MATTHEWS et al v. SHALERCREST HOUSING ASSOCIATION, INC.

Plaintiff: ROY MATTHEWS and CAROL MATTHEWS
Defendant: SHALERCREST HOUSING ASSOCIATION, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00123
Filed: February 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Cathy Bissoon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Filing 5 Errata re #4 Notice of Appearance by SHALERCREST HOUSING ASSOCIATION, INC. Reason for Correction: Misspelled Defendan't name. (Joyal, Edmond)
March 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Edmond R. Joyal, Jr on behalf of SHALERCREST HOUSING ASSOCIATION, INC. (Joyal, Edmond)
March 5, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CAROL MATTHEWS. SHALERCREST HOUSING ASSOCIATION, INC. waiver sent on 2/7/2019, answer due 4/8/2019. (Solymosi, Tibor)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss, more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 2/7/19. (jhi)
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SHALERCREST HOUSING ASSOCIATION, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5016447), filed by CAROL MATTHEWS, ROY MATTHEWS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MATTHEWS et al v. SHALERCREST HOUSING ASSOCIATION, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROY MATTHEWS
Represented By: Tibor R. Solymosi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAROL MATTHEWS
Represented By: Tibor R. Solymosi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHALERCREST HOUSING ASSOCIATION, INC.
Represented By: Edmond R. Joyal, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?