KNIGHTLY v. CENTIMARK CORPORATION

Plaintiff: SHAWN KNIGHTLY
Defendant: CENTIMARK CORPORATION
Case Number: 2:2019cv00304
Filed: March 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Peter J Phipps
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29:206
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Wilk on behalf of CENTIMARK CORPORATION. (Wilk, Ryan)
March 19, 2019 Filing 34 Case transferred in from District of Massachusetts; Case Number 1:18-cv-12269. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 19, 2019 Filing 33 Case transferred to the United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet sent to Clerk in that district. (Montes, Mariliz)
March 19, 2019 Filing 32 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered.Order of Transfer. (Montes, Mariliz)
March 19, 2019 Filing 31 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. #9 Motion to Dismiss and/or Transfer Case is ALLOWED to the extent that the case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania for further proceedings. The remainder of CentiMarks motion is DENIED. The clerk shall transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania. (Montes, Mariliz)
March 15, 2019 Filing 30 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: Motion Hearing held on 3/15/2019; The court hears oral argument on the motion to transfer and takes the motion under advisement. re #9 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania. filed by CentiMark Corporation. (Court Reporter: Rachel Lopez at raeufp@gmail.com.) (Simeone, Maria)
March 5, 2019 Filing 29 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting Hearing on Motion #9 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania. : The Motion Hearing has been reset for 3/15/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom 13 before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. (Simeone, Maria)
March 5, 2019 Filing 28 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #27 Motion to Continue. The motion hearing has been rescheduled to 3/15/19 at 11:00am (Simeone, Maria)
March 1, 2019 Filing 27 Assented to MOTION to Continue hearing to March 12, 13 or 15 by Shawn Knightly.(Herold, Suzanne)
February 26, 2019 Filing 26 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion: The Court will hold a hearing on #9 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania on 3/8/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 13 before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. (Montes, Mariliz)
January 25, 2019 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to #9 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania. filed by CentiMark Corporation. (Tuite, Jaime)
January 18, 2019 Filing 24 ADDENDUM re #9 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania. filed by Shawn Knightly. (Herold, Suzanne)
January 11, 2019 Filing 23 Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania. filed by CentiMark Corporation. (Tuite, Jaime)
January 2, 2019 Filing 22 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER ON MOTION TO TRANSFER (DOC. NO. 9) entered. Accordingly, CentiMark, as the proponent of the motion, shall make a supplemental filing addressing these questions, limited to ten pages, no later than January 11, 2019. Knightly may make a supplemental filing in response, limited to ten pages, no later than January 18, 2019. CentiMark may file a reply limited to four pages by January 25, 2019. No further briefing will be allowed unless specifically invited by the Court. The Court expresses no opinion on the parties' other arguments, which remain under advisement. re #9 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania. filed by CentiMark Corporation(Simeone, Maria)
December 20, 2018 Filing 21 Declaration of Christopher Bauer in Support of #20 Sur-Reply to Motion, by Shawn Knightly. (Herold, Suzanne) Modified on 12/21/2018 to correct event (Montes, Mariliz).
December 18, 2018 Filing 20 SUR-REPLY to Motion re #18 MOTION for Leave to File Sur Reply, #9 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania. filed by Shawn Knightly. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Herold, Suzanne)
December 13, 2018 Filing 19 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWED. No further briefing on the pending motion. re #18 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Simeone, Maria)
December 12, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to File Sur Reply by Shawn Knightly.(Herold, Suzanne)
December 11, 2018 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to #14 Cross MOTION to Remand in Response to Defendant's Motion to Transfer filed by CentiMark Corporation. (Tuite, Jaime)
December 3, 2018 Filing 16 Set Deadlines as to #9 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania.. Replies due by 12/13/2018. (Montes, Mariliz)
December 3, 2018 Filing 15 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Knightly's cross-motion to remand, Doc. No. 14, is DENIED because the case clearly meets the requirements for this Court's diversity jurisdiction. CentiMark may file a reply to Knightly's opposition to its motion to transfer, limited to five pages, by December 13, 2018. (Montes, Mariliz)
November 29, 2018 Filing 14 Cross MOTION to Remand in Response to Defendant's Motion to Transfer by Shawn Knightly. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Herold, Suzanne)
November 29, 2018 Filing 13 Opposition re #9 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania. filed by Shawn Knightly. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Herold, Suzanne)
November 26, 2018 Filing 12 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #9 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania. Responses due by 11/30/2018 (Simeone, Maria)
November 23, 2018 Filing 11 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to November 30, 2018 to File Opposition to Motion to Transfer by Shawn Knightly.(Herold, Suzanne) (Modified on 11/26/2018 to Correct CM/ECF Filing Event) (Paine, Matthew).
November 13, 2018 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania. filed by CentiMark Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Employment Agreement of Shawn Knightly)(Hanaka, Philip)
November 13, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania. by CentiMark Corporation.(Hanaka, Philip)
November 9, 2018 Filing 8 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Jaime S. Tuite. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Montes, Mariliz)
November 8, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jaime S. Tuite Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7405543 by CentiMark Corporation.(Hanaka, Philip)
October 31, 2018 Filing 6 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet re 3 Notice (Other) by CentiMark Corporation. (Hanaka, Philip)
October 31, 2018 Filing 5 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail.(Burgos, Sandra)
October 31, 2018 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
October 31, 2018 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel shall complete and file in PDF format a Local Category Form. The form can be found on the court's website under Resources/Forms. (Burgos, Sandra)
October 30, 2018 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CentiMark Corporation. (Hanaka, Philip)
October 30, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CentiMark Corporation ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7388405 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint and Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hanaka, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KNIGHTLY v. CENTIMARK CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTIMARK CORPORATION
Represented By: Jaime S. Tuite
Represented By: Philip M. Hanaka
Represented By: Ryan Wilk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHAWN KNIGHTLY
Represented By: Suzanne L. Herold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?