J.B.S. CRANES & ACCESSORIES, INC. v. ALL-CAL EQUIPMENT SERVICES, INC.
Plaintiff: J.B.S. CRANES & ACCESSORIES, INC.
Defendant: ALL-CAL EQUIPMENT SERVICES, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00729
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Marilyn J Horan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY to Plaintiff's Brief in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by ALL-CAL EQUIPMENT SERVICES, INC.. (Weiss, Aaron)
July 9, 2019 Filing 16 BRIEF in Support re #14 RESPONSE to Motion filed by J.B.S. CRANES & ACCESSORIES, INC.. (Binotto, Phillip) Modified text on 7/10/2019. (jd)
July 9, 2019 Filing 15 Proposed Order re #14 RESPONSE to Motion to Dismiss by J.B.S. CRANES & ACCESSORIES, INC.. (Binotto, Phillip) Modified text on 7/10/2019, to link to correct document, also Attorney advised that in the future, Proposed Orders should be made an attachment to their respective documents. (jd)
July 9, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #2 MOTION to Dismiss filed by J.B.S. CRANES & ACCESSORIES, INC.. (Binotto, Phillip)
July 9, 2019 Filing 13 BRIEF in Opposition re #8 Motion to Remand, Motion to Remand to State Court filed by ALL-CAL EQUIPMENT SERVICES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ramaley, Jeffrey)
July 9, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to #8 Motion to Remand, Motion to Remand to State Court, filed by ALL-CAL EQUIPMENT SERVICES, INC.. (Ramaley, Jeffrey)
July 3, 2019 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by ALL-CAL EQUIPMENT SERVICES, INC.. (Ramaley, Jeffrey)
July 2, 2019 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by J.B.S. CRANES & ACCESSORIES, INC.. (Binotto, Phillip)
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 BRIEF in Support re #8 Motion to Remand, Motion to Remand to State Court filed by J.B.S. CRANES & ACCESSORIES, INC.. (Binotto, Phillip)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand , MOTION to Remand to State Court by J.B.S. CRANES & ACCESSORIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Binotto, Phillip)
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary D. Bombatch on behalf of J.B.S. CRANES & ACCESSORIES, INC.. (Bombatch, Zachary)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Phillip J. Binotto, Jr on behalf of J.B.S. CRANES & ACCESSORIES, INC.. (Binotto, Phillip)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER AND PROCEDURES ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 6/27/2019. (rtw)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey A. Ramaley on behalf of ALL-CAL EQUIPMENT SERVICES, INC.. (Ramaley, Jeffrey)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 BRIEF in Support re #2 Motion to Dismiss filed by ALL-CAL EQUIPMENT SERVICES, INC.. (Weiss, Aaron)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss by ALL-CAL EQUIPMENT SERVICES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Weiss, Aaron)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from COMMON PLEAS OF WASHINGTON COUNTY, case number 2018-7284 with BOTH Copies attached: LOWER COURT DOCUMENTS, DOCKET SHEET, EXHIBITS (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5179368), filed by ALL-CAL EQUIPMENT SERVICES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (jd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J.B.S. CRANES & ACCESSORIES, INC. v. ALL-CAL EQUIPMENT SERVICES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALL-CAL EQUIPMENT SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Aaron H. Weiss
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Ramaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.B.S. CRANES & ACCESSORIES, INC.
Represented By: Phillip J. Binotto, Jr.
Represented By: Zachary D. Bombatch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?