WARD et al v. LATHAM POOL PRODUCTS, INC.
Plaintiff: RICHARD WARD and REBECCA WARD
Defendant: LATHAM POOL PRODUCTS, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00695
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Maureen P Kelly
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Response re #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim: Response to Motion due by 8/27/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 08/06/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (tjw)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 BRIEF in Support re #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement filed by LATHAM POOL PRODUCTS, INC.. (Rosenberger, Jason)
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement by LATHAM POOL PRODUCTS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Rosenberger, Jason)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by LATHAM POOL PRODUCTS, INC.. (Rosenberger, Jason)
June 21, 2019 Update Answer Deadline: Answer due from LATHAM POOL PRODUCTS, INC. on 8/5/2019 (ept)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond by LATHAM POOL PRODUCTS, INC.. (Rosenberger, Jason)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason A. Rosenberger on behalf of LATHAM POOL PRODUCTS, INC.. (Rosenberger, Jason)
June 17, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Notice of Removal. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 6/24/2019. (ept)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Common Pleas of Allegheny County, case number GD-19-007112 Copies attached: Complaint, Acceptance of Service of Complaint, Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5173463), filed by LATHAM POOL PRODUCTS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (ept)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WARD et al v. LATHAM POOL PRODUCTS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LATHAM POOL PRODUCTS, INC.
Represented By: Constantine J. Passodelis
Represented By: Jason A. Rosenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD WARD
Represented By: Dylan C. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REBECCA WARD
Represented By: Dylan C. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?