SNYDER v. TILLER WELL SERVICES, LLC et al

Plaintiff: GLORIA A. SNYDER
Defendant: TILLER WELL SERVICES, LLC, PHILLIP A. HULL, OCTANE TRUCKING, LLC, NOMAC SERVICES, LLC and WIRECO WORLDGROUP, INC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00179
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Robert C Mitchell
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to PHILLIP A. HULL, NOMAC SERVICES, LLC, OCTANE TRUCKING, LLC, TILLER WELL SERVICES, LLC, WIRECO WORLDGROUP, INC (nll)
March 4, 2019 Filing 4 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by GLORIA A. SNYDER. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons) (Drumm, Jesse)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Amended Complaint with proper LLC citizenship allegations due by 3/6/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert C. Mitchell on 2/20/2019. (spc)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to PHILLIP A. HULL, NOMAC SERVICES, LLC, OCTANE TRUCKING, LLC, TILLER WELL SERVICES, LLC, WIRECO WORLDGROUP, INC (jd)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PHILLIP A. HULL, NOMAC SERVICES, LLC, OCTANE TRUCKING, LLC, TILLER WELL SERVICES, LLC, WIRECO WORLDGROUP, INC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5033371), filed by GLORIA A. SNYDER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SNYDER v. TILLER WELL SERVICES, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TILLER WELL SERVICES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILLIP A. HULL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCTANE TRUCKING, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NOMAC SERVICES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WIRECO WORLDGROUP, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLORIA A. SNYDER
Represented By: Jesse A. Drumm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?