WOLF v. ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Plaintiff: MICHAEL P. WOLF
Defendant: ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2019cv00209
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Arthur J Schwab
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER APPROVING #10 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 3/26/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lck)
March 26, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION of Dismissal by ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Syken, Marc)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER it appearing to the Court that the parties have agreed to an amicable resolution of this matter, IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk shall remove this case from the docket for administrative purposes. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, that, in the event either party fails to execute the settlement agreement, the case shall be reinstated to the docket upon written request of either party for purposes of enforcement of the settlement agreement. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that the Court shall retain jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the settlement agreement of the parties. Clerk is to mark CASE CLOSED. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of Court or notice on the matter. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 3/15/19. (ms)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Marc J. Syken to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 3/12/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lck)
March 11, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for attorney Marc J. Syken to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5058791) by ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit, #3 Certificate of Service) (Syken, Marc)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING Initial Case Management set for 3/28/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7C before Judge Arthur J. Schwab. 26(f) Report, Proposed Case Management Order, and ADR Stipulation are due on 3/21/19. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 3/1/19. (lck)
March 1, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Bove, Louis)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Re: Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 2/28/19. (ms)
February 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (ms)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement identifying Zurich American Insurance Company is a wholly owned subsidiary of Zurich Holding Company of America, Inc., a Delaware corporation. Zurich Holding Company of America, Inc. is 99.180% owned directly by Zurich Insurance Company Ltd, a Swiss corporation, with the remaining shares indirectly owned by Zurich Insurance Company Ltd. Zurich Insurance Company Ltd is directly owned by Zurich Insurance Group Ltd, a Swiss corporation. Zurich Insurance Group Ltd is the only publicly traded parent company, with a listing on the Swiss stock exchange, and a further trading of American Depositary Receipts. by ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. (jd)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Common Pleas of Allegheny, case number GD-19-1019 with BOTH Copies attached: Lower Court Complaint, Proof of Service (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5042455), filed by ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Lower Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit Proof of Service, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WOLF v. ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL P. WOLF
Represented By: Mark S. Mislanovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Louis A. Bove
Represented By: Marc J. Syken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?