DOE et al v. ELLSWORTH MEWS TOWNHOMES CONDOMINIUM et al
Plaintiff: JANE DOE, JOHN DOE and MARY DOE
Defendant: ELLSWORTH MEWS TOWNHOMES CONDOMINIUM, ANTHONY POLI, ELLSWORTH MEWS TOWNHOMES ASSOCIATION, EDWARD MOTZNIK, PASCAL MAGNOLLAY, PRUDENTIAL REALTY CO., WALTER CLARK, DEBORAH RUBIN, LOUISA RUBLE and EXECUTIVE BOARD OF THE ELLSWORTH MEWS TOWNHOMES CONDOMINIUM
Case Number: 2:2019cv00083
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Peter J Phipps
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MARY DOE, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE. DEBORAH RUBIN waiver sent on 2/12/2019, answer due 4/15/2019. (Ridge, Lourdes)
February 26, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MARY DOE, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE. ANTHONY POLI waiver sent on 2/12/2019, answer due 4/15/2019. (Ridge, Lourdes)
February 26, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MARY DOE, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE. PASCAL MAGNOLLAY waiver sent on 2/12/2019, answer due 4/15/2019. (Ridge, Lourdes)
February 26, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MARY DOE, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE. WALTER CLARK waiver sent on 2/12/2019, answer due 4/15/2019. (Ridge, Lourdes)
February 26, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MARY DOE, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE. EDWARD MOTZNIK waiver sent on 2/12/2019, answer due 4/15/2019. (Ridge, Lourdes)
February 26, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MARY DOE, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE. EXECUTIVE BOARD OF THE ELLSWORTH MEWS TOWNHOMES CONDOMINIUM waiver sent on 2/12/2019, answer due 4/15/2019. (Ridge, Lourdes)
February 26, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MARY DOE, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE. ELLSWORTH MEWS TOWNHOMES CONDOMINIUM waiver sent on 2/12/2019, answer due 4/15/2019. (Ridge, Lourdes)
February 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Karen Baillie on behalf of WALTER CLARK, ELLSWORTH MEWS TOWNHOMES CONDOMINIUM, EXECUTIVE BOARD OF THE ELLSWORTH MEWS TOWNHOMES CONDOMINIUM, PASCAL MAGNOLLAY, EDWARD MOTZNIK, ANTHONY POLI, DEBORAH RUBIN. (Baillie, Karen)
February 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew F. Dolfi on behalf of PRUDENTIAL REALTY CO., LOUISA RUBLE. (Dolfi, Matthew)
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin J. Dolfi on behalf of PRUDENTIAL REALTY CO., LOUISA RUBLE. (Dolfi, Erin)
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by LOUISA RUBLE. LOUISA RUBLE waiver sent on 1/25/2019, answer due 3/26/2019. (Dolfi, Matthew)
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PRUDENTIAL REALTY CO. PRUDENTIAL REALTY CO. waiver sent on 1/25/2019, answer due 3/26/2019. (Dolfi, Matthew)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against WALTER CLARK, ELLSWORTH MEWS TOWNHOMES CONDOMINIUM, EXECUTIVE BOARD OF THE ELLSWORTH MEWS TOWNHOMES CONDOMINIUM, PASCAL MAGNOLLAY, EDWARD MOTZNIK, ANTHONY POLI, PRUDENTIAL REALTY CO., DEBORAH RUBIN, LOUISA RUBLE (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5004977), filed by MARY DOE, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DOE et al v. ELLSWORTH MEWS TOWNHOMES CONDOMINIUM et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELLSWORTH MEWS TOWNHOMES CONDOMINIUM
Represented By: Karen Baillie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANTHONY POLI
Represented By: Karen Baillie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELLSWORTH MEWS TOWNHOMES ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Karen Baillie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDWARD MOTZNIK
Represented By: Karen Baillie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PASCAL MAGNOLLAY
Represented By: Karen Baillie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRUDENTIAL REALTY CO.
Represented By: Matthew F. Dolfi
Represented By: Erin J. Dolfi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALTER CLARK
Represented By: Karen Baillie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEBORAH RUBIN
Represented By: Karen Baillie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOUISA RUBLE
Represented By: Matthew F. Dolfi
Represented By: Erin J. Dolfi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXECUTIVE BOARD OF THE ELLSWORTH MEWS TOWNHOMES CONDOMINIUM
Represented By: Karen Baillie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANE DOE
Represented By: Jon Pushinsky
Represented By: Lourdes Sanchez Ridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN DOE
Represented By: Jon Pushinsky
Represented By: Lourdes Sanchez Ridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY DOE
Represented By: Jon Pushinsky
Represented By: Lourdes Sanchez Ridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?