OSORIO v. TCV COMMUNITY SERVICES, et al
Plaintiff: MIRIAM OSORIO
Defendant: ASHLEY LEONARD BRINKMAN, CAPITAL HEALTHCARE SOLUTIONS, INC., TCV COMMUNITY SERVICES, DAWN BERARDO and RICHARD WHITE
Case Number: 2:2019cv00660
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Joy Flowers Conti
Referring Judge: Maureen P Kelly
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DAWN BERARDO. DAWN BERARDO waiver sent on 7/15/2019, answer due 9/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jd)
July 29, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by U.S. Marshal that Waiver of the Service of Summons Forms were mailed to FRANCES SHEEDY BOST on July 15, 2019; Waiver is unexecuted. (Attachments: #1 Notice, #2 Envelope) (cel)
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RICHARD WHITE; waiver sent on 7/15/2019, answer due 9/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (plp)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 US Marshal's Returns as to the mailing of Waivers executed on 7/15/19. (cel) Modified text on 7/16/2019. (cel)
July 11, 2019 Remark: Copy of Notice and Order at ECF No. 4 mailed to Plaintiff's address of record this date. (tjw)
July 11, 2019 Remark: Services copies forwarded to US Marshals this date. (tjw)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that the Marshal is directed to mail a copy of the complaint, notice of lawsuit, request for waiver of service of summons, waiver, and this order to defendant as directed by plaintiff. Costs shall be advanced by the government. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 07/11/2019. (tjw)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against DAWN BERARDO, ASHLEY LEONARD BRINKMAN, CAPITAL HEALTHCARE SOLUTIONS, INC., TCV COMMUNITY SERVICES, RICHARD WHITE (IFP Granted), filed by MIRIAM OSORIO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cel)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 07/01/2019. The Clerk of Court is directed to file the Complaint. A copy of this Notice and Order have been mailed to Plaintiff's address of record this date. (tjw) Modified text on 7/2/2019. (tjw)
June 11, 2019 Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly added. (mao)
June 11, 2019 Judge Joy Flowers Conti no longer assigned to case. (mao)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by MIRIAM OSORIO. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (cel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OSORIO v. TCV COMMUNITY SERVICES, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASHLEY LEONARD BRINKMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPITAL HEALTHCARE SOLUTIONS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TCV COMMUNITY SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAWN BERARDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD WHITE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MIRIAM OSORIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?