MULLEN v. SPENCER GIFTS LLC

Plaintiff: BARTLEY M. MULLEN, JR.
Defendant: SPENCER GIFTS LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00555
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Marilyn J Horan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer SPENCER GIFTS LLC answer due 7/23/2019. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 7/2/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jgb)
July 1, 2019 Filing 9 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by BARTLEY M. MULLEN, JR. by SPENCER GIFTS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lucas, Jessica)
June 19, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin W. Tucker on behalf of BARTLEY M. MULLEN, JR. (Tucker, Kevin)
June 4, 2019 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement identifying Spencer Spirit Holdings, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by SPENCER GIFTS LLC. (Lucas, Jessica)
May 29, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #6 Notice of Appearance. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 6/5/2019. (ept)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter G. Siachos on behalf of SPENCER GIFTS LLC. (Siachos, Peter)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by SPENCER GIFTS LLC Answer due from SPENCER GIFTS LLC on 7/3/2019. (Lucas, Jessica)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Lucas on behalf of SPENCER GIFTS LLC. (Lucas, Jessica)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by BARTLEY M. MULLEN, JR. SPENCER GIFTS LLC served on 5/13/2019, answer due 6/3/2019. (Carlson, R.)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to SPENCER GIFTS LLC. (ksa)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 NATIONWIDE CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against SPENCER GIFTS LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400.00, receipt number 0315-5133498), filed by BARTLEY M. MULLEN, JR. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for Spencer Gifts LLC) (ksa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MULLEN v. SPENCER GIFTS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPENCER GIFTS LLC
Represented By: Jessica Lucas
Represented By: Peter G. Siachos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARTLEY M. MULLEN, JR.
Represented By: R. Bruce Carlson
Represented By: Kevin W. Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?