JOHNSON v. SUPREME COURT
Plaintiff: ASIA JOHNSON
Defendant: SUPREME COURT
Case Number: 2:2019cv00565
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Pittsburgh Office
Presiding Judge: Nora Barry Fischer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2019 Filing 6 Remark: Correspondence received from plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (ept)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 Remark: Correspondence letter received from plaintiff. (ept)
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 Remark: Exhibits submitted by plaintiff. (ept)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 JUDGMENT indicating that the Court having dismissed this action for reasons fully stated in the foregoing Memorandum Order, final judgment is entered pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 5/14/2019. (bdk)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MEMORANDUM ORDER granting #1 motion for in forma pauperis status filed by Plaintiff Asia Johnson; dismissing case as frivolous and for failure to state a claim (details more fully stated in said Memorandum Order). Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 5/14/2019. (bdk)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ASIA JOHNSON. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (ept)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JOHNSON v. SUPREME COURT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUPREME COURT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASIA JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?