UTILITY WORKERS UNITED ASSOCIATION, LOCAL 537 v. PENNSYLVANIA AMERICAN WATER COMPANY
Plaintiff: UTILITY WORKERS UNITED ASSOCIATION, LOCAL 537
Defendant: PENNSYLVANIA AMERICAN WATER COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2019cv00580
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Alan N Bloch
Referring Judge: Lisa Pupo Lenihan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss, as more fully stated in said order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 05/22/2019. (jmb)
May 20, 2019 Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan added. (jm)
May 20, 2019 Judge Alan N. Bloch no longer assigned to case. (jm)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by UTILITY WORKERS UNITED ASSOCIATION, LOCAL 537. (Pasquarelli, Samuel)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to PENNSYLVANIA AMERICAN WATER COMPANY (cel)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PENNSYLVANIA AMERICAN WATER COMPANY (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5141064) filed by UTILITY WORKERS UNITED ASSOCIATION, LOCAL 537. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Part 1, #3 Exhibit A - Part 2, #4 Exhibit B) (cel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UTILITY WORKERS UNITED ASSOCIATION, LOCAL 537 v. PENNSYLVANIA AMERICAN WATER COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PENNSYLVANIA AMERICAN WATER COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UTILITY WORKERS UNITED ASSOCIATION, LOCAL 537
Represented By: Samuel J. Pasquarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?