ECKERT v. MENTCH et al

Plaintiff: BARRY L. ECKERT
Defendant: MR. WEEKLEY, J. A. MENTCH and L. R. WEEKLEY
Case Number: 2:2019cv00600
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Reed Eddy
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 12 Notice from USMS that order, notice, complaint and waivers were mailed to defendants J.A. MENTCH and SGT. L.R. WEEKELY on 7/15/2019 for service. (plp)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the United States Marshal is directed to mail a copy of the Amended Complaint, notice of lawsuit and request for waiver of service of summons, and waiver, and this order to Defendants as directed by the Plaintiff, costs to be advanced by the United States of America. The Defendants are requested to waive service pursuant to Rule 4(d). Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 7/2/2019. (sms)
June 14, 2019 Filing 9 Partial Payment of Filing Fee by BARRY L. ECKERT. Fee $12.33, receipt number 24668056797. (gmt)
June 10, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against J. A. MENTCH, L. R. WEEKLEY, filed by BARRY L. ECKERT. (sms)
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint. ECF #7 is deemed Plaintiff's AMENDED COMPLAINT and is Plaintiff's operative pleading. The Amended Complaint, however, will not be served upon Defendants until the initial partial payment of $12.33 is paid. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 6/10/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bsc)
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Amend/Correct #5 Complaint by BARRY L. ECKERT. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (plp)
May 30, 2019 Filing 6 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER FOR PRO SE CIVIL RIGHTS CASES. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 5/30/2019. (sms)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against J. A. MENTCH, WEEKLEY, filed by BARRY L. ECKERT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (plp)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court is directed to file the Complaint. Plaintiff shall pay $12.33 as an initial partial filing fee as provided by 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1)(A); however, Plaintiff is assessed the total $350.00 filing fee in this case. Plaintiff is advised that no further action will be taken in this case until the initial partial fee of $12.33 is paid in full. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 5/28/2019. (sms)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by BARRY L. ECKERT. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (sdp)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by BARRY L. ECKERT. (plp)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by BARRY L. ECKERT. (Attachments: #1 Authorization, #2 proposed complaint lodged pending disposition of the motion to proceed in forma pauperis or the payment of the filing fee, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Envelope) (plp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ECKERT v. MENTCH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARRY L. ECKERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MR. WEEKLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. A. MENTCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. R. WEEKLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?