RODGERS v. LINCOLN BENEFIT LIFE COMPANY et al

Plaintiff: WILLIAM L. RODGERS
Defendant: ROBERT MARTINI, LINCOLN BENEFIT LIFE COMPANY and MARTINI FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00350
Filed: March 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Marilyn J Horan
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for defendant LINCOLN BENEFIT LIFE COMPANY. Lincoln Benefit's response to Plaintiff's complaint shall be filed on or before 4/19/2019. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 4/4/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jgb)
April 3, 2019 Filing 3 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by LINCOLN BENEFIT LIFE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Gosselin, Jason)
March 29, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement identifying LBL HOLDCO, INC. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by LINCOLN BENEFIT LIFE COMPANY. (cel)
March 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from The Court of Common Pleas of Butler County, case number 19-10200 (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5083146) filed by LINCOLN BENEFIT LIFE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (cel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RODGERS v. LINCOLN BENEFIT LIFE COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM L. RODGERS
Represented By: William Larrimer Rodgers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT MARTINI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LINCOLN BENEFIT LIFE COMPANY
Represented By: Jason P. Gosselin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARTINI FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?