HERBIN et al v. THE PNC FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC. et al

Plaintiff: TONYA HERBIN, BRETT TYSON and JENNIFER TABOR
Defendant: PNC BANK, N.A. and THE PNC FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00696
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Cathy Bissoon
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 , #9 , and #10 Motions for Attorneys Paolo C. Meireles, Gregg I. Shavitz, and Logan A. Pardell to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 7/5/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (rdl)
July 4, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for attorney Logan A. Pardell to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5198831) by TONYA HERBIN, JENNIFER TABOR, BRETT TYSON. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Pardell, Logan)
July 4, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for attorney Gregg I. Shavitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5198829) by TONYA HERBIN, JENNIFER TABOR, BRETT TYSON. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Shavitz, Gregg)
July 4, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for attorney Paolo C. Meireles to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5198828) by TONYA HERBIN, JENNIFER TABOR, BRETT TYSON. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Meireles, Paolo)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Attorney Cheryl-Lyn D. Bentley to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 6/21/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (rdl)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Attorney Justin M. Swartz to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 6/21/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (rdl)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for attorney Cheryl-Lyn D. Bentley to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5182040) by TONYA HERBIN, JENNIFER TABOR, BRETT TYSON. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Cheryl-Lyn D. Bentley, #2 Exhibit 1-Proposed Order) (Bentley, Cheryl-Lyn )
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for attorney Justin M. Swartz to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5181967) by TONYA HERBIN, JENNIFER TABOR, BRETT TYSON. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Justin M. Swartz, #2 Exhibit 1-Proposed Order) (Swartz, Justin)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss, more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 6/17/19. (jhi)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to PNC BANK, N.A., THE PNC FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC. (ept)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PNC BANK, N.A., THE PNC FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5173794), filed by TONYA HERBIN, JENNIFER TABOR, BRETT TYSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons PNC Financial Services, #6 Summons PNC Bank) (ept)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HERBIN et al v. THE PNC FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TONYA HERBIN
Represented By: Gary F. Lynch
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Logan A. Pardell
Represented By: Justin M. Swartz
Represented By: Paolo C. Meireles
Represented By: Cheryl-Lyn D. Bentley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRETT TYSON
Represented By: Gary F. Lynch
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Logan A. Pardell
Represented By: Justin M. Swartz
Represented By: Paolo C. Meireles
Represented By: Cheryl-Lyn D. Bentley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNIFER TABOR
Represented By: Gary F. Lynch
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Logan A. Pardell
Represented By: Justin M. Swartz
Represented By: Paolo C. Meireles
Represented By: Cheryl-Lyn D. Bentley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNC BANK, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE PNC FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?