YOUNG et al v. ALLEGHENY COUNTY JAIL et al
Plaintiff: ERIC L FARRAR, JR and LEONARD YOUNG
Defendant: MAJOR SMITH, DEPUTY LAURA K. WILLIAMS and ALLEGHENY COUNTY JAIL
Case Number: 2:2019cv00569
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Reed Eddy
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 INMATE ACCOUNT STATEMENT by LEONARD YOUNG. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (elt) Modified text on 7/1/2019. (jd)
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 Authorization permitting withdrawal of prison account funds to pay filing fee by ERIC L FARRAR, JR. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (sms)
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Special Relief by LEONARD YOUNG. (Attachments: #1 Account Statement, #2 Envelope) (av)
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ERIC L FARRAR, JR. (plp)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR STATISTICAL CLOSING. When Plaintiffs have met all the requirements to file a lawsuit, their paperwork will be processed and this case will be reopened. All requisite paperwork must be filed by Plaintiffs by June 28, 2019, or it will be recommended that this case be dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 5/17/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bsc)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. When more than one prisoner seeks to join in a complaint against a government official or entity, the plaintiffs may prepay a single $400 filing fee or each prisoner must seek and obtain in forma pauperis status. If Plaintiffs have not submitted the proper paperwork in compliance with this Order by June 28, 2019, it will be recommended that the case be dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 5/17/2019. (bsc)
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by ERIC L FARRAR, JR, LEONARD YOUNG. (jd)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by ERIC L FARRAR, JR, LEONARD YOUNG. (jd)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ALLEGHENY COUNTY JAIL, LEONARD YOUNG. (Attachments: #1 COMPLAINT LODGED PENDING RULING ON IFP, #2 Exhibit) (jd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/14/2019: #3 Envelope) (jd) (Main Document 1 replaced on 5/15/2019) (sms) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/15/2019: #4 Authorization form) (sms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: YOUNG et al v. ALLEGHENY COUNTY JAIL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAJOR SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPUTY LAURA K. WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLEGHENY COUNTY JAIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIC L FARRAR, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEONARD YOUNG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?