REAM et al v. NATIONWIDE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, NAIC

Plaintiff: CORINNA L. REAM and JASON J. REAM
Defendant: NATIONWIDE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, NAIC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00768
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Mark R Hornak
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Filing 13 BRIEF in Support re #2 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by NATIONWIDE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, NAIC. (Miller, Jennifer) Modified text on 7/24/2019 to correct title of event selected. (nll)
July 18, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #11 Brief in Opposition to Motion. ERROR: Proposed Order was made part of main document. CORRECTION: Attorney advised that in future proposed orders are to be made attachments to the main document. This message is for informational purposes only. (av)
July 17, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Bruce E. Rende on behalf of NATIONWIDE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, NAIC. (Rende, Bruce)
July 16, 2019 Filing 11 BRIEF in Opposition re #2 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by JASON J. REAM. (Webster, Daniel )
July 16, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by JASON J. REAM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-UPMC Discharge Summary, #2 Exhibit B-Functional Capacity Test, #3 Exhibit C-Dr.Ramirez-DelToro Report, #4 Exhibit D-Dr. Hartley Report, #5 Exhibit E-Vocational Report, #6 Exhibit F-Economic Report) (Webster, Daniel )
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this Notice and use either Dial-In No. 1 or Dial-In No. 2, both of which are contained in this Notice. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only", so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (jad)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 7/16/19. (jad)
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jad)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by JASON J. REAM re #5 Notice of Appearance (Webster, Daniel )
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel L. Webster on behalf of JASON J. REAM. (Webster, Daniel )
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate by NATIONWIDE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, NAIC. (Miller, Jennifer) Modified text on 7/10/2019. (nll)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 BRIEF in Support re #2 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by NATIONWIDE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, NAIC. (Miller, Jennifer)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by NATIONWIDE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, NAIC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Miller, Jennifer)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from The Court of Common Pleas of Fayette County, case number 1118 of 2019 G.D. with Jury Demand (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5192579), filed by NATIONWIDE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, NAIC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (cel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: REAM et al v. NATIONWIDE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, NAIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONWIDE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, NAIC
Represented By: Jennifer L. Miller
Represented By: Bruce E. Rende
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CORINNA L. REAM
Represented By: Daniel L. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASON J. REAM
Represented By: Daniel L. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?