LUKETICH v. D&M PAINTING CORP.
Plaintiff: SHAWN LUKETICH
Defendant: D&M PAINTING CORP.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00751
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: David S Cercone
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER scheduling Initial Case Management Conference for 9/18/19 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 7A before Judge David S. Cercone. Rule 26 conference to be held on or before 8/30/19. Stipulation Selecting ADR Process and Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/9/19. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 7/26/19. (njt)
July 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (njt)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Allison N. Genard on behalf of D&M PAINTING CORP.. (Genard, Allison)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott G. Dunlop on behalf of D&M PAINTING CORP.. (Dunlop, Scott)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SHAWN LUKETICH. D&M PAINTING CORP. waiver sent on 6/26/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Bruzzese, Michael)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against D&M PAINTING CORP. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5186188), filed by SHAWN LUKETICH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jjg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LUKETICH v. D&M PAINTING CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHAWN LUKETICH
Represented By: Michael J. Bruzzese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D&M PAINTING CORP.
Represented By: Scott G. Dunlop
Represented By: Allison N. Genard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?