KEYBANK, N.A. v. MMD GROUP, LLC et al

Plaintiff: KEYBANK, N.A.
Defendant: PETER J. MAHONEY and MMD GROUP, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00535
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: David S Cercone
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 20 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by PETER J. MAHONEY, MMD GROUP, LLC. (Zinsser, Adam)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER implementing Rule 502(d) at the Joint Request of the Parties. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 6/26/19. (kak)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Mark D. Sheppard, Esquire is appointed as the mediator. Mediation shall be conducted by 8/26/19. The report of mediator shall be electronically filed within 7 days of the mediation conference. Sloane B. ODonnell, Esquire is designated as lead counsel. MARK D. SHEPPARD is added. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 6/26/19. (kak)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Post Discovery Status Conference to be scheduled upon motion of the parties. The parties shall move to amend pleadings or add new parties by 10/25/19. Discovery ends 11/25/19. Plaintiffs Pretrial Statement due by 12/26/19. Defendants Pretrial Statement due by 1/27/20. Pretrial Stipulation due by 2/6/20. Motions for Summary Judgment due by 3/6/20. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 6/26/19. (kak)
June 26, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #16 Notice of Appearance. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant to L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 7/3/2019. (ept)
June 26, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam R. Zinsser on behalf of PETER J. MAHONEY, MMD GROUP, LLC. (Zinsser, Adam)
June 26, 2019 Filing 15 Minute Entry for Case Management Conference held before Judge David S. Cercone on 6/26/2019: Sloane B. ODonnell, Esq. appointed liaison counsel for ADR purposes. The parties have selected Mediation as the ADR Process and have selected Mark D. Shepard, Esq. as the Neutral. The Mediation shall be completed by 8/26/2019. Discovery to close on November 25, 2019. Jury Case Management Order and FRE 502(d) Implementation Order to follow. (Court Reporter: none) (jmc)
June 18, 2019 Filing 14 Errata re #13 Stipulation Selecting ADR process by KEYBANK, N.A.. Reason for Correction: Attorney Signature To Match E-Filer. (O'Donnell, Sloane)
June 18, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #13 Stipulation Selecting ADR process. ERROR: Signature on document and filer do not match. CORRECTION: Attorney advised of signature requirements. Attorney to resubmit the document using the Errata event. (ept)
June 17, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION selecting ADR process by KEYBANK, N.A.. (O'Donnell, Sloane) Document removed from public view and redocketed at #14 . Modified text on 6/19/2019. (ept)
June 7, 2019 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (O'Donnell, Sloane)
June 5, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. ERROR: Wrong event selected. CORRECTION: Re-docketed as Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer. (ept)
June 4, 2019 Filing 11 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by KEYBANK, N.A. Answer due from PETER J. MAHONEY on 7/8/2019; MMD GROUP, LLC on 7/8/2019. (ept)
June 4, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by PETER J. MAHONEY, MMD GROUP, LLC. (Finnegan, John)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER scheduling Initial Case Management Conference for 6/26/19 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 7A before Judge David S. Cercone. Rule 26 conference to be held on or before 6/10/19. Stipulation Selecting ADR Process and Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/17/19. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 5/24/19. (jmc)
May 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by John D. Finnegan on behalf of PETER J. MAHONEY, MMD GROUP, LLC. (Finnegan, John)
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jmc)
May 14, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by KEYBANK, N.A.. MMD GROUP, LLC served on 5/14/2019, answer due 6/4/2019. (Cahillane, Christopher)
May 14, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by KEYBANK, N.A.. PETER J. MAHONEY served on 5/14/2019, answer due 6/4/2019. (Cahillane, Christopher)
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement identifying KeyCorp as corporate parent or other affiliate, by KEYBANK, N.A.. (Cahillane, Christopher)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Sloane B. O'Donnell on behalf of KEYBANK, N.A.. (O'Donnell, Sloane)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to PETER J. MAHONEY, MMD GROUP, LLC (ept)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PETER J. MAHONEY, MMD GROUP, LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5129560), filed by KEYBANK, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons MMD Group, LLC, #8 Summons Peter J. Mahoney) (ept)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KEYBANK, N.A. v. MMD GROUP, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEYBANK, N.A.
Represented By: Christopher W. Cahillane
Represented By: Sloane B. O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PETER J. MAHONEY
Represented By: John D. Finnegan
Represented By: Adam R. Zinsser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MMD GROUP, LLC
Represented By: John D. Finnegan
Represented By: Adam R. Zinsser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?