JONES v. BETHEL PARK SCHOOL DISTRICT et al
Plaintiff: LISA JONES
Defendant: BETHEL PARK SCHOOL DISTRICT and JOSEPH PASQUERILLA
Case Number: 2:2019cv00708
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Marilyn J Horan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against BETHEL PARK SCHOOL DISTRICT, JOSEPH PASQUERILLA BETHEL PARK SCHOOL DISTRICT answer due 8/16/2019; JOSEPH PASQUERILLA answer due 8/16/2019, filed by LISA JONES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Olds, Edward)
July 19, 2019 Filing 13 BRIEF in Support re #12 Motion to Dismiss, Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, filed by BETHEL PARK SCHOOL DISTRICT, JOSEPH PASQUERILLA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Bittner, Salvatore)
July 19, 2019 Filing 12 Partial MOTION to Dismiss re #1 Complaint Pursuant to Rules 12(B)(6) and 12(B)(7), MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by BETHEL PARK SCHOOL DISTRICT, JOSEPH PASQUERILLA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bittner, Salvatore) Modified text on 7/22/2019 to add document linkage. (nll)
July 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Salvatore Bittner on behalf of BETHEL PARK SCHOOL DISTRICT, JOSEPH PASQUERILLA. (Bittner, Salvatore)
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia R. Andrews on behalf of BETHEL PARK SCHOOL DISTRICT, JOSEPH PASQUERILLA. (Andrews, Patricia)
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Russell Lucas, Jr on behalf of BETHEL PARK SCHOOL DISTRICT, JOSEPH PASQUERILLA. (Lucas, R.)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by LISA JONES. BETHEL PARK SCHOOL DISTRICT served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Olds, Edward)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by LISA JONES. JOSEPH PASQUERILLA served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Olds, Edward)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to BETHEL PARK SCHOOL DISTRICT, JOSEPH PASQUERILLA (av)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jaimie L. George on behalf of LISA JONES. (George, Jaimie)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 Errata re #2 Praecipe to Issue Summons by LISA JONES. Reason for Correction: omitted information. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (Olds, Edward)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER AND PROCEDURES ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 6/19/2019. (jgb)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by LISA JONES (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (Olds, Edward)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BETHEL PARK SCHOOL DISTRICT, JOSEPH PASQUERILLA (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5175664), filed by LISA JONES. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ksa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JONES v. BETHEL PARK SCHOOL DISTRICT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BETHEL PARK SCHOOL DISTRICT
Represented By: Patricia R. Andrews
Represented By: R. Russell Lucas, Jr.
Represented By: Salvatore Bittner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH PASQUERILLA
Represented By: Patricia R. Andrews
Represented By: R. Russell Lucas, Jr.
Represented By: Salvatore Bittner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LISA JONES
Represented By: Edward A. Olds
Represented By: Jaimie L. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?