BROWN v. COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA et al

Petitioner: SHAWN BROWN
Respondent: PA STATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA and DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF WASHINGTON COUNTY
Case Number: 2:2019cv00663
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Pittsburgh Office
Presiding Judge: Maureen P Kelly
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER directing Respondent Washington County District Attorney's Office to comply with Local Civil Rule 7.D. and this Court's Order of 7/23/2019 at ECF No. 21 and file a proposed order relative to #20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. In accordance with Local Civil Rule 7.D., all motions must be accompanied by a proposed order of court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 07/31/2019. A copy of this Order has been mailed to Petitioner's address of record. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (tjw)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus . The Department of Corrections shall file an answer or otherwise respond by 9/3/2019.Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 07/31/2019. A copy of this Notice and Order have been mailed to Petitioner's address of record. (tjw)
July 30, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Macus, Maria)
July 30, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria G. Macus on behalf of PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS. (Macus, Maria)
July 23, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. ERROR: Proposed Order was not attached. CORRECTION: Attorney is advised to file a proposed order by using the Proposed Order event and linking it to the document in question. (av)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER directing Respondent Washington County District Attorney's Office to comply with Local Civil Rule 7.D. and file a proposed order relative to the Motion Extension of Time filed in this case at ECF No. 20. In accordance with Local Civil Rule 7.D., all motions must be accompanied by a proposed order of court. A copy of this order will be mailed to Petitioner at his address of record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 7/23/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (Kelly, Maureen)
July 22, 2019 Filing 20 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF WASHINGTON COUNTY. (Vittone, Eugene)
July 22, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Eugene A. Vittone, II on behalf of DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF WASHINGTON COUNTY. (Vittone, Eugene)
July 11, 2019 Filing 17 Remark: Copy of Notice and Order at ECF No. 15 mailed to Petitioner's address of record this date. Text-only entry. No PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (tjw)
July 11, 2019 Filing 16 Remark: Service copies forwarded to US Marshals this date. Text-only entry. No PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (tjw)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DIRECTING that the United States Marshal shall make service of this order, together with a copy of the petition, upon the respondents by certified mail - return receipt requested, costs to be advanced by the United States. Within 21 days of service of this order, respondents shall respond to the allegations of the petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. The District Attorney shall furnish this court with the state court records. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 07/11/2019. (tjw)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to amend the caption of the this matter to include the District Attorney of Washington County, which is the County where Petitioners conviction was obtained. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 07/01/2019. A copy of this Notice and Order have been mailed to Petitioner's address of record this date. (tjw)
July 1, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by SHAWN BROWN (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope) (av)
June 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of election form by SHAWN BROWN re #10 Order, (jv)
June 25, 2019 Filing 11 Supplement Document re #9 Petition for Habeas Corpus. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jv)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: On or before July 5, 2019, Petitioner shall complete and file the enclosed election form indicating an election to have the Petition construed and ruled upon under 28 U.S.C. 2254 or to withdraw the current Petition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 06/17/2019. A copy of this notice, Order, and Election Form have been mailed to Petitioner's address of record this date. (Attachments: #1 Election Form) (tjw)
June 7, 2019 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Middle; Case Number 3:19-cv-00864. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the WDPA. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 6/7/2019. (bg)
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry). Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 6/7/2019. (bg) Modified text on 6/10/2019. (ksa)
June 4, 2019 Receipt of payment from SHAWN BROWN in the amount of $5.00 for WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. Transaction posted on 6/3/2019. Receipt number 333066037 processed by aoswald. (jjs, )
June 3, 2019 Filing 5 Letter re Filing Fee filed by Shawn Brown.(bg) Modified on 6/6/2019 (bg).
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the petitioner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 05/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP (habeas corpus))(lp)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED (bg)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Shawn Brown.(bg)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus lodged pending the disposition of the Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Shawn Brown.(bg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BROWN v. COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: PA STATE ATTORNEY GENERAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Represented By: Maria G. Macus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF WASHINGTON COUNTY
Represented By: Eugene A. Vittone, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SHAWN BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?