LONG et al v. SIMPSON MANOR ASSOCIATES et al
Plaintiff: RICHARD LONG and BETTY LONG
Defendant: KAREN GILMORE, INTERSTATE REALTY MANAGEMENT COMPANY and SIMPSON MANOR ASSOCIATES
Case Number: 2:2019cv00752
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Joy Flowers Conti
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by INTERSTATE REALTY MANAGEMENT COMPANY, KAREN GILMORE, SIMPSON MANOR ASSOCIATES. KAREN GILMORE waiver sent on 8/1/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (Lucas, Jessica)
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Lucas on behalf of KAREN GILMORE, INTERSTATE REALTY MANAGEMENT COMPANY, SIMPSON MANOR ASSOCIATES. (Lucas, Jessica)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by INTERSTATE REALTY MANAGEMENT COMPANY, SIMPSON MANOR ASSOCIATES. INTERSTATE REALTY MANAGEMENT COMPANY waiver sent on 7/15/2019, answer due 9/13/2019. (Lucas, Jessica)
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by INTERSTATE REALTY MANAGEMENT COMPANY, SIMPSON MANOR ASSOCIATES. SIMPSON MANOR ASSOCIATES waiver sent on 7/15/2019, answer due 9/13/2019. (Lucas, Jessica)
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Lucas on behalf of INTERSTATE REALTY MANAGEMENT COMPANY, SIMPSON MANOR ASSOCIATES. (Lucas, Jessica)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (smc)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KAREN GILMORE, INTERSTATE REALTY MANAGEMENT COMPANY, SIMPSON MANOR ASSOCIATES (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 315-5186212), filed by RICHARD LONG, BETTY LONG. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (sdp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LONG et al v. SIMPSON MANOR ASSOCIATES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAREN GILMORE
Represented By: Jessica Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERSTATE REALTY MANAGEMENT COMPANY
Represented By: Jessica Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SIMPSON MANOR ASSOCIATES
Represented By: Jessica Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD LONG
Represented By: Jennifer O. Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BETTY LONG
Represented By: Jennifer O. Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?