MADERO v. LUFFEY et al
Plaintiff: RONALD JAMES MADERO
Defendant: DONNA HUGHES, JAMIE WILSON, DEVON KLINGENSMITH, HOMELESS CAT MANAGEMENT TEAM, HALA NEUMAH, OFFICER CHRISTINE LUFFEY, SARAH SHIVELY, JESSICA SERBIN, SARA ANDERSON, TARRA PROVIDENT, HUMANE ANIMAL RESCUE and MARY KAY GENTERT
Case Number: 2:2019cv00700
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: David S Cercone
Referring Judge: Peter J Phipps
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew R. Benedict on behalf of HUMANE ANIMAL RESCUE. (Benedict, Andrew)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to MARY KAY GENTERT (cel)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER directing that, although Judge Peter J. Phipps is no longer the presiding judge of any case pending in this court, the docket in those cases over which he presided will continue to reflect him as the presiding judicial officer until such time as they are reassigned to another judicial officer of this court. Until that time, the Chief Judge or his designee will address any motions or other matters that may require judicial action in those cases; Any inquires regarding these matters shall be directed to Deputy Clerk Beth Abbott at (412) 208-7390. This Order will remain in effect until modified or vacated by further order of court. See order at 2:19-mc-00858. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 7/19/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (admin1, )
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER APPROVING #40 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer. Officer Christine Luffey shall have until 08/21/19 to file a response to the complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 07/22/19. (eca)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by CHRISTINE LUFFEY Answer due from CHRISTINE LUFFEY on 8/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Koren, Julie)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER GRANTING #38 Motion for Extension of Time and to Strike. HCMT's response to the complaint is due by 08/21/19. Provident shall file their pleading by 08/21/19. Signed by Judge Peter J. Phipps on 07/19/19. (eca)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint,,, , MOTION to Strike #26 Answer to Complaint by HOMELESS CAT MANAGEMENT TEAM, TARRA PROVIDENT. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (McGrath, Estelle)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 REQUEST by RONALD JAMES MADERO for entry of DEFAULT against MARY KAY GENTERT . (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Carolyn B. McGee, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service) (McGee, Carolyn)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Response to #32 Motion to Dismiss due by 8/13/2019; Reply due by 8/23/2019. Page limitations outlined herein. Signed by Judge Peter J. Phipps on 07/18/19. (eca)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Estelle K. McGrath on behalf of HOMELESS CAT MANAGEMENT TEAM, TARRA PROVIDENT. (McGrath, Estelle)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie E. Koren on behalf of CHRISTINE LUFFEY. (Koren, Julie)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 BRIEF in Support re #32 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by SARA ANDERSON, DONNA HUGHES, HUMANE ANIMAL RESCUE, DEVON KLINGENSMITH, HALA NEUMAH, JESSICA SERBIN, SARAH SHIVELY, JAMIE WILSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Soller, Eric)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by SARA ANDERSON, DONNA HUGHES, HUMANE ANIMAL RESCUE, DEVON KLINGENSMITH, HALA NEUMAH, JESSICA SERBIN, SARAH SHIVELY, JAMIE WILSON. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Soller, Eric)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric G. Soller on behalf of SARA ANDERSON. (Soller, Eric)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by RONALD JAMES MADERO. SARA ANDERSON served on 7/10/2019, answer due 7/31/2019. (Mercer, Jeremy)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric G. Soller on behalf of JESSICA SERBIN, JAMIE WILSON. (Soller, Eric)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric G. Soller on behalf of SARAH SHIVELY. (Soller, Eric)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric G. Soller on behalf of DEVON KLINGENSMITH, HALA NEUMAH. (Soller, Eric)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by TARRA PROVIDENT. (cel)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. The Clerk shall reassign this action to another member of the Court for all further proceedings. Judge David S. Cercone no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 7/10/19. (njt)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Judge Peter J. Phipps added as presiding. (cjo)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by HUMANE ANIMAL RESCUE. (Soller, Eric)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by RONALD JAMES MADERO. JESSICA SERBIN served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019. (Mercer, Jeremy)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric G. Soller on behalf of DONNA HUGHES, HUMANE ANIMAL RESCUE. (Soller, Eric)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT-ORDER granting #7 Motion to Withdraw Appearance. Attorney Amy L. Barrette terminated. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 7/8/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's Order or Notice on the matter. (njt)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed; Mary Kay Gentert on June 22, 2019, filed by RONALD JAMES MADERO. (Mercer, Jeremy) Modified text on 7/5/2019. (cel)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed; Homeless Cat Management Team on June 22, 2019, filed by RONALD JAMES MADERO. (Mercer, Jeremy) Modified text on 7/5/2019. (cel)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed; Tarra Provident on June 23, 2019, filed by RONALD JAMES MADERO. (Mercer, Jeremy) Modified text on 7/5/2019. (cel)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed; Humane Area Rescue on June 26, 2019, filed by RONALD JAMES MADERO. (Mercer, Jeremy) Modified text on 7/5/2019. (cel)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed; Hala Neumah on June 26, 2019, filed by RONALD JAMES MADERO. (Mercer, Jeremy) Modified text on 7/5/2019. (cel)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed; Donna Hughes on June 28, 2019, filed by RONALD JAMES MADERO. (Mercer, Jeremy) Modified text on 7/5/2019. (cel)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed; Jamie Wilson on June 28, 2019, filed by RONALD JAMES MADERO. (Mercer, Jeremy) Modified text on 7/5/2019. (cel)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed; Sarah Shively on June 28, 2019, filed by RONALD JAMES MADERO. (Mercer, Jeremy) Modified text on 7/5/2019. (cel)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed; Officer Christine Luffey on July 1, 2019, filed by RONALD JAMES MADERO. (Mercer, Jeremy) Modified text on 7/5/2019. (cel)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by RONALD JAMES MADERO. MARY KAY GENTERT served on 6/22/2019, answer due 7/15/2019; HOMELESS CAT MANAGEMENT TEAM served on 6/22/2019, answer due 7/15/2019; DONNA HUGHES served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; HUMANE ANIMAL RESCUE served on 6/26/2019, answer due 7/17/2019; CHRISTINE LUFFEY served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019; HALA NEUMAH served on 6/26/2019, answer due 7/17/2019; TARRA PROVIDENT served on 6/23/2019, answer due 7/15/2019; SARAH SHIVELY served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; JAMIE WILSON served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. These documents were previously filed electronically: See documents 12 - 20 (cel)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #17 Affidavit of Service, #18 Affidavit of Service, #13 Affidavit of Service, #19 Affidavit of Service, #20 Affidavit of Service, #15 Affidavit of Service, #14 Affidavit of Service, #16 Affidavit of Service, #12 Affidavit of Service. ERROR: Wrong event selected. CORRECTION: Re-docketed as Summons/Return of Service returned executed. This message is for informational purposes only. (cel)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Summons Reissued as to SARA ANDERSON (jm)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Summons Reissued as to SARA ANDERSON (jm) Wrong document attached. Document removed from public view and redocketed at #11 . Modified text on 7/3/2019. (ept)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRAECIPE to Reissue Summons by RONALD JAMES MADERO (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Certificate of Service) (McGee, Carolyn)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Proposed Order re #7 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney by RONALD JAMES MADERO. (Barrette, Amy)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by RONALD JAMES MADERO. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance, #2 Certificate of Service) (Barrette, Amy)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (kak)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy L. Barrette on behalf of RONALD JAMES MADERO. (Barrette, Amy)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Devin A. Winklosky on behalf of RONALD JAMES MADERO. (Winklosky, Devin)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Carolyn Batz McGee on behalf of RONALD JAMES MADERO. (McGee, Carolyn)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to SARA ANDERSON, MARY KAY GENTERT, HOMELESS CAT MANAGEMENT TEAM, DONNA HUGHES, HUMANE ANIMAL RESCUE, DEVON KLINGENSMITH, CHRISTINE LUFFEY, HALA NEUMAH, TARRA PROVIDENT, JESSICA SERBIN, SARAH SHIVELY, JAMIE WILSON (cel)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SARA ANDERSON, MARY KAY GENTERT, HOMELESS CAT MANAGEMENT TEAM, DONNA HUGHES, HUMANE ANIMAL RESCUE, DEVON KLINGENSMITH, CHRISTINE LUFFEY, HALA NEUMAH, TARRA PROVIDENT, JESSICA SERBIN, SARAH SHIVELY, JAMIE WILSON (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5173979) filed by RONALD JAMES MADERO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T) (cel) Modified text on 6/17/2019. (cel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MADERO v. LUFFEY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONNA HUGHES
Represented By: Eric G. Soller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMIE WILSON
Represented By: Eric G. Soller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEVON KLINGENSMITH
Represented By: Eric G. Soller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOMELESS CAT MANAGEMENT TEAM
Represented By: Estelle K. McGrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HALA NEUMAH
Represented By: Eric G. Soller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER CHRISTINE LUFFEY
Represented By: Julie E. Koren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SARAH SHIVELY
Represented By: Eric G. Soller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JESSICA SERBIN
Represented By: Eric G. Soller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SARA ANDERSON
Represented By: Eric G. Soller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TARRA PROVIDENT
Represented By: Estelle K. McGrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUMANE ANIMAL RESCUE
Represented By: Eric G. Soller
Represented By: Andrew R. Benedict
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARY KAY GENTERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONALD JAMES MADERO
Represented By: Jeremy A. Mercer
Represented By: Carolyn Batz McGee
Represented By: Devin A. Winklosky
Represented By: Amy L. Barrette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?