ZOMBECK et al v. GOLDEN RULE INSURANCE COMPANY

Plaintiff: ALLEGHENY GENERAL HOSPITAL and EMILY ZOMBECK
Defendant: GOLDEN RULE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2019cv00728
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Cathy Bissoon
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Voluntary WITHDRAWAL of Claim by ALLEGHENY GENERAL HOSPITAL. (Audley, Sean)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Voluntary WITHDRAWAL of Claim by EMILY ZOMBECK. (Audley, Sean)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss, more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 6/21/19. (jhi) Modified text on 6/21/2019. (ksa)
June 20, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Notice of Removal. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney Hurwitz advised to file statement within 7 days. This message is for informational purposes only. Disclosure Statement due by 6/27/2019. (ksa)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Allegheny County, case number GD 19-07325 Copies attached: State Court Complaint, Requests for Admissions, Requests for Production of Documents and Notice of filing Noticee of Removal (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5179029), filed by GOLDEN RULE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A State Court filings, #3 Exhibit B Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Certificate of Service) (ksa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ZOMBECK et al v. GOLDEN RULE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLEGHENY GENERAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Sean Audley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMILY ZOMBECK
Represented By: Sean Audley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOLDEN RULE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Eric M. Hurwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?