CNX GAS COMPANY LLC v. LLOYDS OF LONDON et al
Plaintiff: CNX GAS COMPANY LLC
Defendant: HANOVER INSURANCE GROUP, INC., LLOYDS OF LONDON, HCC INTERMEDIATE HOLDINGS, INC, HISCOX DEDICATED CORPORATE MEMBER LTD., CHINA REINSURANCE GROUP and NAMECO (NO. 808) LIMITED
Case Number: 2:2019cv00699
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: David S Cercone
Referring Judge: Peter J Phipps
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 30 REPLY to Response to Motion re #28 Response to Motion to Remand Case to State Court filed by CNX GAS COMPANY LLC. (Brady, Sean)
July 31, 2019 Filing 29 REPLY IN SUPPORT to #3 Motion to Intervene,, filed by HISCOX DEDICATED CORPORATE MEMBER LTD., NAMECO (NO. 808) LIMITED. (Rende, Bruce)
July 31, 2019 Filing 28 RESPONSE to Motion re #17 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Request for Oral Argument filed by HISCOX DEDICATED CORPORATE MEMBER LTD., NAMECO (NO. 808) LIMITED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Rende, Bruce)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER directing that, although Judge Peter J. Phipps is no longer the presiding judge of any case pending in this court, the docket in those cases over which he presided will continue to reflect him as the presiding judicial officer until such time as they are reassigned to another judicial officer of this court. Until that time, the Chief Judge or his designee will address any motions or other matters that may require judicial action in those cases; Any inquires regarding these matters shall be directed to Deputy Clerk Beth Abbott at (412) 208-7390. This Order will remain in effect until modified or vacated by further order of court. See order at 2:19-mc-00858. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 7/19/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (admin1, )
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING #22 Motion for Sean Brady to Appear Pro Hac Vice; GRANTING #23 Motion for Harold Flanagan to Appear Pro Hac Vice; GRANTING #24 Motion for Brandon Briscoe to Appear Pro Hac Vice; GRANTING #25 Motion for Paul Matthew Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Peter J. Phipps on 07/17/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
July 16, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for attorney Paul Matthew Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5212015) by CNX GAS COMPANY LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Puz, Rodger)
July 16, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for attorney Brandon Briscoe to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5211999) by CNX GAS COMPANY LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Puz, Rodger)
July 16, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for attorney Harold Flanagan to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5211981) by CNX GAS COMPANY LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Puz, Rodger)
July 16, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for attorney Sean Brady to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5211955) by CNX GAS COMPANY LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 Exhibit Cert of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Puz, Rodger)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Responses to #17 Motion to Remand Case to State Court and Request for Oral Argument due by 7/31/2019; Reply due by 8/9/2019. Page limitations outlined herein. Signed by Judge Peter J. Phipps on 07/15/19. (eca)
July 10, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to #4 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by CNX GAS COMPANY LLC. (Puz, Rodger)
July 10, 2019 Filing 19 BRIEF in Opposition re #3 Motion to Intervene, filed by CNX GAS COMPANY LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint) (Puz, Rodger)
July 10, 2019 Filing 18 BRIEF in Support re #17 Motion to Remand to State Court filed by CNX GAS COMPANY LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint) (Puz, Rodger)
July 10, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Request for Oral Argument by CNX GAS COMPANY LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Puz, Rodger)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Responses to #3 Motion to Intervene, not to exceed eight pages, are due by 7/15/2019. Signed by Judge Peter J. Phipps on 07/05/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
July 1, 2019 Filing 15 EXHIBITS in Support of #3 Motion to Intervene, by HISCOX DEDICATED CORPORATE MEMBER LTD., NAMECO (NO. 808) LIMITED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4) (Rende, Bruce)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion for Karen K. Milhollin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Peter J. Phipps on 07/01/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion for Jeffrey T. Bentch to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Peter J. Phipps on 07/01/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion for William P. Maines to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Peter J. Phipps on 07/01/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion for George H. Lugrin IV to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Peter J. Phipps on 07/01/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
June 28, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for attorney Karen K. Milhollin to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5193037) by HISCOX DEDICATED CORPORATE MEMBER LTD., NAMECO (NO. 808) LIMITED. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A) (Rende, Bruce)
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for attorney Jeffrey T. Bentch to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5193023) by HISCOX DEDICATED CORPORATE MEMBER LTD., NAMECO (NO. 808) LIMITED. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order) (Rende, Bruce)
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for attorney William P. Maines to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5193004) by HISCOX DEDICATED CORPORATE MEMBER LTD., NAMECO (NO. 808) LIMITED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Proposed Order) (Rende, Bruce)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for attorney George H. Lugrin IV to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5192982) by HISCOX DEDICATED CORPORATE MEMBER LTD., NAMECO (NO. 808) LIMITED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order) (Rende, Bruce)
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 Errata re #3 Motion to Intervene, by HISCOX DEDICATED CORPORATE MEMBER LTD., NAMECO (NO. 808) LIMITED. Reason for Correction: Exhibits were not attached. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order) (Rende, Bruce)
June 20, 2019 Judge Peter J. Phipps added. (mao)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. The Clerk is directed to reassign this case to another member of the Court for all further proceedings. Judge David S. Cercone no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 6/20/19. (njt)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM of Defendants Nameco (No. 808) Limited, and Hiscox Dedicated Corporate Member Ltd. and Intervenors Chaucer Corporate Capital No. 2 Ltd., Barbican Corporate Member Limited and MSI Corporate Capital Limited against CNX GAS COMPANY LLC by NAMECO (NO. 808) LIMITED, HISCOX DEDICATED CORPORATE MEMBER LTD.. (Rende, Bruce)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Intervene of Chaucer Corporate Capital No. 2 Ltd. Barbican Corporate Member Limited and MSI Corporate Capital Limited by HISCOX DEDICATED CORPORATE MEMBER LTD., NAMECO (NO. 808) LIMITED. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Rende, Bruce)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement identifying HCC Insurance Holdings Inc., Tokio Marine Holdings, Inc., Hiscox Ltd. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by HISCOX DEDICATED CORPORATE MEMBER LTD., NAMECO (NO. 808) LIMITED. (Rende, Bruce)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF ALLEGHENY COUNTY, case number GD-19-7029 with DEFENDANT Copies attached: LOWER COURT DOCUMENTS, AFFIDAVIT OF WSERVICE, DECLARATIONS (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5173994), filed by NAMECO (NO. 808) LIMITED, HISCOX DEDICATED CORPORATE MEMBER LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5) (jd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CNX GAS COMPANY LLC v. LLOYDS OF LONDON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HANOVER INSURANCE GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LLOYDS OF LONDON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCC INTERMEDIATE HOLDINGS, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HISCOX DEDICATED CORPORATE MEMBER LTD.
Represented By: Bruce E. Rende
Represented By: William P. Maines
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Bentch
Represented By: Karen K. Milhollin
Represented By: George H. Lugrin, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHINA REINSURANCE GROUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAMECO (NO. 808) LIMITED
Represented By: Bruce E. Rende
Represented By: William P. Maines
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Bentch
Represented By: Karen K. Milhollin
Represented By: George H. Lugrin, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CNX GAS COMPANY LLC
Represented By: Rodger L. Puz
Represented By: Brandon C. Briscoe
Represented By: Harold J. Flanagan
Represented By: Paul Matthew Jones
Represented By: Sean P. Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?