KAILAS v. HEES et al
Plaintiff: BARBARA KAILAS
Defendant: DAVID KNOPF, JOHN C. POPE, ALEXANDRE BEHRING, ALEXANDRE VAN DAMME, 3G GLOBAL FOOD HOLDINGS, LP, 3G CAPITAL INC., MARCEL HERRMANN TELLES, 3G CAPITAL PARTNERS, LTD, JORGE PAULO LEMANN, JEANNE P. JACKSON, KRAFT HEINZ COMPANY, BERNARDO HEES, JOHN T. CAHILL, TRACY BRITT COOL, HK 318 LP, FEROZ DEWAN, GREGORY ABEL, GEORGE ZOGHBI, PAULO BASILIO and 3G CAPITAL PARTNERS II LP
Case Number: 2:2019cv00567
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Mark R Hornak
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER OF DECONSOLIDATION. Based on the filing of the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (ECF No. 34 at 19-433), this matter is hereby DECONSOLIDATED from the following member cases: 19-433; 19-549; 19-574; and, 19-613. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 6/25/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdb)
June 14, 2019 Update Answer Deadline: Answer due from 3G CAPITAL INC. on 8/6/2019. (ksa)
June 13, 2019 Filing 39 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BARBARA KAILAS. HK 318 LP waiver sent on 6/7/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. (Elgersma, Kara )
June 13, 2019 Filing 38 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BARBARA KAILAS. 3G GLOBAL FOOD HOLDINGS, LP waiver sent on 6/7/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. (Elgersma, Kara )
June 13, 2019 Filing 37 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BARBARA KAILAS. 3G CAPITAL INC. waiver sent on 6/7/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. (Elgersma, Kara ) Modified text on 6/14/2019. (ksa)
June 13, 2019 Filing 36 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BARBARA KAILAS. 3G CAPITAL PARTNERS, LTD waiver sent on 6/7/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. (Elgersma, Kara )
June 13, 2019 Filing 35 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BARBARA KAILAS. 3G CAPITAL PARTNERS II LP waiver sent on 6/7/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. (Elgersma, Kara )
June 13, 2019 Filing 34 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BARBARA KAILAS. TRACY BRITT COOL waiver sent on 5/30/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Elgersma, Kara )
June 13, 2019 Filing 33 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BARBARA KAILAS. MARCEL HERRMANN TELLES waiver sent on 5/30/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Elgersma, Kara )
June 13, 2019 Filing 32 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BARBARA KAILAS. JORGE PAULO LEMANN waiver sent on 5/30/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Elgersma, Kara )
June 13, 2019 Filing 31 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BARBARA KAILAS. JOHN T. CAHILL waiver sent on 5/30/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Elgersma, Kara )
June 13, 2019 Filing 30 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BARBARA KAILAS. JOHN C. POPE waiver sent on 5/30/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Elgersma, Kara )
June 13, 2019 Filing 29 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BARBARA KAILAS. JEANNE P. JACKSON waiver sent on 5/30/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Elgersma, Kara )
June 13, 2019 Filing 28 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BARBARA KAILAS. GREGORY ABEL waiver sent on 5/30/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Elgersma, Kara )
June 13, 2019 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BARBARA KAILAS. FEROZ DEWAN waiver sent on 5/30/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Elgersma, Kara )
June 13, 2019 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BARBARA KAILAS. ALEXANDRE VAN DAMME waiver sent on 5/30/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Elgersma, Kara )
June 13, 2019 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BARBARA KAILAS. ALEXANDRE BEHRING waiver sent on 5/30/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Elgersma, Kara )
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED as follows: (1) Docket numbers 19-433; 19;-549; 19-567; 19-574 are hereby CONSOLIDATED; (2) Any additional stockholder derivative cases filed in or transferred to this Court in the future which involve common questions of law or fact as these consolidated Derivative Actions shall be consolidated with No. 19-433. (3) As to the existing Complaints in the above- captioned cases, any obligation to respond under Rule 12 is hereby held in abeyance pending further Order of the Court. (4) On or before June 14, 2019, Plaintiffs in the above-captioned cases shall file any motions for appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel. (5) On or before June 28, 2019, Defendants shall file statements of position as to the motions for appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 6/5/19. (bdb)
June 5, 2019 Filing 23 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak: Telephonic Status Conference held on 6/4/19. (Court Reporter: Karen Earley) (jad)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER. A Telephonic Status Conference is hereby SCHEDULED for 6/4/19 at 4:30 PM before Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak. The conference will be held jointly with 2:19-cv-307; 2:19-cv-433; 2:19-cv-549; 2:19-cv-74; and, 2:19-cv-613. Please refer to #4 AT&T Scheduling Notice and use dial-in no. 2 for this conference. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 6/3/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdb)
May 31, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas J. Olcott on behalf of BARBARA KAILAS. (Olcott, Douglas)
May 31, 2019 Update Answer Deadline: Answer due from PAULO BASILIO on 7/22/2019; BERNARDO HEES on 7/22/2019; DAVID KNOPF on 7/22/2019; KRAFT HEINZ COMPANY on 7/22/2019; GEORGE ZOGHBI on 7/22/2019. (ksa)
May 30, 2019 Filing 20 STATUS REPORT (Joint) by 3G CAPITAL INC., 3G CAPITAL PARTNERS II LP, 3G CAPITAL PARTNERS, LTD, 3G GLOBAL FOOD HOLDINGS, LP, GREGORY ABEL, PAULO BASILIO, ALEXANDRE BEHRING, JOHN T. CAHILL, TRACY BRITT COOL, FEROZ DEWAN, BERNARDO HEES, HK 318 LP, JEANNE P. JACKSON, DAVID KNOPF, KRAFT HEINZ COMPANY, JORGE PAULO LEMANN, JOHN C. POPE, MARCEL HERRMANN TELLES, ALEXANDRE VAN DAMME, GEORGE ZOGHBI. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Kramer, Daniel)
May 30, 2019 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BARBARA KAILAS. DAVID KNOPF waiver sent on 5/21/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Elgersma, Kara ) Modified text on 5/31/2019. (ksa)
May 30, 2019 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BARBARA KAILAS. KRAFT HEINZ COMPANY waiver sent on 5/21/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Elgersma, Kara ) Modified text on 5/31/2019. (ksa)
May 30, 2019 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BARBARA KAILAS. PAULO BASILIO waiver sent on 5/21/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Elgersma, Kara ) Modified text on 5/31/2019. (ksa)
May 30, 2019 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BARBARA KAILAS. GEORGE ZOGHBI waiver sent on 5/21/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Elgersma, Kara ) Modified text on 5/31/2019. (ksa)
May 30, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BARBARA KAILAS. BERNARDO HEES waiver sent on 5/21/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Elgersma, Kara ) Modified text on 5/31/2019. (ksa)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #12 Motion for Andrew J. Ehrlich to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 5/29/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdb)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #11 Motion for Kenneth A. Wexler to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 5/29/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdb)
May 28, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for attorney Andrew J. Ehrlich to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5152870) by PAULO BASILIO, ALEXANDRE BEHRING, BERNARDO HEES, DAVID KNOPF, KRAFT HEINZ COMPANY, GEORGE ZOGHBI. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Ehrlich, Andrew)
May 28, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for attorney Kenneth A. Wexler to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5152824) by BARBARA KAILAS. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wexler, Kenneth)
May 24, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ERROR: Proposed Order was not attached. CORRECTION: Attorney Elgersma is advised for future reference to file a proposed order as a separate PDF document and filed as an attachment to any motion filed in a civil case. No further action is required as this motion has been ruled on by the Court. This message is for informational purposes only. (ksa)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion for William A. Clareman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 5/24/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdb)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion for Kara A. Elgersma to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 5/24/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdb)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion for Daniel J. Kramer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 5/24/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdb)
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for attorney William A. Clareman to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5149740) by PAULO BASILIO, ALEXANDRE BEHRING, BERNARDO HEES, DAVID KNOPF, KRAFT HEINZ COMPANY, GEORGE ZOGHBI. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Clareman, William)
May 23, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for attorney Kara A. Elgersma to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5149658) by BARBARA KAILAS. (Attachments: #1 Letter of Good Standing) (Elgersma, Kara )
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for attorney Daniel J. Kramer to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5149586) by PAULO BASILIO, ALEXANDRE BEHRING, BERNARDO HEES, DAVID KNOPF, KRAFT HEINZ COMPANY, GEORGE ZOGHBI. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Kramer, Daniel)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this Notice and use either Dial-In No. 1 or Dial-In No. 2, both of which are contained in this Notice. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only", so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (bdb)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER AND PROCEDURES ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 5/22/19. (bdb) Modified text on 5/23/19 to correct document title in docket text. (bdb)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (bdb)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 SHAREHOLDER DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT against 3G CAPITAL INC., 3G CAPITAL PARTNERS II LP, 3G CAPITAL PARTNERS, LTD, 3G GLOBAL FOOD HOLDINGS, LP, GREGORY ABEL, PAULO BASILIO, ALEXANDRE BEHRING, JOHN T. CAHILL, TRACY BRITT COOL, FEROZ DEWAN, BERNARDO HEES, HK 318 LP, JEANNE P. JACKSON, DAVID KNOPF, KRAFT HEINZ COMPANY, JORGE PAULO LEMANN, JOHN C. POPE, MARCEL HERRMANN TELLES, ALEXANDRE VAN DAMME, GEORGE ZOGHBI (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5135576), filed by BARBARA KAILAS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ksa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KAILAS v. HEES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID KNOPF
Represented By: William A. Clareman
Represented By: Daniel J. Kramer
Represented By: Andrew J. Ehrlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN C. POPE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEXANDRE BEHRING
Represented By: William A. Clareman
Represented By: Daniel J. Kramer
Represented By: Andrew J. Ehrlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEXANDRE VAN DAMME
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3G GLOBAL FOOD HOLDINGS, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3G CAPITAL INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARCEL HERRMANN TELLES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3G CAPITAL PARTNERS, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JORGE PAULO LEMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEANNE P. JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KRAFT HEINZ COMPANY
Represented By: William A. Clareman
Represented By: Daniel J. Kramer
Represented By: Andrew J. Ehrlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BERNARDO HEES
Represented By: William A. Clareman
Represented By: Daniel J. Kramer
Represented By: Andrew J. Ehrlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN T. CAHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRACY BRITT COOL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HK 318 LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEROZ DEWAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREGORY ABEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGE ZOGHBI
Represented By: William A. Clareman
Represented By: Daniel J. Kramer
Represented By: Andrew J. Ehrlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAULO BASILIO
Represented By: William A. Clareman
Represented By: Daniel J. Kramer
Represented By: Andrew J. Ehrlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3G CAPITAL PARTNERS II LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARBARA KAILAS
Represented By: Kara A. Elgersma
Represented By: Christopher J. Regan
Represented By: Kenneth A. Wexler
Represented By: Douglas J. Olcott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?