BALDWIN TOWER vs. ACKERMAN
Plaintiff: BALDWIN TOWER
Defendant: WILLIAM JAMES ACKERMAN
Case Number: 2:2019cv00134
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Reed Eddy
Referring Judge: Nora Barry Fischer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28:1441cr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM ORDER indicating that Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is granted; that this action is remanded pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction and this case shall be marked closed; that the report and recommendation of Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy #5 is hereby adopted as the opinion of the district court. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 3/21/19. (jg)
March 12, 2019 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT by WILLIAM JAMES ACKERMAN to #6 Answer to Complaint. (jv)
March 12, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by WILLIAM JAMES ACKERMAN. (jv)
March 12, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint (Filed with #1 Remark as an attachment) by WILLIAM JAMES ACKERMAN. (jv)
March 1, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by WILLIAM JAMES ACKERMAN recommending that the #3 motion for leave to proceed informa pauperis be granted and this case be remanded pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. Objections to R&R for Unregistered ECF Users due by 3/20/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 3/1/2019. (ajt) Modified text on 3/4/2019. (tt)
March 1, 2019 Judge Nora Barry Fischer is presiding and Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy is referred. (mao)
February 14, 2019 Filing 4 EXHIBITS in Support of Notice of Removal attached to #1 Remark, by WILLIAM JAMES ACKERMAN. (jv)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by WILLIAM JAMES ACKERMAN. (jv)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MEMORANDUM and ORDER FOR STATISTICAL CLOSING. The Notice of Removal filed by WILLIAM JAMES ACKERMAN has been received without a filing fee or the forms required to proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court is to mark this case administratively CLOSED. A copy of this Order was sent to WILLIAM JAMES ACKERMAN at 200 Knoedler Road Apartment 912 Pittsburgh, PA 15236 this day via first class regular mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 2/11/2019. (ajt)
February 6, 2019 Filing 1 Remark: Notice of Removal lodged since no fee was received and No Motion to proceed IFP was received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibits 1 and 2 Including Magistrate Case, #4 Exhibits 3, 4, 5 and 6, #5 Exhibit 7, #6 Exhibit 8) (jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BALDWIN TOWER vs. ACKERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM JAMES ACKERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BALDWIN TOWER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?