HURT v. ALLEGHENY COUNTY BUREAU OF CORRECTIONS et al
Plaintiff: JULIUS HURT
Defendant: ORLANDO HARPER, ALLEGHENY COUNTY MEDICAL STAFF, ALLEGHENY COUNTY BUREAU OF CORRECTIONS, SERGEANT RADACI and Zachary McGuire
Case Number: 2:2019cv00653
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Lisa Pupo Lenihan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2019 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Middle; Case Number 3:19-cv-00919. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 6, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: This case has been electronically transferred to the Western District of Pennsylvania. (ga)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER -This case shall be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania for further proceedings, including disposition of plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis.Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 6/5/19. (ms)
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 PRO SE LETTER and STANDING PRACTICE ORDER issued; (ep)
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 U.S. MARSHAL - 285, AO 398 and AO 399 Service Forms Completed by Plaintiff. (ep)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION by Julius Hurt allowing prison to submit copy of prisoner's trust fund account to the court, and approving the entire filing fee to be deducted from prisoner inmate account.. (ep)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Julius Hurt.(ep)
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Allegheny County Bureau of Corrections, Allegheny County Medical Staff, Orlando Harper, Zachary McGuire, Radaci lodged pending the disposition of the Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Julius Hurt.(ep)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HURT v. ALLEGHENY COUNTY BUREAU OF CORRECTIONS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORLANDO HARPER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLEGHENY COUNTY MEDICAL STAFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLEGHENY COUNTY BUREAU OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SERGEANT RADACI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zachary McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JULIUS HURT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?