IN RE KRAFT HEINZ SHAREHOLDER DERIVATIVE LITIGATION
Plaintiff: VLADIMIR GUSINSKY REVOCABLE TRUST
Defendant: JOHN C. POPE, ALEXANDRE VAN DAMME, GREGORY E. ABEL, ARAUJO BASILO, MARCEL HERRMANN TELLES, KRAFT HEINZ COMPANY, CHRISTOPHER R. SKINGER, DAVID H. KNOPF, JEANNE P. JACKSON, GEORGE EL ZOGHBI, BERNARDO HEES, ALEXANDRE BEHRING DA COSTA, TRACY BRITT COOL, MACKEY J. MCDONALD, FEROZ DEWAN, JOHN T. CAHILL,, PAULO LUIZ, VINCE GARLATI, JORGE PAULO LEMANN, PAULO LUIZ ARAUJO BASILO and JOHN T. CAHILL
Consolidated Plaintiff: IAN GREEN, CHARLOTTE HAYS and STEPHEN SILVERMAN
Case Number: 2:2019cv00549
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Mark R Hornak
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE Defendants' Position Statement Regarding Plaintiffs' Lead Counsel Motion filed by GREGORY E. ABEL, PAULO LUIZ ARAUJO BASILO, JOHN T. CAHILL, TRACY BRITT COOL, ALEXANDRE BEHRING DA COSTA, FEROZ DEWAN, GEORGE EL ZOGHBI, VINCE GARLATI, BERNARDO HEES, JEANNE P. JACKSON, DAVID H. KNOPF, KRAFT HEINZ COMPANY, JORGE PAULO LEMANN, MACKEY J. MCDONALD, JOHN C. POPE, CHRISTOPHER R. SKINGER, MARCEL HERRMANN TELLES, ALEXANDRE VAN DAMME. (Kramer, Daniel)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER. Based on the filing of the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (ECF No. 33 at 19-433); and, the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (ECF No. 34 at 19-433), it is hereby ORDERED that #19 Order, is hereby AMENDED as follows: (1) docket numbers 19-549; 19-574; and, 19-613 are hereby CONSOLIDATED at 19-549, the lead case. (2) Any additional stockholder derivative cases filed in or transferred to this Court in the future which involve common questions of law or fact as these consolidated Derivative Actions shall be consolidated with No. 19-549. The balance of #19 Order, remains unchanged. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 6/25/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdb)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED as follows: (1) Docket numbers 19-433; 19;-549; 19-567; 19-574 are hereby CONSOLIDATED; (2) Any additional stockholder derivative cases filed in or transferred to this Court in the future which involve common questions of law or fact as these consolidated Derivative Actions shall be consolidated with No. 19-433. (3) As to the existing Complaints in the above- captioned cases, any obligation to respond under Rule 12 is hereby held in abeyance pending further Order of the Court. (4) On or before June 14, 2019, Plaintiffs in the above-captioned cases shall file any motions for appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel. (5) On or before June 28, 2019, Defendants shall file statements of position as to the motions for appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 6/5/19. (bdb)
June 5, 2019 Filing 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak: Telephonic Status Conference held on 6/4/19. (Court Reporter: Karen Earley) (jad)
May 30, 2019 Filing 17 STATUS REPORT (Joint) by GREGORY E. ABEL, ARAUJO BASILO, JOHN T. CAHILL,, TRACY BRITT COOL, ALEXANDRE BEHRING DA COSTA, FEROZ DEWAN, GEORGE EL ZOGHBI, VINCE GARLATI, BERNARDO HEES, JEANNE P. JACKSON, DAVID H. KNOPF, KRAFT HEINZ COMPANY, JORGE PAULO LEMANN, PAULO LUIZ, MACKEY J. MCDONALD, JOHN C. POPE, CHRISTOPHER R. SKINGER, MARCEL HERRMANN TELLES, ALEXANDRE VAN DAMME. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Kramer, Daniel)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #13 Motion for William A. Clareman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 5/16/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdb)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #12 Motion for Andrew J. Ehrlich to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 5/16/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdb)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #11 Motion for Daniel J. Kramer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 5/16/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdb)
May 15, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for attorney William Clareman to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5139970) by ARAUJO BASILO, ALEXANDRE BEHRING DA COSTA, GEORGE EL ZOGHBI, VINCE GARLATI, BERNARDO HEES, DAVID H. KNOPF, KRAFT HEINZ COMPANY, CHRISTOPHER R. SKINGER. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Clareman, William)
May 15, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for attorney Andrew J. Ehrlich to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5139966) by ARAUJO BASILO, ALEXANDRE BEHRING DA COSTA, GEORGE EL ZOGHBI, VINCE GARLATI, BERNARDO HEES, DAVID H. KNOPF, KRAFT HEINZ COMPANY, CHRISTOPHER R. SKINGER. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Ehrlich, Andrew)
May 15, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for attorney Daniel J. Kramer to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5139959) by ARAUJO BASILO, ALEXANDRE BEHRING DA COSTA, GEORGE EL ZOGHBI, VINCE GARLATI, BERNARDO HEES, DAVID H. KNOPF, KRAFT HEINZ COMPANY, CHRISTOPHER R. SKINGER. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Kramer, Daniel)
May 15, 2019 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement identifying Defendant The Kraft Heinz Company is a publicly traded corporation, that it has no parent company, and that the following publicly held corporation owns 10% or more of its stock: Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. Undersigned counsel further certifies that Defendant The Kraft Heinz Company has four subsidiaries or affiliates that have issued debt securities (but not shares) to the public: Kraft Heinz Foods Company, Kraft Heinz Canada ULC, Heinz Brasil, S.A., and H.J. Heinz Finance UK Plc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by KRAFT HEINZ COMPANY. (Arnold, Roy)
May 14, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Shawna J. English on behalf of ARAUJO BASILO, ALEXANDRE BEHRING DA COSTA, GEORGE EL ZOGHBI, VINCE GARLATI, BERNARDO HEES, DAVID H. KNOPF, KRAFT HEINZ COMPANY, CHRISTOPHER R. SKINGER. (English, Shawna)
May 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Roy W. Arnold on behalf of ARAUJO BASILO, ALEXANDRE BEHRING DA COSTA, GEORGE EL ZOGHBI, VINCE GARLATI, BERNARDO HEES, DAVID H. KNOPF, KRAFT HEINZ COMPANY, CHRISTOPHER R. SKINGER. (Arnold, Roy)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. The filing of any Rule 12 responses shall be held in abeyance pending further Order of the Court. On or before 5/30/19, counsel in cases 19-cv-307, 19-cv-433, 19-cv-549, and any other related case that may be filed in the Western District of Pennsylvania before that date, shall confer and file a joint status report, and may file any joint stipulations related to the coordination of the cases. A Telephonic Status Conference is hereby scheduled for 6/4/19 at 4:30 P.M. Please refer to #4 AT&T Scheduling Notice and use dial-in no. 2 for this conference. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 5/14/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdb)
May 13, 2019 Filing 6 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak: Telephonic Status Conference held on 5/13/19. (Court Reporter: Karen Earley) (jad)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER. A Telephonic Status Conference is hereby SCHEDULED for THIS DATE, 5/13/19, at 1:00 PM before Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak. The conference will be held jointly with 2:19-cv-214 and 2:19-cv-307. Please refer to #4 AT&T Scheduling Notice and use dial-in no. 1 for this conference. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 5/13/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdb)
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this Notice and use either Dial-In No. 1 or Dial-In No. 2, both of which are contained in this Notice. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only", so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (bdb)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER AND PROCEDURES ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 5/13/19. (bdb)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (bdb)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GREGORY E. ABEL, ARAUJO BASILO, JOHN T. CAHILL,, TRACY BRITT COOL, ALEXANDRE BEHRING DA COSTA, FEROZ DEWAN, GEORGE EL ZOGHBI, VINCE GARLATI, BERNARDO HEES, JEANNE P. JACKSON, DAVID H. KNOPF, KRAFT HEINZ COMPANY, JORGE PAULO LEMANN, PAULO LUIZ, MACKEY J. MCDONALD, JOHN C. POPE, CHRISTOPHER R. SKINGER, MARCEL HERRMANN TELLES, ALEXANDRE VAN DAMME (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5132118), filed by VLADIMIR GUSINSKY REVOCABLE TRUST. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN RE KRAFT HEINZ SHAREHOLDER DERIVATIVE LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN C. POPE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEXANDRE VAN DAMME
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREGORY E. ABEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARAUJO BASILO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARCEL HERRMANN TELLES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KRAFT HEINZ COMPANY
Represented By: Daniel J. Kramer
Represented By: Andrew J. Ehrlich
Represented By: William A. Clareman
Represented By: Shawna J. English
Represented By: Roy W. Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER R. SKINGER
Represented By: Daniel J. Kramer
Represented By: Andrew J. Ehrlich
Represented By: William A. Clareman
Represented By: Shawna J. English
Represented By: Roy W. Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID H. KNOPF
Represented By: Daniel J. Kramer
Represented By: Andrew J. Ehrlich
Represented By: William A. Clareman
Represented By: Shawna J. English
Represented By: Roy W. Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEANNE P. JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGE EL ZOGHBI
Represented By: Daniel J. Kramer
Represented By: Andrew J. Ehrlich
Represented By: William A. Clareman
Represented By: Shawna J. English
Represented By: Roy W. Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BERNARDO HEES
Represented By: Daniel J. Kramer
Represented By: Andrew J. Ehrlich
Represented By: William A. Clareman
Represented By: Shawna J. English
Represented By: Roy W. Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEXANDRE BEHRING DA COSTA
Represented By: Daniel J. Kramer
Represented By: Andrew J. Ehrlich
Represented By: William A. Clareman
Represented By: Shawna J. English
Represented By: Roy W. Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRACY BRITT COOL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MACKEY J. MCDONALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEROZ DEWAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN T. CAHILL,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAULO LUIZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VINCE GARLATI
Represented By: Daniel J. Kramer
Represented By: Andrew J. Ehrlich
Represented By: William A. Clareman
Represented By: Shawna J. English
Represented By: Roy W. Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JORGE PAULO LEMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAULO LUIZ ARAUJO BASILO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN T. CAHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VLADIMIR GUSINSKY REVOCABLE TRUST
Represented By: James M. Ficaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: IAN GREEN
Represented By: Craig W. Smith
Represented By: Steven R. Wedeking, II
Represented By: Alfred G. Yates, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: CHARLOTTE HAYS
Represented By: Mary K. Blasy
Represented By: Erik W. Luedeke
Represented By: Michael I. Fistel, Jr.
Represented By: Benny C. Goodman, III
Represented By: Alfred G. Yates, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: STEPHEN SILVERMAN
Represented By: Mary K. Blasy
Represented By: Erik W. Luedeke
Represented By: Michael I. Fistel, Jr.
Represented By: Benny C. Goodman, III
Represented By: Alfred G. Yates, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?