PHILLIPS v. WETZEL et al

Plaintiff: EDWARD PHILLIPS, JR.
Defendant: SHANE DADY, MR/MS HATTEN, JOHN WETZEL, CO PAGLIAROLI, CO DORN, CO STONE, MELISSA ADAMS, DAWN SANTANA, LISA GRAVES, LT. WHITESELL, WILLIAM J. WOODS, ADAM LIGAS and LT. MCCRACKEN
Case Number: 2:2019cv00590
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Maureen P Kelly
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DEFICIENCY ORDER: The complaint filed in the above-captioned matter will not be processed as the Plaintiff has failed to provide service copies, Process Receipt and Return Forms (USM-285), and Notice and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons forms for each defendant. The Plaintiff is ordered to submit the required paperwork as outlined above on or before 7/22/2019 or this matter will be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Submission of Required Paperwork due by 7/22/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 07/01/2019. A copy of this Notice, the accompanying Order, and blank copies of the USM-285 and Notice and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons forms have been mailed to Plaintiff's address of record this date. (tjw)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against MELISSA ADAMS, SHANE DADY, CO DORN, LISA GRAVES, MR/MS HATTEN, ADAM LIGAS, LT. MCCRACKEN, CO PAGLIAROLI, DAWN SANTANA, CO STONE, JOHN WETZEL, LT. WHITESELL, WILLIAM J. WOODS ), filed by EDWARD PHILLIPS, JR. (Attachments: #1 exhibit list, #2 Exhibit) (plp)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is directed to file the Complaint docketed at ECF No. 1-3 and to strike the "Proposed Complaint" Docketed at ECF No. 1-4 as a near duplicate. The Inmate Accounting Officer is directed to deduct the filing fee from Plaintiff's trust fund account in accordance with the accompanying order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 06/19/2019. A copy of this Order and the Notice of Electronic Filing are being sent via first class mail to Plaintiff's address of record and the Inmate Accounting Officer at SCI Greene. (tjw)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by EDWARD PHILLIPS, JR. (plp)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by EDWARD PHILLIPS, JR. (Attachments: #1 Authorization, #2 Inmate Account Statement, #3 proposed complaint and #4 proposed complaint - part 2, both lodged pending disposition of motion to proceed in forma pauperis or the payment of the filing fee#5 Exhibit list, #6 Exhibit, #7 Envelope) (plp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PHILLIPS v. WETZEL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHANE DADY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MR/MS HATTEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN WETZEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO PAGLIAROLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO DORN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO STONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MELISSA ADAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAWN SANTANA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LISA GRAVES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LT. WHITESELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM J. WOODS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADAM LIGAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LT. MCCRACKEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD PHILLIPS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?