BARNHART v. THE TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: MARY BARNHART
Defendant: THE TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2019cv00523
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: David S Cercone
Referring Judge: Marilyn J Horan
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by THE TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Foland, Brooks)
June 14, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY BRIEF re #2 Motion to Dismiss filed by THE TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Foland, Brooks)
June 7, 2019 Filing 16 BRIEF in Opposition re #2 Motion to Dismiss filed by MARY BARNHART. (Martin, William)
June 7, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #2 MOTION to Dismiss filed by MARY BARNHART. (Martin, William)
June 7, 2019 Judge Marilyn J. Horan now presiding. (av)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. The Clerk is directed to reassign this case to another member of the Court for all further proceedings. Judge David S. Cercone no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 6/7/19. (njt)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER - the Case Management Conference scheduled for Wednesday, June 26, 2019, at 10:00 AM is hereby continued until further Order of Court. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 6/5/19. (jmc)
June 5, 2019 Filing 12 BRIEF in Opposition re #11 Motion to Stay filed by THE TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Foland, Brooks)
June 3, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Stay by MARY BARNHART. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Martin, William)
June 3, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by William M. Martin on behalf of MARY BARNHART. (Martin, William)
May 22, 2019 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENT by THE TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Foland, Brooks)
May 13, 2019 Filing 8 Errata re #4 Disclosure Statement by THE TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY. Reason for Correction: Date and Signature. (Foland, Brooks)
May 13, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #4 Disclosure Statement. ERROR: Typed name omitted by s/. CORRECTION: Attorney advised of signature requirements. Attorney to resubmit with signature, using *ERRATA* event (Located under "Other Documents" in the electronic filing system). Attorney also advised to link ERRATA event to #4 Disclosure Statement. This message is for informational purposes only. (jv)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER scheduling Initial Case Management Conference for 6/26/19 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7A before Judge David S. Cercone. Rule 26 conference to be held on or before 6/10/19. Stipulation Selecting ADR Process and Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/17/19. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 5/13/19. (jmc)
May 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jmc)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #2 Motion to Dismiss filed by THE TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY - the Plaintiff shall file her brief in opposition on or before June 10, 2019. Defendant may file a Reply on or before June 24, 2019. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 5/13/19. (jmc)
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by THE TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Foland, Brooks)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 BRIEF in Support re #2 Motion to Dismiss filed by THE TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Foland, Brooks)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss by THE TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Foland, Brooks)
May 6, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Notice of Removal,. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. This message is for informational purposes only. Disclosure Statement due by 5/13/2019. (jv)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of Common Pleas of Fayette County, case number 676 of 2019, G.D. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5124758), filed by THE TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit - Including Complaint) (jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BARNHART v. THE TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY BARNHART
Represented By: William M. Radcliffe
Represented By: William M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Brooks R. Foland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?