Attorneys Planning Meeting Report and Proposed Scheduling Order forms, available on the court web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov/usdc-forms, should be prepared 21 days before the Initial Pretrial Conference hearing date.NOTICE TO COUNSEL, The Court may enter a scheduling order and vacate the hearing if counsel(a) file a stipulated Attorneys Planning Meeting Report; and(b) e-mail a Proposed Scheduling Order to ipt@utd.uscourts.gov21 days before the scheduled hearing. See instructions at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov/attorney-planning-meeting-and-reportIf counsel or the parties would like to participate by phone they must contact the IPT Clerk at least two days in advance at ipt@utd.uscourts.gov to make arrangements. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 5/9/2018 at 11:30 AM in Rm 7.400 before Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse. (jds)
March 27, 2018 Filing 8 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiffs Amy B., Richard B., T. Sebastian B.. (las)
March 26, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs Amy B., Richard B., T. Sebastian B., Defendants United Behavioral Health, United Healthcare Insurance. Form due by 4/10/2018. (las)
March 26, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE FROM THE COURT re: Initial SchedulingThe court's IPT Clerk will now set the case for the Initial Pretrial Scheduling Conference (las)
March 26, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs Amy B., Richard B., T. Sebastian B., Defendants United Behavioral Health, United Healthcare Insurance. (las)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint,. Answer deadline updated for United Behavioral Health answer due 4/26/2018; United Healthcare Insurance answer due 4/26/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 3/26/2018. (las)
March 26, 2018 Filing 3 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time Extend Answer Deadline and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants United Behavioral Health, United Healthcare Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Extending Answer Deadline) Attorney Scott M. Petersen added to party United Behavioral Health(pty:dft), Attorney Scott M. Petersen added to party United Healthcare Insurance(pty:dft)(Petersen, Scott) Modified on 3/26/2018 corrected motion type (las).
January 22, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-2922850) filed by Richard B., Amy B., T. Sebastian B.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse (King, Brian)
January 22, 2018 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse. Plaintiffs Amy B., Richard B., T. Sebastian B. are directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: B. et al v. UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPNAY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy B.
Represented By: Brian S. King
Represented By: Nediha Hadzikadunic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T. Sebastian B.
Represented By: Brian S. King
Represented By: Nediha Hadzikadunic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard B.
Represented By: Brian S. King
Represented By: Nediha Hadzikadunic
Represented By: Tybe A. Brett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Insurance
Represented By: Clint R. Hansen
Represented By: Scott M. Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Behavioral Health
Represented By: Clint R. Hansen
Represented By: Scott M. Petersen
Represented By: Michael H. Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Clint R. Hansen
Represented By: Scott M. Petersen
Represented By: Michael H. Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?