N.M. et al v. UNIONTOWN AREA SCHOOL DISTRICT et al
Plaintiff: N.M. and MARY JO L.
Defendant: C.G., UNION AREA SCHOOL DISTRICT, FNU MILLS, CEDRIC LLOYD, JOHN/JANE DOE(S) and UNIONTOWN AREA SCHOOL DISTRICT
Case Number: 2:2019cv00739
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Marilyn J Horan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER AND PROCEDURES ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 8/7/2019. (jgb)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to C.G. (jm)
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Massimo A. Terzigni on behalf of MARY JO L., N.M.. (Terzigni, Massimo)
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 Errata re #4 Praecipe to Issue Summons by MARY JO L.. Reason for Correction: Attached Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Sansone, Joel)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by MARY JO L. (Sansone, Joel)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Tuttle on behalf of N.M.. (Tuttle, Elizabeth)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT against C.G., FNU MILLS, JOHN/JANE DOE(S), CEDRIC LLOYD, UNIONTOWN AREA SCHOOL DISTRICT, filed by N.M., MARY JO L.. (Sansone, Joel)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against C.G., FNU MILLS, JOHN/JANE DOE(S), CEDRIC LLOYD, UNIONTOWN AREA SCHOOL DISTRICT (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5183224), filed by N.M., MARY JO L. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: N.M. et al v. UNIONTOWN AREA SCHOOL DISTRICT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.G.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNION AREA SCHOOL DISTRICT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU MILLS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CEDRIC LLOYD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN/JANE DOE(S)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIONTOWN AREA SCHOOL DISTRICT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N.M.
Represented By: Joel S. Sansone
Represented By: Massimo A. Terzigni
Represented By: Elizabeth Tuttle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY JO L.
Represented By: Joel S. Sansone
Represented By: Massimo A. Terzigni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?