GREEN v. BEHRING et al

Plaintiff: IAN GREEN
Defendant: JOHN C. POPE, ALEXANDRE VAN DAMME, GREGORY E. ABEL, MARCEL HERRMANN TELLES, PAULO BASILIO, DAVID H. KNOPF, ALEXANDER BEHRING, JEANNE P. JACKSON, VINCE GARLATI, BERNARDO HEES, JOHN T. CAHILL, TRACY BRITT COOL, THE KRAFT HEINZ COMPANY, FEROZ DEWAN, GEORGE ZOGHBI, JORGE PAULO LEMANN and CHRISTOPHER R. SKINGER
Case Number: 2:2019cv00613
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Mark R Hornak
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER. Based on the filing of the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (ECF No. 33 at 19-433); and, the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (ECF No. 34 at 19-433), it is hereby ORDERED that #18 Order, is hereby AMENDED as follows: (1) docket numbers 19-549; 19-574; and, 19-613 are hereby CONSOLIDATED at 19-549, the lead case. (2) Any additional stockholder derivative cases filed in or transferred to this Court in the future which involve common questions of law or fact as these consolidated Derivative Actions shall be consolidated with No. 19-549. The balance of #18 Order, remains unchanged. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 6/25/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdb)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED as follows: (1) Docket numbers 19-433; 19;-549; 19-567; 19-574 are hereby CONSOLIDATED; (2) Any additional stockholder derivative cases filed in or transferred to this Court in the future which involve common questions of law or fact as these consolidated Derivative Actions shall be consolidated with No. 19-433. (3) As to the existing Complaints in the above- captioned cases, any obligation to respond under Rule 12 is hereby held in abeyance pending further Order of the Court. (4) On or before June 14, 2019, Plaintiffs in the above-captioned cases shall file any motions for appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel. (5) On or before June 28, 2019, Defendants shall file statements of position as to the motions for appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 6/5/19. (bdb)
June 5, 2019 Filing 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak: Telephonic Status Conference held on 6/4/19. (Court Reporter: Karen Earley) (jad)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #15 Motion for Andrew J. Ehrlich to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 6/5/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdb)
June 4, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for attorney Andrew J. Ehrlich to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5160271) by PAULO BASILIO, ALEXANDER BEHRING, VINCE GARLATI, BERNARDO HEES, DAVID H. KNOPF, CHRISTOPHER R. SKINGER, THE KRAFT HEINZ COMPANY, GEORGE ZOGHBI. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew J. Ehrlich, #2 Proposed Order) (Ehrlich, Andrew)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #12 Motion for William A. Clareman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 6/4/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdb)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #11 Motion for Daniel J. Kramer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 6/4/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdb)
June 3, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for attorney William A. Clareman to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5159496) by PAULO BASILIO, ALEXANDER BEHRING, VINCE GARLATI, BERNARDO HEES, DAVID H. KNOPF, CHRISTOPHER R. SKINGER, THE KRAFT HEINZ COMPANY, GEORGE ZOGHBI. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William A. Clareman, #2 Proposed Order) (Clareman, William)
June 3, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for attorney Daniel J. Kramer to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5159474) by PAULO BASILIO, ALEXANDER BEHRING, VINCE GARLATI, BERNARDO HEES, DAVID H. KNOPF, CHRISTOPHER R. SKINGER, THE KRAFT HEINZ COMPANY, GEORGE ZOGHBI. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel J. Kramer, #2 Proposed Order) (Kramer, Daniel)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion for Steven R. Wedeking, II to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 6/3/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdb)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion for Craig W. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 6/3/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdb)
May 31, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for attorney Steven R. Wedeking to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5158120) by IAN GREEN. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Steven R. Wedeking, II in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Proposed Order) (Wedeking, Steven)
May 31, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for attorney Craig W. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5158075) by IAN GREEN. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Craig W. Smith in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Proposed Order) (Smith, Craig)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER. A Telephonic Status Conference is hereby SCHEDULED for 6/4/19 at 4:30 PM before Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak. The conference will be held jointly with 2:19-cv-307; 2:19-cv-433; and, 2:19-cv-549. Please refer to #5 AT&T Scheduling Notice and use dial-in no. 2 for this conference. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 5/31/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdb) Modified text on 5/31/2019. (bdb)
May 31, 2019 Filing 5 AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this Notice and use either Dial-In No. 1 or Dial-In No. 2, both of which are contained in this Notice. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only", so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (bdb)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER AND PROCEDURES ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 5/31/19. (bdb)
May 31, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (bdb)
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 STATUS REPORT (Joint) by GREGORY E. ABEL, PAULO BASILIO, ALEXANDER BEHRING, JOHN T. CAHILL, TRACY BRITT COOL, FEROZ DEWAN, VINCE GARLATI, BERNARDO HEES, JEANNE P. JACKSON, DAVID H. KNOPF, JORGE PAULO LEMANN, JOHN C. POPE, CHRISTOPHER R. SKINGER, MARCEL HERRMANN TELLES, THE KRAFT HEINZ COMPANY, ALEXANDRE VAN DAMME, GEORGE ZOGHBI. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Kramer, Daniel)
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GREGORY E. ABEL, PAULO BASILIO, ALEXANDER BEHRING, JOHN T. CAHILL, TRACY BRITT COOL, FEROZ DEWAN, VINCE GARLATI, BERNARDO HEES, JEANNE P. JACKSON, DAVID H. KNOPF, JORGE PAULO LEMANN, JOHN C. POPE, CHRISTOPHER R. SKINGER, MARCEL HERRMANN TELLES, THE KRAFT HEINZ COMPANY, ALEXANDRE VAN DAMME, GEORGE ZOGHBI (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5149773), filed by IAN GREEN. (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GREEN v. BEHRING et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN C. POPE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEXANDRE VAN DAMME
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREGORY E. ABEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARCEL HERRMANN TELLES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAULO BASILIO
Represented By: William A. Clareman
Represented By: Andrew J. Ehrlich
Represented By: Daniel J. Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID H. KNOPF
Represented By: William A. Clareman
Represented By: Andrew J. Ehrlich
Represented By: Daniel J. Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEXANDER BEHRING
Represented By: William A. Clareman
Represented By: Andrew J. Ehrlich
Represented By: Daniel J. Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEANNE P. JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VINCE GARLATI
Represented By: William A. Clareman
Represented By: Andrew J. Ehrlich
Represented By: Daniel J. Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BERNARDO HEES
Represented By: William A. Clareman
Represented By: Andrew J. Ehrlich
Represented By: Daniel J. Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN T. CAHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRACY BRITT COOL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE KRAFT HEINZ COMPANY
Represented By: William A. Clareman
Represented By: Andrew J. Ehrlich
Represented By: Daniel J. Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEROZ DEWAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGE ZOGHBI
Represented By: William A. Clareman
Represented By: Andrew J. Ehrlich
Represented By: Daniel J. Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JORGE PAULO LEMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER R. SKINGER
Represented By: William A. Clareman
Represented By: Andrew J. Ehrlich
Represented By: Daniel J. Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IAN GREEN
Represented By: Alfred G. Yates, Jr.
Represented By: Craig W. Smith
Represented By: Steven R. Wedeking, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?