YOUNG v. HAYES MECHANICAL
Plaintiff: . TAMMY YOUNG and TAMMY YOUNG
Defendant: HAYES MECHANICAL
Case Number: 2:2019cv00762
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Peter J Phipps
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing that, although Judge Peter J. Phipps is no longer the presiding judge of any case pending in this court, the docket in those cases over which he presided will continue to reflect him as the presiding judicial officer until such time as they are reassigned to another judicial officer of this court. Until that time, the Chief Judge or his designee will address any motions or other matters that may require judicial action in those cases; Any inquires regarding these matters shall be directed to Deputy Clerk Beth Abbott at (412) 208-7390. This Order will remain in effect until modified or vacated by further order of court. See order at 2:19-mc-00858. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 7/19/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (admin1, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement identifying Mycenaean Shield, LLC as corporate parent or other affiliate, by HAYES MECHANICAL. (Leah, Scott)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. The Initial Scheduling Conference is set for 9/4/2019 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 8B before Judge Peter J. Phipps. Rule 26(f) Report due by 8/28/2019, and Stipulation Selecting ADR Process due by 8/30/2019. (atg)
July 8, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #5 Answer to Complaint. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 7/15/2019. (av)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by HAYES MECHANICAL. (Leah, Scott)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by TAMMY YOUNG. (Vaporis, Michael)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 Consent to Proceed before US Mag. Judge OR District Judge Option by HAYES MECHANICAL. (Leah, Scott) Modified text on 7/3/2019. (eca)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER OF COURT. By July 15, 2019, each party must execute and file the judge election form, available at https://www.pawd.uscourts.gov/sites/pawd/files/Consent-to-Mag.pdf. Through that filing, each party must either consent to the jurisdiction of a United States Magistrate Judge or select the option to proceed before a United States District Judge. If all parties consent to have the case assigned to a United States Magistrate Judge, the matter will be referred to the Clerk of Court for reassignment. Signed by Judge Peter J. Phipps on 07/01/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Indiana County, case number 11007 CD 2019 Copies attached: State Court Complaint, Affidavit of Service and Notice of Filing Notice of Removal (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5191106), filed by HAYES MECHANICAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 Affidavit of Service, #3 Exhibit 3 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (ksa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: YOUNG v. HAYES MECHANICAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAYES MECHANICAL
Represented By: Scott R. Leah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: . TAMMY YOUNG
Represented By: Michael N. Vaporis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAMMY YOUNG
Represented By: Michael N. Vaporis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?