MULLEN v. HOT TOPIC, INC.
Plaintiff: BARTLEY M. MULLEN, JR.
Defendant: HOT TOPIC, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00554
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Joy Flowers Conti
Referring Judge: Maureen P Kelly
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting to be conducted on or before 7/24/2019; Rule 26 Meeting Report and either the Stipulation Selecting ADR Process or the Expedited Docket Stipulation due by 7/31/2019; Initial Case Management set for 8/7/2019 at 08:45 AM in Suite 9280 before Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 07/08/2019. (tjw)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement identifying Sycamore Partners as corporate parent or other affiliate, by HOT TOPIC, INC.. (Malloy, James)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by HOT TOPIC, INC.. (Malloy, James)
June 5, 2019 Filing 5 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by HOT TOPIC, INC. Answer due from HOT TOPIC, INC. on 7/5/2019. (Malloy, James)
June 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by James S. Malloy on behalf of HOT TOPIC, INC.. (Malloy, James)
May 16, 2019 Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly presiding. (nll)
May 16, 2019 Judge Joy Flowers Conti no longer presiding in case. (nll)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by BARTLEY M. MULLEN, JR. HOT TOPIC, INC. served on 5/14/2019, answer due 6/4/2019. (Carlson, R.)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to HOT TOPIC, INC. (jv)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HOT TOPIC, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5133469), filed by BARTLEY M. MULLEN, JR. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons as to Hot Topic, Inc.) (jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MULLEN v. HOT TOPIC, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOT TOPIC, INC.
Represented By: James S. Malloy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARTLEY M. MULLEN, JR.
Represented By: R. Bruce Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?