WARHEIT v. MAYBROOK-C LATROBE OPCO, LLC et al

Plaintiff: SCOTT WARHEIT
Defendant: MAYBROOK-C LATROBE OPCO, LLC and THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 2:2019cv00228
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Nora Barry Fischer
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2019 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by MAYBROOK-C LATROBE OPCO, LLC. (Mechas, Patrick)
April 4, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (mao)
April 3, 2019 Filing 9 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by SCOTT WARHEIT (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (Engel, Carlyle)
March 29, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #6 Praecipe to Issue Summons, #7 Praecipe to Issue Summons. ERROR: No praecipe to issue summons, signed by attorney Engel was filed as the main document. CORRECTION: Attorney Engel advised to create a document entitled Praecipe to Issue Summons and indicate whom she would like summons issued as to and sign the Praecipe. The summons she wants issued should be filed as attachments to the praecipe. This message is for informational purposes only. (ksa)
March 29, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SCOTT WARHEIT. MAYBROOK-C LATROBE OPCO, LLC waiver sent on 3/1/2019, answer due 4/30/2019. (Engel, Carlyle)
March 28, 2019 Filing 7 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by SCOTT WARHEIT (Engel, Carlyle)
March 28, 2019 Filing 6 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by SCOTT WARHEIT (Engel, Carlyle)
March 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew C. Hazi on behalf of MAYBROOK-C LATROBE OPCO, LLC. (Hazi, Andrew)
March 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick L. Mechas on behalf of MAYBROOK-C LATROBE OPCO, LLC. (Mechas, Patrick)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER RE: Rule 12(b) Motions (details more fully stated in said Order). Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 3/1/19. (jg)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jg)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MAYBROOK-C LATROBE OPCO, LLC, THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5039369), filed by SCOTT WARHEIT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Verification, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4) (ksa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WARHEIT v. MAYBROOK-C LATROBE OPCO, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAYBROOK-C LATROBE OPCO, LLC
Represented By: Patrick L. Mechas
Represented By: Andrew C. Hazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCOTT WARHEIT
Represented By: Carlyle J. Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?