LONG v. ARAMARK INC.

Plaintiff: CAMILLE R. LONG
Defendant: ARAMARK INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00591
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Marilyn J Horan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/13/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 8A before Judge Marilyn J. Horan. Rule 26 Meeting Report and Stipulation Selecting ADR due by 8/6/2019. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 7/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (bjl)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion for Anne E. Martinez to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 6/25/2019. (jgb)
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for attorney Anne E. Martinez to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5185805) by ARAMARK INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Martinez, Anne)
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement identifying Aramark as corporate parent or other affiliate, by ARAMARK INC.. (Marzullo, Lauren)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Defenses by ARAMARK INC.. (Marzullo, Lauren)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren E. Marzullo on behalf of ARAMARK INC.. (Marzullo, Lauren)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER AND PROCEDURES ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 5/21/2019. (jgb)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to ARAMARK INC. (jjg)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ARAMARK INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5144053), filed by CAMILLE R. LONG. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (jjg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LONG v. ARAMARK INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARAMARK INC.
Represented By: Anne Martinez
Represented By: Lauren E. Marzullo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAMILLE R. LONG
Represented By: Timothy M. Kolman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?