TRADESMEN INTERNATIONAL, LLC v. MAGGI et al
Plaintiff: TRADESMEN INTERNATIONAL, LLC
Defendant: JERRY LEDFORD, COMMERCIAL TRADE SERVICE, INC. and CHAD MAGGI
Case Number: 2:2019cv00573
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Patricia L Dodge
Referring Judge: Robert C Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Answer #9 . All Defendants shall file an Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint #1 no later than 8/12/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 7/10/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ahm)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by TRADESMEN INTERNATIONAL, LLC by COMMERCIAL TRADE SERVICE, INC., JERRY LEDFORD, CHAD MAGGI. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Linn, Robert)
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by COMMERCIAL TRADE SERVICE, INC., JERRY LEDFORD, CHAD MAGGI. (Linn, Robert)
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by JERRY LEDFORD, CHAD MAGGI, COMMERCIAL TRADE SERVICE, INC. Answer due from All Defendants. (Linn, Robert)
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ingrid A. Bohme on behalf of COMMERCIAL TRADE SERVICE, INC., JERRY LEDFORD, CHAD MAGGI. (Bohme, Ingrid)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M. Linn on behalf of COMMERCIAL TRADE SERVICE, INC., JERRY LEDFORD, CHAD MAGGI. (Linn, Robert)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Robert C. Mitchell no longer assigned to case. All previously scheduled deadlines and proceedings shall remain in effect unless otherwise ordered by the Court. See order at 2:19-mc-711. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 6/6/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (admin1, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by TRADESMEN INTERNATIONAL, LLC. COMMERCIAL TRADE SERVICE, INC. served on 5/22/2019, answer due 6/12/2019; JERRY LEDFORD served on 5/21/2019, answer due 6/11/2019; CHAD MAGGI served on 5/21/2019, answer due 6/11/2019. (Presley, Marla)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by TRADESMEN INTERNATIONAL, LLC. (Presley, Marla)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against COMMERCIAL TRADE SERVICE, INC., JERRY LEDFORD, CHAD MAGGI (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5139140), filed by TRADESMEN INTERNATIONAL, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (ept)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TRADESMEN INTERNATIONAL, LLC v. MAGGI et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JERRY LEDFORD
Represented By: Ingrid A. Bohme
Represented By: Robert M. Linn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMERCIAL TRADE SERVICE, INC.
Represented By: Ingrid A. Bohme
Represented By: Robert M. Linn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHAD MAGGI
Represented By: Ingrid A. Bohme
Represented By: Robert M. Linn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRADESMEN INTERNATIONAL, LLC
Represented By: Marla N. Presley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?