CRIGLER v. SEVEN POINT ENERGY SERVICES, INC.

Plaintiff: WILLIAM CRIGLER
Defendant: SEVEN POINT ENERGY SERVICES, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00604
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Marilyn J Horan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to SEVEN POINT ENERGY SERVICES, INC. (cjo)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by WILLIAM CRIGLER (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Rihn, D.)
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas A. Migliaccio on behalf of WILLIAM CRIGLER. (Migliaccio, Nicholas)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER AND PROCEDURES ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 5/23/2019. (jgb)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 CONSENT TO OPT IN as a class member by William Elliot Crigler. (jv)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SEVEN POINT ENERGY SERVICES, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5147067), filed by WILLIAM CRIGLER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CRIGLER v. SEVEN POINT ENERGY SERVICES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEVEN POINT ENERGY SERVICES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM CRIGLER
Represented By: D. Aaron Rihn
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?